Richter v. Kopuri Orthodontist, P.A.
Plaintiff: Teresa Richter
Defendant: Kopuri Orthodontist, P.A.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01393
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 Remark: Doc. #6 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/7/19. (ESG)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/7/2019. (ctp) (JLC)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/7/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Teresa Richter. (Glasser, David)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Teresa Richter. Related case(s): no (Glasser, David)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Kopuri Orthodontist, P.A.. (DMA)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Teresa Richter. (Glasser, David)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:19-cv-1393-Orl-37EJK. (SJB)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kopuri Orthodontist, P.A. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15739183) filed by Teresa Richter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Glasser, David) Modified on 7/30/2019 (LMM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richter v. Kopuri Orthodontist, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kopuri Orthodontist, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Richter
Represented By: David W. Glasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?