JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. ASG Computer & Reprographic, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Alex Silva, ASG Computer & Reprographic, Inc. and Armando Silva
Case Number: 6:2019cv01527
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part #19 Amended Motion for Extension of Time to Conduct Case Management Conference. The deadline to conduct the Case Management Conference is 11/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 10/7/2019. (Irick, Daniel)
October 7, 2019 Filing 19 Amended MOTION to extend time to Conduct Case Management Conference by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (O'Malley, Drew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #17 Motion for Extension of Time. The Motion is neither signed nor dated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 10/7/2019. (Irick, Daniel)
October 7, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to extend time to Conduct Case Management Conference by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (O'Malley, Drew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
October 3, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN of service executed on 9/25/19 by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. as to Alex Silva (O'Malley, Drew) Modified on 10/4/2019 (DMA).
September 24, 2019 Filing 15 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Armando Silva (BIA)
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ASG Computer & Reprographic, Inc. (BIA)
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Armando Silva by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (O'Malley, Drew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against ASG Computer & Reprographic, Inc. by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (O'Malley, Drew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF of service by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (O'Malley, Drew)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF of service by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (O'Malley, Drew)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 Remark: Doc. #7 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/6/19. (EJV)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Related case(s): no (O'Malley, Drew)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co - Parent of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A... (O'Malley, Drew)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/5/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/22/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/5/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/22/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract against ASG Computer & Reprographic, Inc., Armando Silva, Alex Silva filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(O'Malley, Drew)
August 19, 2019 Set/reset deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 8/23/2019 (BIA)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/19/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to ASG Computer & Reprographic, Inc., Armando Silva, Alex Silva. (Mailed to counsel for service) (BIA)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ASG Computer & Reprographic, Inc., Armando Silva, Alex Silva Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number ORL-84839 filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(BIA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. ASG Computer & Reprographic, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASG Computer & Reprographic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armando Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Drew P. O'Malley
Represented By: Natalie P. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?