Nichia Corporation v. Healthe, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Nichia Corporation
Defendant: Lighting Science Group Corp. and Healthe, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01332
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ENDORSED ORDER granting #35 Motion to Appear Telephonically. The parties may confer telephonically to prepare their case management report. If the parties are unable to agree on all matters to be included in the report, then the Court may require an in-person meeting of counsel to attempt, in good faith, to resolve all disagreements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 9/13/2019. (Kidd, Embry)
September 13, 2019 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically and Memorandum of Law In Support by Nichia Corporation. (Johnson, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. Modified on 9/16/2019 (BIA).
August 27, 2019 Set/reset deadlines: Answer due by 9/30/2019. (BIA)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ENDORSED ORDER granting #33 Agreed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Defendants shall answer or respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint on or before September 30, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 8/27/2019. (RMN)
August 26, 2019 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Brown, Joshua) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
August 20, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE To Counsel: Counsel is to submit the attached Patent Case Management Report following the completion of the Case Management Conference. (ctp)(JLC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of compliance re #24 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Nichia Corporation. (Yost, Eleanor) Modified on 8/14/2019 (BIA).
August 8, 2019 Filing 30 RETURN of service executed on 08/08/2019 by Nichia Corporation as to Lighting Science Group Corp.. (Yost, Eleanor)
August 8, 2019 Filing 29 RETURN of service executed on 08/08/2019 by Nichia Corporation as to Healthe, Inc.. (Yost, Eleanor)
August 7, 2019 Filing 28 Remark: Doc. #26 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/7/19. (ESG)
August 6, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #15 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Nichia Corporation. Related case(s): yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Other Related Cases)(Yost, Eleanor)
August 6, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #16 Interested persons order by Nichia Corporation. (Yost, Eleanor)
August 6, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS reissued as to Lighting Science Group Corp., Nichia Corporation on #14 Amended Complaint. (BIA)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #17 Unopposed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark Rawls; granting #18 Unopposed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel R. McCallum; granting #19 Unopposed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert P. Parker; granting #20 Unopposed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jenny Colgate; and granting #21 Unopposed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael H. Jones. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 8/6/2019. (JLE)
August 5, 2019 Filing 23 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Nichia Corporation. (Johnson, Daniel)
August 5, 2019 Filing 22 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Nichia Corporation. (Johnson, Daniel)
August 2, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Michael H. Jones to appear pro hac vice by Nichia Corporation. (Yost, Eleanor) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
August 2, 2019 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Jenny Colgate to appear pro hac vice by Nichia Corporation. (Yost, Eleanor) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
August 2, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Robert P. Parker to appear pro hac vice by Nichia Corporation. (Yost, Eleanor) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
August 2, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Daniel R. McCallum to appear pro hac vice by Nichia Corporation. (Yost, Eleanor) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
August 2, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Mark Rawls to appear pro hac vice by Nichia Corporation. (Yost, Eleanor) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
August 2, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Mark Rawls, appearing on behalf of Nichia Corporation (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL084480.) (AC)
August 2, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Michael H. Jones, appearing on behalf of Nichia Corporation (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORl084479.) (AC)
August 2, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Robert P. Parker, Jenny Colgate, Daniel McCallum, appearing on behalf of Nichia Corporation (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL084476.) (AC)
August 1, 2019 Filing 16 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/1/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
August 1, 2019 Filing 15 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk (ctp)(JLC) Modified on 8/1/2019 (JLC).
July 31, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Healthe, Inc., Lighting Science Group Corp. with Jury Demand. filed by Nichia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit USP 8530250, #3 Exhibit USP 10276751, #4 Exhibit USP 9865773, #5 Exhibit USP 8796721, #6 Exhibit USP 8344402, #7 Exhibit USP 8728916, #8 Exhibit USP 7348602, #9 Exhibit USP 6838693, #10 Exhibit USP 9444011, #11 Exhibit USP 8309948, #12 Exhibit USP 7750337, #13 Exhibit USP 8120057)(Johnson, Daniel)
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 **FILED IN ERROR. REFILED TO CORRECT DOCKET TEXT AT #14** AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nichia Corporation, Lighting Science Group Corp. with Jury Demand. filed by Nichia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit USP 8530250, #3 Exhibit USP 10276751, #4 Exhibit USP 9865773, #5 Exhibit USP 8796721, #6 Exhibit USP 8344402, #7 Exhibit USP 8728916, #8 Exhibit USP 7348602, #9 Exhibit USP 6838693, #10 Exhibit USP 9444011, #11 Exhibit USP 8309948, #12 Exhibit USP 7750337, #13 Exhibit USP 8120057)(Johnson, Daniel) Modified on 8/1/2019 (BIA).
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C. Johnson on behalf of Nichia Corporation (Johnson, Daniel)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:19-CV-1332-ORL-37-EJK. Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (LMM)
July 24, 2019 Set/reset deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 7/31/2019 (BIA)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Complaint (Doc. #1) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/24/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE to counsel Robert P. Parker, Jenny Colgate, Michael Jones, Daniel McCallum, and Mark Rawls of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk)(copies mailed). (BIA)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A-C, #3 Exhibit D-G, #4 Exhibit H-I, #5 Exhibit J-L) (BIA)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Healthe, Inc., Lighting Science Group Corp. (BIA)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:19-cv-1332-Orl-37TBS. (SJB)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Nichia Corporation. (Yost, Eleanor)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Nichia Corporation. (Yost, Eleanor)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nichia Corporation (Yost, Eleanor) Modified on 7/23/2019 (BIA).
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint by Nichia Corporation (Yost, Eleanor) Modified on 7/23/2019 (BIA).
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Healthe, Inc., Lighting Science Group Corp. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15710398) filed by Nichia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Yost, Eleanor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichia Corporation v. Healthe, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nichia Corporation
Represented By: Eleanor Martha Yost
Represented By: William G. Giltinan
Represented By: Mark T. Rawls
Represented By: Robert P. Parker
Represented By: Daniel R. McCallum
Represented By: Michael H. Jones
Represented By: Jenny L. Colgate
Represented By: Daniel C. Johnson
Represented By: John Coy Stull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lighting Science Group Corp.
Represented By: Joshua Reuben Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthe, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Reuben Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?