Johnston et al v. The United States
Plaintiff: Timothy James Johnston and Catherine Ann Johnston
Defendant: The United States
Case Number: 6:2019cv01354
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Daniel C Irick
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing compliance with the Court's Orders directing Plaintiffs to file a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 3), and to certify compliance with Local Rule 1.04(d) (Doc. 2). Responses due by 9/19/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/12/2019. (DJD)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in support re #7 Amended Complaint filed by Catherine Ann Johnston, Timothy James Johnston. (SPM)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against The United States filed by Timothy James Johnston, Catherine Ann Johnston. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Timothy James Johnston, Catherine Ann Johnston (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B,C,D, #3 Exhibit E,F,G,H, #4 Exhibit I,J,K, #5 Affidavit Timothy Johnston, #6 Affidavit Catherine Johnston)(SPM)
August 15, 2019 Set/reset deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 9/2/2019 (SPM)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 motion to amend/correct. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint on or before September 2, 2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/15/2019. (SDR)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by Timothy James Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Memorandum in Support of Amended Complaint, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit)(SPM)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to strike and delete Docket Entries 1-1 and 1-4 from the record. The Clerk is further directed to terminate Catherine Ann Johnston as a Plaintiff in this matter and amend the case style accordingly. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 7/31/2019. (DJD)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/12/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 7/29/2019. (DJD) ctp (AKC).
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/12/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 7/29/2019. (DJD) ctp
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The United States Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ORL-084228 filed by Timothy James Johnston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (STRICKEN AND DELETED), #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D-K (STRICKEN AND DELETED), #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(SPM) Modified on 8/1/2019 (SPM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnston et al v. The United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy James Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Ann Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?