Flagler v. Bethune Cookman University et al
Plaintiff: Marcia Flagler
Defendant: Dr. Dudley, Nadine Heusner, Hubert Grimes and Bethune Cookman University
Case Number: 6:2019cv01438
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint and Pay Filing Fee. The Amended Complaint shall be filed and the filing fee paid on or before October 28, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 9/30/2019. (MB)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by Marcia Flagler. (BIA)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting #3 Report and Recommendations; denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay the filing fee on or before 9/27/19, or this case will be dismissed without further notice. The Complaint #1 is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint as set forth in the Report & Recommendation on or before 9/27/19. Failure to file within the allotted time will result in the closure of this case. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 9/13/2019. (RMF)(Copies mailed).
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/24/2019. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 9/10/2019.(COPIES MAILED). (RMF)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/24/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/10/2019.(COPIES MAILED). (RMF) Modified on 9/11/2019 (BIA).
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. It is RECOMMENDED that the Court: 1. DENY the Motion (Doc. No. 2) and provide Plaintiff with a time period for paying the filing fee; 2. DISMISS the complaint without prejudice; and 3. Grant Plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint within a time established by the Court, with the warning that failure to file an amended complaint within the time permitted by the Court will result in dismissal of the case without further notice. A party has fourteen days from this date to file written objections to the Report and Recommendation's factual findings and legal conclusions. Failure to file written objections waives that party's right to challenge on appeal any unobjected-to factual finding or legal conclusion the district judge adopts from the Report and Recommendation. 11th Cir. R. 3-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 8/19/2019. (MB)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marcia Flagler. (BIA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bethune Cookman University, Dr. Dudley, Hubert Grimes, Nadine Heusner filed by Marcia Flagler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BIA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flagler v. Bethune Cookman University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Dudley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nadine Heusner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hubert Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethune Cookman University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Flagler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?