United States of America v. $392,805 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $392,805 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 6:2019cv01366
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
2 Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF of publication filed by United States of America. Newspaper: an official government internet site (www.forfeiture.gov) Date(s) of publication for at least 30 consecutive days, beginning July 30, 2019 and ending on August 28, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Andrejko, Nicole)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 US Marshal 285 form Complaint served on 8/05/2019 for forfeiture and warrant or arrest in rem. (DMA)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/15/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/1/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Judge Gregory A. Presnell. New case number: 6:19-cv1366-Orl-31LRH. Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: this case is to be transferred to U.S. District Judge Gregory A. Presnell, with his consent, for consideration with Case No. 6:19-cr-127-Orl-31LRH. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/29/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant In Rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 7/26/2019. (MDH)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States of America. Related case(s): yes (BIA)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Warrant of Arrest in Rem)(BIA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 Verified COMPLAINT for Forfeiture in Rem against $392,805 in U.S. Currency filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(BIA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $392,805 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $392,805 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nicole M. Andrejko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?