George Pharmacy Inc. v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: George Pharmacy Inc.
Defendant: Uttam Dhillon and William P. Barr
Case Number: 6:2019cv01480
Filed: August 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to close this case - re #41 Notice of voluntary dismissal filed by George Pharmacy Inc. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 10/7/2019. (DJD)
October 4, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by George Pharmacy Inc. (Sommerville, Thomas)
September 24, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Suzanne L. Trimble. (SLT)
September 24, 2019 Filing 39 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction held on 9/13/2019 before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. Court Reporter Suzanne Trimble, trimblecourtreporter@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 10/15/2019, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2019, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2019. (SLT)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying #2 Motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/23/2019. (DJD)
September 18, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Filing Affidavit by William P. Barr, Uttam Dhillon re 35 Order on Motion for Leave to File (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bloor, Jeremy) Modified on 9/19/2019 (SPM).
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ENDORSED ORDER granting #34 Motion to Seal Documents. The Clerk is directed to seal [32-1] Plaintiff's Exhibit. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/18/2019. (TNP)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ENDORSED ORDER granting #33 Federal Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Affidavit. The Federal Defendants have until 5 P.M. on September 18, 2019, to file the affidavit discussed in its Motion. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/18/2019. (TNP)
September 18, 2019 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under seal by George Pharmacy Inc.. (Sommerville, Thomas)
September 17, 2019 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Affidavit and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by William P. Barr, Uttam Dhillon. (Bloor, Jeremy)
September 16, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of filing by George Pharmacy Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sommerville, Thomas) Modified on 9/17/2019 (SPM).
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ENDORSED ORDER granting #29 Motion for Leave to Submit Additional Evidence. Plaintiff has until 5 P.M. on September 17, 2019, to file the additional evidence discussed in its Motion. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/16/2019. (TNP)
September 16, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for leave to file Additional Evidence by George Pharmacy Inc.. (Sommerville, Thomas)
September 13, 2019 Filing 30 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza: MOTION HEARING held on 9/13/2019 re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order and Preliminary Injunction filed by George Pharmacy Inc. Plaintiff's witnesses: Maher Hanna and Bob Parrado; Defendants' witness: Chanda Rollins. Court takes motion under advisement and will issue written order. Court Reporter: Suzanne L. Trimble (DJD)
September 12, 2019 Filing 28 Amended Witness List by William P. Barr, Uttam Dhillon. (Bloor, Jeremy) Modified on 9/13/2019 (SPM).
September 12, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Filing Affidavit of Joey A. Lenseigne by William P. Barr, Uttam Dhillon (Bloor, Jeremy) Modified on 9/13/2019 (SPM).
September 11, 2019 Filing 26 Exhibit List by William P. Barr, Uttam Dhillon. (Bloor, Jeremy)
September 10, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Filing Affidavit by William P. Barr, Uttam Dhillon (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bloor, Jeremy) Modified on 9/11/2019 (SPM).
September 10, 2019 Filing 24 Witness List by William P. Barr, Uttam Dhillon. (Bloor, Jeremy)
September 10, 2019 Filing 23 Exhibit List for Evidentiary Hearing by George Pharmacy Inc.. (Sommerville, Thomas)
September 10, 2019 Filing 22 Witness List by George Pharmacy Inc.. (Sommerville, Thomas)
August 28, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #14 Interested persons order by William P. Barr, Uttam Dhillon. (Bloor, Jeremy)
August 26, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order and Preliminary Injunction filed by William P. Barr, Uttam Dhillon. (Bloor, Jeremy)
August 22, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of evidentiary hearing on #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2019 at 01:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. (DJD) ctp
August 21, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 8/21/2019. Court questions plaintiff regarding claims brought in their motion for preliminary injunction. Court sets evidentiary hearing on plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction at 1:00 p.m. on September 13, 2019. Counsel for Pltf: Thomas D. Somerville; Counsel for Defts: Jeremy Ronald Bloor. Start time: 9:30 a.m; End time: 9:38 a.m. Total time: 8 minutes. Court Reporter: Suzanne L. Trimble (DJD)
August 20, 2019 Filing 17 Proof of service executed on 8/14/19 by George Pharmacy Inc. as to William P. Barr. (Sommerville, Thomas) Modified on 8/21/2019 (SPM).
August 20, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS returned executed by George Pharmacy Inc. US Attorney's Office served on 8/14/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Sommerville, Thomas) Modified on 8/21/2019 (SPM).
August 16, 2019 Filing 15 Proof of service on 8/14/19 as to Uttam Dhillon by George Pharmacy Inc. (Sommerville, Thomas) Modified on 8/21/2019 (SPM).
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by defendants by 8/29/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/15/2019. (DJD) ctp
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Ronald Bloor on behalf of William P. Barr, Uttam Dhillon (Bloor, Jeremy)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to strike #10 Unilateral Consent to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by George Pharmacy Inc. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/13/2019. (DJD)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued as to William P. Barr, Uttam Dhillon, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (SPM)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 **STRICKEN PER #12 ORDER** Unilateral CONSENT to trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge by George Pharmacy Inc. (Sommerville, Thomas) Modified on 8/12/2019 (SPM). Modified on 8/14/2019 (SPM).
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #2 Motion for temporary restraining order. Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 2) is DENIED as to the Temporary Restraining Order. The Court reserves ruling as to the Preliminary Injunction. On or before August 16, 2019, Plaintiff shall serve Defendants with the Complaint, the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, and this Order. On or before August 26, 2019, Defendants shall file a Response to the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. This matter is set for telephonic hearing on August 21, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. before the Honorable Carlos E. Mendoza. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/12/2019. (DJD)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by George Pharmacy Inc.. Related case(s): no (Sommerville, Thomas)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by George Pharmacy Inc.. (Sommerville, Thomas)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/26/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/12/2019. (DJD) ctp
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/26/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 8/12/2019. (DJD) ctp
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-1480-Orl-41GJK. (SJB)
August 10, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in support re #2 Motion for temporary restraining order and Preliminary Injunction filed by George Pharmacy Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Sommerville, Thomas)
August 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for temporary restraining order and Preliminary Injunction by George Pharmacy Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sommerville, Thomas)
August 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against William P. Barr and Uttam Dhillon (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15788997) filed by George Pharmacy Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Sommerville, Thomas) Modified on 8/12/2019 (SPM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George Pharmacy Inc. v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uttam Dhillon
Represented By: Jeremy Ronald Bloor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Represented By: Jeremy Ronald Bloor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Devlin Sommerville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?