Signorello v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Christopher James Signorello
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 6:2019cv01470
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: G Kendall Sharp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (SPM)
August 28, 2019 Filing 17 US Marshal 285 form for Service to the Office of the Regional Chief Counsel. (Fugate, Shea)
August 28, 2019 Filing 16 US Marshal 285 form for Service to US Attorney for the Middle District of Florida. (Fugate, Shea)
August 28, 2019 Filing 15 US Marshal 285 form for Service to the Office of the Regional Chief Counsel. (Fugate, Shea) Modified on 8/28/2019 (SPM).**Wrong PDF-refiled at #17**
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 US Marshal 285 form for Service to the Attorney General of the USA. (Fugate, Shea)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Christopher James Signorello. (Fugate, Shea)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Christopher James Signorello. (Fugate, Shea)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Christopher James Signorello. (Fugate, Shea)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 1 notice by Christopher James Signorello. (Fugate, Shea)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Notice of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Christopher James Signorello. Related case(s): NO (Fugate, Shea)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 8/9/2019. (MB)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 1 notice by Christopher James Signorello. (Fugate, Shea)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Christopher James Signorello. Related case(s): no (Fugate, Shea)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 8/9/2019. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/2010. (SPM)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-1470-Orl-18GJK. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (SJB)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Christopher James Signorello. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Fugate, Shea)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Christopher James Signorello. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fugate, Shea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Signorello v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher James Signorello
Represented By: Shea A. Fugate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?