Yellow Funding Corp. et al v. West et al
Appellee: Brian West and Melbourne Beach, LLC
Appellant: Pirogee Investments, LLC and Yellow Funding Corp.
Trustee: Jules S. Cohen
Case Number: 6:2019cv01491
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE by Pirogee Investments, LLC, Yellow Funding Corp. re #39 Reply to Response to Motion (Notice of Withdrawal of Document No. 39) (Underwood, Scott) Modified on 10/9/2019 (DJD).
October 8, 2019 Filing 40 SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 MOTION to intervene in This Appeal and for Leave to File Response to Certain Pending Filings filed by Pirogee Investments, LLC, Yellow Funding Corp.. (Underwood, Scott) Modified on 10/9/2019 (DMA).
October 8, 2019 Filing 39 **DUPLICATE FILING. SEE DOC. #40** SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 MOTION to intervene in This Appeal and for Leave to File Response to Certain Pending Filings filed by Pirogee Investments, LLC, Yellow Funding Corp.. (Underwood, Scott) Modified on 10/9/2019 (DMA).
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ENDORSED ORDER granting #37 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. On or before October 8, 2019, Appellants may file a Sur-Reply of five or fewer pages. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 10/4/2019. (KMS)
October 3, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for leave to file to File Sur Reply by Pirogee Investments, LLC, Yellow Funding Corp.. (Underwood, Scott)
October 2, 2019 Filing 36 Response to Motion re #1 MOTION for leave to appeal, #4 Emergency MOTION to stay Bankruptcy Case Pending Appeal of Order Denying Disputed Owners' Motion to Dismiss and Directing Appointment of a Chapter 11 Trustee filed by Jules S. Cohen. (Miller, Samual) Modified on 10/3/2019 (DMA).
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ENDORSED ORDER denying #32 Motion for Reconsideration. It will be helpful to the Court to hear from the Trustee on the currently-pending issues and the delay is minor. In the event that Appellant's Motion to Stay is granted, the Court will be willing to entertain additional motions regarding the Trustee's participation in this litigation. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 10/1/2019. (KMS)
September 30, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of docketing bankruptcy record on appeal advising counsel to comply with Rule 8018. Notice of appeal filed in U.S. District Court on 8/13/2019. (DMA)
September 27, 2019 Filing 33 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal received consisting of items as designated on transmittal including: filed by Pirogee Investments, LLC, Yellow Funding Corp..(Attachments: #1 2 6-17-bk-07975 Docket Sheet, #2 3 6-17-bk-07975 Order Denying Motion to Dismiss and Directing Appt. of Ch. 11 Trustee Doc. No. 383, #3 4 6-17-bk-07975 Appelants Designation of Appeal Doc. No. 410, #4 5 6-17-bk-07975 Appellee Designation of contents Doc. No. 437, #5 6-17-bk-07975-Docket_000228_Transcript Regarding Hearing Held 8-8-18 Doc. No. 228, #6 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000001_Voluntary_Petition_under_Chapter_11, #7 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000005_Part_1_Chapter_11_Case_Management_Summary_Filed_by_James_W_Elliott_on_behalf_of_Debtor_Melbourne, #8 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000005_Part_2_Mailing_Matrix, #9 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000016_Amended_Voluntary_Petition_Reason_for_Amendment, #10 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000021_Motion_to_Dismiss_Case__Motion_for_Abstention_Under_Section_305_Filed_by_Brett_D_Lieberm, #11 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000022_Part_1_Corrective_Motion_for_Preliminary_Injunction_Relief_and_to_Extend_Stay_Emergency_related, #12 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000022_Part_2_Exhibit_Brian_West_Motion_for_Leave_to_File_Second_Amended_Complaint-_With_Secon, #13 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000022_Part_3_Exhibit_Brian_West_Motion_for_Leave_to_File_Second_Amended_Complaint-_With_Secon, #14 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000022_Part_4_Exhibit_Brian_West_Motion_for_Leave_to_File_Second_Amended_Complaint-_With_Secon, #15 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000022_Part_5_Exhibit_Defendants_Answer_to_Second_Amended_Complaint_and_Second_Amended_C, #16 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000022_Part_6_Exhibit_Defendants_Answer_to_Second_Amended_Complaint_and_Second_Amended_C, #17 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000022_Part_7_Exhibit_Defendants_Answer_to_Second_Amended_Complaint_and_Second_Amended_C, #18 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000022_Part_8_Exhibit_Defendants_Answer_to_Second_Amended_Complaint_and_Second_Amended_C, #19 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000022_Part_9_Mailing_Matrix, #20 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000022_Part_10_Exhibit_Defendants_Answer_to_Second_Amended_Complaint_and_Second_Amended_C, #21 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000038_Part_1_Application_to_Employ_Marcus__Millichap_as_Real_Estate_Broker_Filed_by_Katie_Brinson_Hin, #22 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000038_Part_2_Exhibit_A-_Affidavit_of_Brian_Capo_in_support_of_Application_to_Employ_Marcus, #23 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000038_Part_3_Exhibit_B_-_Represent_Agreement, #24 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000038_Part_4_Mailing_Matrix, #25 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000044_Part_1_Application_to_Employ_Wald__Cohen_PA_as_Accountant_Filed_by_James_W_Elliott_on_behalf, #26 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000044_Part_2_Exhibit_A_-_Affidavit_of_Albert_A_Cohen_CPA, #27 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000044_Part_3_Mailing_Matrix, #28 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000045_Financial_Reports_for_the_Period_January_1_2018_to_January_31_2018_Filed_by_James_W_Ell, #29 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000054_Part_1_Unopposed_Motion_for_Leave_to_Withdraw_as_Counsel_Contains_negative_notice_Filed_by_Katie, #30 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000054_Part_2_Mailing_Matrix, #31 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000055_Response_to, #32 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000058_Objection_to_Debtors_Application_to_Employ_Marcus__Millichap_as_Real_Estate_Broker_Filed, #33 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000059_Objection_to_Debtors_Application_to_Employ_Wald__Cohen_PA_Filed_by_Brett_D_Lieberman, #34 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000060_Response_to, #35 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000073_Disclosure_Statement_Filed_by_Justin_M_Luna_on_behalf_of_Debtor_Melbourne_Beach_LLC, #36 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000074_Chapter_11_Plan_of_Reorganization__Filed_by_Justin_M_Luna_on_behalf_of_Debtor_Melbourne, #37 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000083_Part_1_Application_for_Compensation_of_McIntyre_Thanasides_Bringgold_Elliott_Grimaldi_Guito__Mat, #38 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000083_Part_2_Exhibit_A_-_Summary_of_Time_by_Timekeeper, #39 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000083_Part_3_Exhibit_B_-_Summary_of_Time_by_Activity_Phases, #40 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000083_Part_4_Exhibit_C_-_Detail_Description_of_Time, #41 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000083_Part_5_Exhibit_D_-_Detail_of_Expenses, #42 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000083_Part_6_Exhibit_E_-_Description_of_Timekeeper_Experience, #43 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000083_Part_7_Mailing_Matrix, #44 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000087_Notice_of_Filing_DefendantsCounter-Plaintiffs_Amended_Motion_for_Leave_to_File_Amended_An_Part1, #45 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000087_Notice_of_Filing_DefendantsCounter-Plaintiffs_Amended_Motion_for_Leave_to_File_Amended_An_Part2, #46 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000087_Notice_of_Filing_DefendantsCounter-Plaintiffs_Amended_Motion_for_Leave_to_File_Amended_An_Part3, #47 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000088_Reply_to_Debtors_Response_in_Opposition_to_Motion_to_Dismiss_Chapter_11_Bankruptcy_Case_fo, #48 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000093_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Justin_Luna_Dor_Daniel_Valazquez_D, #49 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000100_Motion_for_an_Order_Referring_Case_to_Mediation_Filed_by_Daniel_A_Velasquez_on_behalf_of_D, #50 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000111_Motion_to_Extend_Time_to_File_Proof_of_Claim_Filed_by_Thomas_M_Messana_on_behalf_of_Jacob, #51 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000112_Objection_to_Application_of_McIntyre_Thanasides_Bringgold_Elliott_Grimaldi_Guito__Matthew, #52 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000115_Objection_to_Disclosure_Statement_Filed_by_Thomas_M_Messana_on_behalf_of_Jacob_Fishman_El, #53 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000116_Objection_to_Application_of_Melbourne_Beach_LLC_to_Employ_Justin_M_Luna_and_the_Law_Fir, #54 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000124_Motion for Appointment of an Examiner, #55 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000128_Order_Directing_Mediation, #56 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000129_Objection_to_Motion_to_Assume_Unexpired_Lease_for_Non-Residential_Real_Property_with_Texas, #57 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000134_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Extend_Time_to_File_Proof_of_Claim, #58 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000135_Order_Granting_Motion_To_Assume_Unexpired_Lease_for_Non-Residential_Real_Property_with_Tex, #59 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000146_Notice_of_Filing_Proof_of_Interest_Filed_by_Andrew_M_Brumby_on_behalf_of_Other_Prof_Brian, #60 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000147_Notice_of_Filing_Proof_of_Interest_Filed_by_Thomas_M_Messana_on_behalf_of_Stockholder_Piro, #61 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000148_Notice_of_Filing_Proof_of_Interest_Filed_by_Thomas_M_Messana_on_behalf_of_Creditor_Yellow, #62 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000149_Notice_of_Filing_Proof_of_Interest_of_David_Kalichman_Filed_by_Thomas_M_Messana_on_behalf, #63 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000150_Notice_of_Filing_Proof_of_Interest_Filed_by_Thomas_M_Messana_on_behalf_of_Creditor_Elena_P, #64 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000151_Notice_of_Filing_Proof_of_Interest_Filed_by_Thomas_M_Messana_on_behalf_of_Creditor_Ilya_Pa, #65 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000153_Motion_Pirogee_Investments_LLC_And_Yellow_Funding_Corps_Motion_for_Relief_from_Stay, #66 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000156_Notice_of_Mediation_Results_Filed_by_Harley_E_Riedel_on_behalf_of_Mediator_Harley_Riedel, #67 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000163_Joint_Motion_to_Approve_Compromise_of_Controversy_or_Settlement_Agreement_Related_Case_an, #68 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000164_Financial_Reports_for_the_Period_April_1_2018_to_April_30_2018_Filed_by_Justin_M_Luna, #69 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000170_Financial_Reports_for_the_Period_May_1_2018_to_May_31_2018_Filed_by_Justin_M_Luna_on_b, #70 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000171_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Justin_Luna, #71 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000174_Order_Granting_Joint_Motion_to_Approve_Compromise_or_Settlement_BY_MELBOURNE_BEACH_LLC_B, #72 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000180_Order by District Court on Appeal, #73 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000182_Motion_to_Compel_Turnover_Filed_by_Donald_R_Kirk_on_behalf_of_Creditor_DANIEL_J_STERMER, #74 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000186_Objection_to_Debtors_Application_to_Employ_Carlton_Fields_Jorden_Burt_PA_As_Counsel_fo, #75 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000188_Response_to_Objection_to_Employment_of_Carlton_Fields, #76 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000193_Order_Granting_In_Part_Motion_To_Compel_Turnover_of_Documents_and_Records_of_the_Debtor_wi, #77 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000197_Order_Granting_Ore_Tenus_Motion_to_Withdraw_as_Counsel_for_Brian_West_Service_Instructions, #78 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000200_Part_1_Report, #79 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000200_Part_2_Mailing_Matrix, #80 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000208_Notice_of_Filing_Payoff_Letter_Agreement_Filed_by_Donald_R_Kirk_on_behalf_of_Creditor_DANI, #81 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000225_Part_1_Report, #82 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000225_Part_2_Mailing_Matrix, #83 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000229_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_9-26-18_on_Re_Melbourne_Beach_LLC_To_purchase_a_copy, #84 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000230_Notice_Regarding_Filing_of_Transcript_and_Deadline_for_Filing_Notice_of_Intent_to_Request, #85 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000238_Part_1_Expedited_Motion_to_Sell_Property_Free_and_Clear_of_Liens_Property_description_Ocean_Spr, #86 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000238_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #87 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000238_Part_3_Mailing_Matrix, #88 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000239_Part_1_Amended_Motion_for_Approval_of_Bidding_Procedures_Form_of_Asset_Purchase_Agreement_Appro, #89 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000239_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #90 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000239_Part_3_Mailing_Matrix, #91 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000242_Part_1_Notice_of_Filing_Executory_Contracts__Cure_Schedule_Filed_by_Donald_R_Kirk_on_behalf_of_C, #92 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000242_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #93 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000242_Part_3_Mailing_Matrix, #94 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000243_Amended_Motion_to_Sell_Property_Free_and_Clear_of_Liens_Property_description_real_proper, #95 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000245_Notice_of_Appearance_and_Request_for_Notice__and_Notice_of_Limited_Objection_to_CRO_Sterm, #96 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000249_Part_1_Limited_Objection_to_Amended_Bid_Procedures_Motion_Filed_by_Richard_B_Weinman_on_behalf_of, #97 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000249_Part_2_Exhibit_Exhibit_A, #98 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000249_Part_3_Exhibit_Exhibit_B, #99 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000250_Objection_to_Amended_Sale_Procedures_Motion_Filed_by_US_Trustee_United_States_Trustee_-, #100 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000253_Motion_to_Dismiss_Case_or_Convert_Case_to_Chapter_7_Filed_by_US_Trustee_United_States_T, #101 6-17-bk-07975_Docket_000254_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Audrey_Aleskovsky, #102 6-1
September 27, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Reconsideration re 31 Order on Motion to Intervene And For Leave To File Response to Certain Pending Pleadings by Pirogee Investments, LLC, Yellow Funding Corp.. (Underwood, Scott)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ENDORSED ORDER granting #30 Motion to Intervene. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24, Trustee Jules S. Cohen is permitted to intervene in this matter. On or before Wednesday, October 2, 2019, the Trustee may file a Response of twenty or fewer pages to the parties filings at Doc. Nos 1-1, 4, 12, 18, and 26. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/26/2019. (KMS)
September 24, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to intervene in This Appeal and for Leave to File Response to Certain Pending Filings by Jules S. Cohen. (Miller, Samual)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ENDORSED ORDER denying #27 Brian West's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/23/2019. (TNP)
September 22, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION for leave to file Sur-Reply Regarding Appellants' Motion to Stay Bankruptcy Case Pending Appeal and Motion for Leave to Appeal filed by Pirogee Investments, LLC, Yellow Funding Corp.. (Underwood, Scott)
September 20, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for leave to file Sur-Reply Regarding Appellants' Motion to Stay Bankruptcy Case Pending Appeal and Motion for Leave to Appeal by Brian West. (Weinman, Richard)
September 12, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1 MOTION for leave to appeal, #4 Emergency MOTION to stay Bankruptcy Case Pending Appeal of Order Denying Disputed Owners' Motion to Dismiss and Directing Appointment of a Chapter 11 Trustee filed by Pirogee Investments, LLC, Yellow Funding Corp.. (Underwood, Scott)
September 11, 2019 Filing 25 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal received consisting of items as designated on transmittal including: Transmittal of Motion for Leave to Interlocutory Appeal (Attachments: #1 Docket No. 387 motion for leave to appeal, #2 Docket Sheet)filed by Pirogee Investments, LLC, Yellow Funding Corp..(RMH)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER granting #22 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply. On or before September 12, 2019, Appellant may file a consolidated Reply of ten or fewer pages. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/4/2019. (KMS)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 Motion to Extend Length Limits. The Court accepts Appellant's Motion for Leave to Appeal (Doc. 1-1) as properly filed. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/4/2019. (KMS)
September 4, 2019 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Reply and to Amend Prior Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply by Pirogee Investments, LLC, Yellow Funding Corp.. (Underwood, Scott)
September 4, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , to Extend Length Limits and Accommodate Format Requirements for Motion for Leave to Appeal, Nunc Pro Tunc to August 8, 2019, or, in the Alternative, for a Finding that Movants Have Complied with Applicable Length Limits and Format Requirements by Pirogee Investments, LLC, Yellow Funding Corp.. (Underwood, Scott)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply. On or before September 6, 2019, Appellants may file a Reply of six or fewer pages. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/29/2019. (KMS)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion to Extend Length Limits. The Court accepts Appellant's Emergency Motion to Stay (Doc. 4) as properly filed. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/29/2019. (KMS)
August 28, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal and [1-1) Motion for Leave to Appeal filed by Brian West. (Weinman, Richard)
August 28, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by Brian West. (Weinman, Richard)
August 28, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Reply re #12 Response in Opposition by Pirogee Investments, LLC, Yellow Funding Corp.. (Underwood, Scott) Modified on 8/28/2019 (DMA).
August 27, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Declaration of Scott A. Underwood in Support of re #4 Emergency MOTION to stay Bankruptcy Case Pending Appeal of Order Denying Disputed Owners' Motion to Dismiss and Directing Appointment of a Chapter 11 Trustee by Pirogee Investments, LLC, Yellow Funding Corp. (Underwood, Scott) Modified on 8/28/2019 (DMA).
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (to Extend Length Limits for Emergency Motion to Stay Bankruptcy Case Pending Appeal of Order Denying Disputed Owners' Motion to Dismiss and Directing Appointment of a Chapter 11 Trustee, Nunc Pro Tunc to August 14, 2019 or, in the Alternative, For a Finding that the Movants Have Complied with Applicable Length Limits) by Pirogee Investments, LLC, Yellow Funding Corp.. (Underwood, Scott)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Brian West. Related case(s): Yes (Weinman, Richard)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Hearing re #4 Emergency MOTION to stay, #4 Emergency MOTION to stay Bankruptcy Case Pending Appeal of Order Denying Disputed Owners' Motion to Dismiss and Directing Appointment of a Chapter 11 Trustee filed by Brian West. (Weinman, Richard) Modified on 8/27/2019 (DMA).
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of filing Designation of Record on Appeal and Statement of Issues on Appeal by Pirogee Investments, LLC, Yellow Funding Corp. re #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal, #2 Related case order and track 1 notice (Murray, Megan) Modified on 8/23/2019 (DMA).
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by Pirogee Investments, LLC, Yellow Funding Corp.. (Underwood, Scott)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Pirogee Investments, LLC, Yellow Funding Corp.. Related case(s): yes (Underwood, Scott)
August 21, 2019 Set/reset deadlines as to: #4 Emergency MOTION to stay, #6 MOTION for Hearing re #4 Emergency MOTION to stay. West may file his Responses on or before noon on August 26, 2019. (DMA)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion by Brian West for Extension of Time. West may file his Responses on or before noon on August 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/21/2019. (KMS)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION for Hearing re #4 Emergency MOTION to stay Bankruptcy Case Pending Appeal of Order Denying Disputed Owners' Motion to Dismiss and Directing Appointment of a Chapter 11 Trustee , #4 Emergency MOTION to stay Bankruptcy Case Pending Appeal of Order Denying Disputed Owners' Motion to Dismiss and Directing Appointment of a Chapter 11 Trustee by Brian West. (Weinman, Richard)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Hearing re #4 Emergency MOTION to stay Bankruptcy Case Pending Appeal of Order Denying Disputed Owners' Motion to Dismiss and Directing Appointment of a Chapter 11 Trustee by Pirogee Investments, LLC, Yellow Funding Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Underwood, Scott)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Appendix of Key Documents by Pirogee Investments, LLC, Yellow Funding Corp. re #4 Emergency MOTION to stay Bankruptcy Case Pending Appeal of Order Denying Disputed Owners' Motion to Dismiss and Directing Appointment of a Chapter 11 Trustee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Underwood, Scott) Modified on 8/15/2019 (DMA).
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION to stay Bankruptcy Case Pending Appeal of Order Denying Disputed Owners' Motion to Dismiss and Directing Appointment of a Chapter 11 Trustee by Pirogee Investments, LLC, Yellow Funding Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Underwood, Scott)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/28/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/14/2019. (DJD) ctp
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/28/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/14/2019. (DJD) ctp
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by Pirogee Investments, LLC, Yellow Funding Corp.. Bankruptcy Court case number 6:17-bk-07975-KSJ. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 8/08/2019. (Attachments: #1 Motion for leave to appeal, #2 Transmittal of Notice to District Court)(DMA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yellow Funding Corp. et al v. West et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Brian West
Represented By: Richard Brian Weinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Melbourne Beach, LLC
Represented By: Justin Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Pirogee Investments, LLC
Represented By: Scott Underwood
Represented By: Megan Wilson Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Yellow Funding Corp.
Represented By: Scott Underwood
Represented By: Megan Wilson Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Jules S. Cohen
Represented By: Jules S. Cohen
Represented By: Samual A Miller
Represented By: Esther Anna McKean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?