Mandala v. Tire Stickers LLC et al
Plaintiff: Steven Mandala
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, Michelin North America Inc., Tire Stickers LLC and Keith Ferry
Case Number: 6:2019cv01468
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
2 Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #18 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Michelin North America Inc.. Related case(s): no (Wiggins, Michael)
September 27, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #19 Interested persons order by Michelin North America Inc.. (Wiggins, Michael)
September 26, 2019 Filing 25 Amended CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #19 Interested persons order by Keith Ferry, Tire Stickers LLC. (Jones, Christopher) Modified on 9/27/2019 (BIA).
September 25, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #18 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Steven Mandala. Related case(s): YES (Mandala, Steven)
September 25, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #19 Interested persons order by Steven Mandala. (Mandala, Steven)
September 23, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Incorporate Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Response in Opposition filed by Steven Mandala. (Mandala, Steven)
September 13, 2019 Set/reset deadlines for Michelin North America Inc. Answer due by 10/7/2019. (BIA)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER granting #20 Defendant Michelin North America Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to #1 Complaint. Defendant shall file responsive pleading on or before October 7, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 9/13/2019. (JLE)
September 12, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Michelin North America Inc.. (Wiggins, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/24/2019. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 9/10/2019. (RMF)
September 10, 2019 Filing 18 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/24/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/10/2019. (RMF) Modified on 9/11/2019 (BIA).
September 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE to the Courts to take judicial notice regarding #14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Incorporate Memorandum of Law in Support by Keith Ferry, Tire Stickers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Jones, Christopher)
September 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Keith Ferry, Tire Stickers LLC. Related case(s): yes (Jones, Christopher)
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Keith Ferry, Tire Stickers LLC. (Jones, Christopher)
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Incorporate Memorandum of Law in Support by Keith Ferry, Tire Stickers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jones, Christopher)
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 09/03/2019 by Steven Mandala as to Tire Stickers LLC. (Mandala, Steven)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 09/03/2019 by Steven Mandala as to Keith Ferry. (Mandala, Steven)
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 08/27/2019 by Steven Mandala as to Michelin North America Inc.. (Mandala, Steven)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 8/22/2019. (JLE)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:19-cv-01468 -Orl-78EJK. Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman no longer assigned to the case. Motion REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd: #2 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (ALL)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER transferring case to Magistrate Judge Embry Kidd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 8/13/2019. (MDH)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit A and B re #1 Complaint by Steven Mandala (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(BIA)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (BIA)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Keith Ferry, Michelin North America Inc., Tire Stickers LLC. (BIA)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 PROOF of service re #2 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing, #3 Notice to the Courts to take judicial notice in support by Steven Mandala (BIA)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to the Courts to take judicial notice in support re #1 Complaint by Steven Mandala. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A part 1, #2 Exhibit A part 2)(BIA)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing by Steven Mandala. (BIA)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does 1 through 10, Keith Ferry, Michelin North America Inc., Tire Stickers LLC with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number ORL-84674 filed by Steven Mandala.(BIA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mandala v. Tire Stickers LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelin North America Inc.
Represented By: Colby Nicole Ferris
Represented By: Michael J. Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tire Stickers LLC
Represented By: Christopher Ryan Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Ferry
Represented By: Christopher Ryan Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Mandala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?