Washington, Jr. v. Florida Department of Corrections
Plaintiff: Terry Leroy Washington and Terry Leroy Washington, Jr.
Defendant: Florida Dept. of Corrections and Florida Department of Corrections
Case Number: 6:2019cv01388
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER dismissing case. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/16/2019. (JLC)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Case Management Conference and Report by Florida Department of Corrections. (Gordon, Renee) Modified on 9/16/2019 (BIA).
August 23, 2019 Set/reset deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 9/9/2019 (BIA)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Complaint (Doc. 1-1) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. On or before Monday, September 9, 2019, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint. Failure to timely file will result in closing this case without further notice. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/23/2019. (PKK)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 Remark: Doc. #9 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/21/19. (MT)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Florida Department of Corrections. (Gordon, Renee)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRO SE ORDER. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/7/2019. (ctp) (JLC)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/21/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/7/2019. (JLC)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/7/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Serving Motion to Dismiss on Plaintiff by Florida Department of Corrections (Gordon, Renee) Modified on 8/6/2019 (BIA).
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to dismiss for failing to meet pleading requirements, failing to exhaust administrative remedies, and failing to state a claim by Florida Department of Corrections. (Gordon, Renee) Modified on 8/2/2019 (BIA).
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-1388-Orl-37LRH. (SJB)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Civil Coversheet by Florida Dept. of Corrections (Gordon, Renee) Modified on 7/30/2019 (BIA).
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Circuit Court, case number 2019-ca-5769 filed in State Court on 05/08/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15735999 filed by Florida Department of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents)(Gordon, Renee) Modified on 7/30/2019 (BIA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington, Jr. v. Florida Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Leroy Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Leroy Washington, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Dept. of Corrections
Represented By: Renee Sara Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Department of Corrections
Represented By: Renee Sara Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?