Bergby v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Bradley Alan Bergby
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 6:2019cv01479
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Daniel C Irick
Referring Judge: G Kendall Sharp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (DMA)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 US Marshal 285 form for Service to US Attorney for the Middle District of Florida. (Fugate, Shea)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 US Marshal 285 form for Service to the Office of the Regional Chief Counsel. (Fugate, Shea)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 US Marshal 285 form for Service to the Attorney General of the USA. (Fugate, Shea)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Bradley Alan Bergby. (Fugate, Shea)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Bradley Alan Bergby. (Fugate, Shea)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Bradley Alan Bergby. (Fugate, Shea)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 1 notice by Bradley Alan Bergby. (Fugate, Shea)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bradley Alan Bergby. Related case(s): NO (Fugate, Shea)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency. Plaintiff's counsel shall obtain the required forms on the ourt's website, and return the completed summons(es) and Marshal 285 form(s) to the Clerk on or before August 27, 2019. The Clerk is directed to provide the completed summons(es) and Marshal 285 form(s) to the United States Marshal. Upon receipt of the completed summons(es) and Marshal 285 form(s), the United States Marshal is directed to serve the summonses without cost to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/12/2019. (DMA)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 8/12/2019. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/2010. (DMA)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-1479-Orl-18DCI. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (SJB)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Bradley Alan Bergby. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Fugate, Shea)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Bradley Alan Bergby. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fugate, Shea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bergby v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Alan Bergby
Represented By: Shea A. Fugate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?