Quashie v. Emirates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Marason Quashie
Defendant: Emirates, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01344
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 22 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Michael Siboni appointed as mediator. (RDO)
September 9, 2019 Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/21/2019, Discovery due by 6/1/2020, Dispositive motions due by 7/1/2020, Pretrial statement due by 9/22/2020, All other motions due by 9/29/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2020 at 03:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron, Jury Trial set for trial term beginning on 11/2/2020 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron., Conduct mediation hearing by 6/15/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates., Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 5/1/2020, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 4/1/2020 (RDO)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/6/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
September 5, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Miner, Curtis) Modified on 9/6/2019 (RDO).
September 4, 2019 Filing 19 CORRECTED CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Marason Quashie. (Miner, Curtis) Modified on 9/4/2019 (RDO).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER striking #13 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement filed by Marason Quashie. Plaintiff shall re-file this document and include the required certification, "I hereby certify that, except as disclosed above, I am unaware of any actual or potential conflict of interest involving the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to this case, and will immediately notify the Court in writing on learning of any such conflict." Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/30/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven C. Marks terminated as counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 8/29/2019. (MKH)
August 29, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Podhurst Orseck, P.A. to withdraw as attorney for Plaintiff by Marason Quashie. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marks, Steven) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER striking #14 Case Management Report for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.05. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/27/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 (STRICKEN BY #15 ENDORSED ORDER) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Miner, Curtis) Modified on 8/28/2019 (RDO).
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 (STRICKEN BY #18 ENDORSED ORDER) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Marason Quashie. (Miner, Curtis) Modified on 9/4/2019 (RDO).
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #4 Related Case Order by Marason Quashie. Related case(s): no (Miner, Curtis) Modified on 8/22/2019 (RDO).
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis B. Miner on behalf of Marason Quashie (Miner, Curtis)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Emirates, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Thornton, Clayton)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #8 Motion to Substitute Counsel. The Court construes the Motion as a motion to withdraw counsel. The Motion does not comply with the notice and conferral requirements set forth in Local Rules 2.03(b) and 3.01(g), respectively. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 8/8/2019. (MDH)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Marason Quashie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miner, Curtis) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Emirates, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Investment Corporation of Dubai, a political subdivision of the Government of Dubai, United Arab Emirates for Emirates, Inc... (Thornton, Clayton)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Emirates, Inc..(Thornton, Clayton)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/30/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/30/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Kristina Infance of Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk). (copy mailed to counsel)(RDO)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-1344-Orl-40LRH. (SJB)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 9th Judicial Circuit in and for Orange County, Florida, case number 2019-CA-4657-O filed in State Court on 04/16/19. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15714209 filed by Emirates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thornton, Clayton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quashie v. Emirates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emirates, Inc.
Represented By: Clayton Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marason Quashie
Represented By: Steven C. Marks
Represented By: Curtis B. Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?