Simon et al v. Nicholson Injury Law PA et al
Plaintiff: Simon Law Group, P.A., Ortavia D Simon and Ortavia D. Simon
Defendant: David S Nicholson, Nicholson Injury Law PA and David Simon Nicholson
Case Number: 6:2019cv01312
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Daniel C Irick
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:0044
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER discharging #21 Order to show cause. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/9/2019. (DJD)
September 5, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by David Simon Nicholson, Nicholson Injury Law PA. (Manresa, Carlos)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER to show cause to Carlos J. Manresa as to why sanctions should not be imposed for his failure to comply as to David Simon Nicholson, Nicholson Injury Law PA. Show Cause Response due by 9/12/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/5/2019. (DJD)
August 20, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint or MOTION to Strike filed by Ortavia D. Simon, Simon Law Group, P.A.. (Davis, Shannon)
August 6, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint or MOTION to Strike by David Simon Nicholson, Nicholson Injury Law PA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(O'Hara, Kevin) Modified on 8/6/2019 (SPM).
August 5, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ortavia D. Simon, Simon Law Group, P.A.. Related case(s): no (Davis, Shannon)
August 5, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by Ortavia D. Simon, Simon Law Group, P.A.. (Davis, Shannon)
August 5, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by David Simon Nicholson, Nicholson Injury Law PA. (O'Hara, Kevin)
August 1, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN of service executed on 07/22/2019 by Ortavia D. Simon, Simon Law Group, P.A. as to Nicholson Injury Law PA. (Davis, Shannon)
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 07/22/2019 by Ortavia D. Simon, Simon Law Group, P.A. as to David Simon Nicholson. (Davis, Shannon)
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF of service by Ortavia D. Simon, Simon Law Group, P.A. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service Upon Nicholson Injury Law, #2 Affidavit Service Upon David Simon Nicholson)(Davis, Shannon) Modified on 8/1/2019 (SPM). **Re-filed at #14 and #15**
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Carlos J. Manresa to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing by August 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 7/24/2019. (DJD) ctp
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by defendants by 8/7/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 7/24/2019. (DJD) ctp
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David Simon Nicholson, Nicholson Injury Law PA (O'Hara, Kevin) Modified on 7/24/2019 (SPM).
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #2 Motion for temporary restraining order. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 7/19/2019. (DJD)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/1/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 7/18/2019. (DJD) ctp
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/1/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 7/18/2019. (DJD) ctp
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of filing signature page to Motion by Ortavia D. Simon, Simon Law Group, P.A. re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order (Davis, Shannon) Modified on 7/19/2019 (SPM).
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to David Simon Nicholson, Nicholson Injury Law PA. (SPM)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (SPM)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-1312-Orl-41DCI. (SJB)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for temporary restraining order by Ortavia D Simon, Simon Law Group, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Screenshots of Simon Use of the Mark, #2 Exhibit Screenshots of Nicholson Use of Infringing Mark, #3 Exhibit Simon Demand to Nicholson)(Davis, Shannon)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR TRADEMARK AND SERVICE MARK INFRINGEMENT, UNFAIR COMPETITION, AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15699692) filed by Ortavia D Simon, Simon Law Group, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons David Simon Nicholson, #3 Proposed Summons Nicholson Injury Law PA, #4 Exhibit Screenshots of Simon Use of the Mark, #5 Exhibit Screenshots of Nicholson Use of Infringing Mark, #6 Exhibit Demand Letter)(Davis, Shannon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon et al v. Nicholson Injury Law PA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David S Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholson Injury Law PA
Represented By: Kevin Thomas O'Hara
Represented By: Carlos J. Manresa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Simon Nicholson
Represented By: Kevin Thomas O'Hara
Represented By: Carlos J. Manresa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon Law Group, P.A.
Represented By: Shannon Natasha Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ortavia D Simon
Represented By: Shannon Natasha Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ortavia D. Simon
Represented By: Shannon Natasha Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?