Fernandez et al v. Halifx Hospital Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Keith Fernandez and National Diagnostic Solutions LLC
Defendant: Dr. Eric Santos, Terri F. Parsons, Chase C. Parsons, Dr. Fernando Silvestre, Volusia County Sheriff's Office, Christian J. Funk, Tom Verzi, Jack A. Funk, Michael J. Chitwood, Chris L. Parsons, Chad M. Parsons, Aaron D. Rasmussen, Jason Rasmussen, Winter Park YMCA Family Center, Chandler E. Parsons, Kathryn D. Weston, Michael J. Snure, P.A., Tyler C. Snure, David R. Rasmussen, Halifx Hospital Medical Center, Daytona Beach Police Department, Winter Park Golf Club, Gary C. Parsons, Craig Capri, Christine A. Funk, Michael J. Snure, Helene F. Rasmussen, Jennifer C. Funk and Halifax Hospital Medical Center
Case Number: 6:2019cv01627
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 94 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order AMENDED by Christine A. Funk, Jack A. Funk. (Chapman, Victor)
October 24, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jennifer C. Funk. Related case(s): y (Chapman, Victor)
October 24, 2019 Filing 92 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Jennifer C. Funk. (Chapman, Victor)
October 24, 2019 Filing 91 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Jennifer C. Funk. (Chapman, Victor)
October 24, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Victor L. Chapman on behalf of Jennifer C. Funk (Chapman, Victor)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #85 UNOPPOSED MOTION OF DEFENDANTS' JACK A. FUNK, CHRISTINA A. FUNK, KATHRYN D. WESTON AND WINTER PINES GOLF CLUB TO MODIFY CERTAIN REQUIREMENTS SPECIFIED IN THE RELATED CASE ORDER AND TRACK TWO NOTICE (DOC. 3) FOR CONDUCTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW. The parties may conduct the case management conference on or before October 30, 2019. Counsel may appear by telephone, provided the parties agree on the essentials of the Case Management Report. Otherwise, the parties shall meet in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 10/21/2019. (HMK)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #23 DEFENDANT JUDGE WESTON'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND FILE NOTICE OF PENDENCY. Judge Weston's Motion to Dismiss is deemed timely filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 10/17/2019. (HMK)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER denying #76 DEFENDANTS, HALIFAX HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, ERIC SANTOS, M.D., AND FERNANDO SILVESTRE, M.D.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 10/17/2019. (HMK)
October 15, 2019 Filing 86 RETURN of service executed on 10/04/2019 by National Diagnostic Solutions LLC, Keith Fernandez as to Jennifer C. Funk. (BIA)
October 14, 2019 Filing 85 Unopposed MOTION to modify Certain Requirements of Related Case Order and Track Two Notice (Doc. 3) by Christine A. Funk, Jack A. Funk, Kathryn D. Weston, Winter Park Golf Club. (Chapman, Victor)
October 14, 2019 Filing 84 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Kathryn D. Weston. (Rives, Marie)
October 9, 2019 Filing 83 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Chandler E. Parsons, Chase C. Parsons, Chris L. Parsons, Gary C. Parsons, Terri F. Parsons. (Shapiro, Lyle)
October 9, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Chandler E. Parsons, Chase C. Parsons, Chris L. Parsons, Gary C. Parsons, Terri F. Parsons. Related case(s): no (Shapiro, Lyle)
October 9, 2019 Filing 81 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Chandler E. Parsons, Chase C. Parsons, Chris L. Parsons, Gary C. Parsons, Terri F. Parsons. (Shapiro, Lyle)
October 8, 2019 Filing 80 MOTION to Dismiss All Cliams Against All Defendants by National Diagnostic Solutions LLC. (BIA)
October 8, 2019 Filing 79 RESPONSE in Opposition re #58 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Motion to Strike filed by Keith Fernandez. (BIA)
October 8, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. Livingston on behalf of David R. Rasmussen, Aaron D. Rasmussen, Helene F. Rasmussen, Jason Rasmussen (Livingston, Scott)
October 7, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by David R. Rasmussen, Aaron D. Rasmussen, Helene F. Rasmussen, Jason Rasmussen. (Livingston, Scott)
October 4, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION for leave to file Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Halifax Hospital Medical Center, Eric Santos, Fernando Silvestre. (Woersching, Holly)
October 3, 2019 Filing 75 RESPONSE in Opposition re #56 MOTION to Dismiss complaint filed by Keith Fernandez. (BIA)
October 3, 2019 Filing 74 RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 MOTION to Dismiss complaint filed by Keith Fernandez. (BIA)
October 2, 2019 Filing 73 RESPONSE in Opposition re #50 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Keith Fernandez. (BIA)
October 2, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Correction to Certificates of Service by Tom Verzi, Winter Park YMCA Family Center (Flood, Joseph) Modified on 10/3/2019, to correct docket text. (SPB).
October 2, 2019 Filing 71 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint & Quash Service of Process by Tom Verzi, Winter Park YMCA Family Center. (Conner, Jessica)
October 2, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Craig Capri, Daytona Beach Police Department. Related case(s): no (Glassman, Gary)
October 2, 2019 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Craig Capri, Daytona Beach Police Department. (Glassman, Gary)
October 2, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Tom Verzi, Winter Park YMCA Family Center. Related case(s): yes (Conner, Jessica)
October 2, 2019 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Tom Verzi, Winter Park YMCA Family Center. (Conner, Jessica)
October 2, 2019 Filing 63 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Law by Winter Park Golf Club. (James, Jeffrey)
October 2, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Christy Conner on behalf of Tom Verzi, Winter Park YMCA Family Center (Conner, Jessica)
October 2, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Flood, Jr on behalf of Tom Verzi, Winter Park YMCA Family Center (Flood, Joseph) Modified on 10/2/2019 (RDO).
October 1, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Errata re #1 Complaint by Keith Fernandez (BIA)
October 1, 2019 Filing 69 RESPONSE in Opposition re #48 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Keith Fernandez. (BIA)
October 1, 2019 Filing 68 RESPONSE in Opposition re #49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Keith Fernandez. (BIA)
October 1, 2019 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Michael J. Snure, PA(a Florida professional association ), Michael J. Snure, Tyler C. Snure. (Stovash, Robert)
October 1, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Michael J. Snure, PA(a Florida professional association ), Michael J. Snure, Tyler C. Snure. Related case(s): Yes (Stovash, Robert)
October 1, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Motion to Strike by Michael J. Snure, PA(a Florida professional association ), Michael J. Snure, Tyler C. Snure. (Stovash, Robert)
October 1, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss complaint by Christine A. Funk. (Chapman, Victor)
October 1, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION to Dismiss complaint by Jack A. Funk. (Chapman, Victor)
October 1, 2019 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Christine A. Funk, Jack A. Funk. (Chapman, Victor)
October 1, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Christine A. Funk, Jack A. Funk. (Chapman, Victor)
October 1, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Victor L. Chapman on behalf of Christine A. Funk, Jack A. Funk (Chapman, Victor)
September 30, 2019 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Keith Fernandez, National Diagnostic Solutions LLC. (BIA)
September 30, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Law by Winter Park Golf Club. (James, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2019 Filing 50 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Chad M. Parsons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Morello, Frederick)
September 27, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Halifax Hospital Medical Center, Eric Santos, Fernando Silvestre. (Woersching, Holly) Modified on 9/30/2019 (MAA).
September 27, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Craig Capri, Daytona Beach Police Department. (Glassman, Gary)
September 26, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kathryn D. Weston. Related case(s): yes (Rives, Marie)
September 26, 2019 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Kathryn D. Weston. (Rives, Marie)
September 26, 2019 Filing 45 RETURN of service executed on 9/19/2019 by Keith Fernandez as to Chris L. Parsons. (SPM)
September 26, 2019 Filing 44 RETURN of service executed on 9/19/2019 by Keith Fernandez as to Chandler E. Parsons. (SPM)
September 26, 2019 Filing 43 RETURN of service executed on 9/19/2019 by Keith Fernandez as to Terri F. Parsons. (SPM)
September 26, 2019 Filing 42 RETURN of service executed on 9/19/2019 by Keith Fernandez as to Gary C. Parsons. (SPM)
September 26, 2019 Filing 41 RETURN of service executed on 9/19/2019 by Keith Fernandez as to Chase C. Parsons. (SPM)
September 26, 2019 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Keith Fernandez. (SPM)
September 26, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Keith Fernandez. Related case(s): yes (SPM)
September 26, 2019 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Michael J. Chitwood, Volusia County Sheriff's Office. (Bledsoe, William)
September 26, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Michael J. Chitwood, Volusia County Sheriff's Office. Related case(s): yes (Bledsoe, William)
September 26, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Michael J. Chitwood, Volusia County Sheriff's Office. (Bledsoe, William)
September 26, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary M. Glassman on behalf of Craig Capri, Daytona Beach Police Department (Glassman, Gary)
September 26, 2019 Filing 34 AMENDED document by Chad M. Parsons. Amendment to #31 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement . (Morello, Frederick)
September 26, 2019 Filing 33 AMENDED document by Chad M. Parsons. Amendment to #32 Notice of pendency of related cases . (Morello, Frederick)
September 25, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Chad M. Parsons. (Morello, Frederick)
September 25, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Chad M. Parsons. (Morello, Frederick)
September 25, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Halifx Hospital Medical Center, Eric Santos, Fernando Silvestre identifying Corporate Parent Halifax Hospital Medical Center for Eric Santos, Fernando Silvestre, Halifx Hospital Medical Center.. (Woersching, Holly)
September 25, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Halifx Hospital Medical Center, Eric Santos, Fernando Silvestre. Related case(s): No (Woersching, Holly)
September 24, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Winter Park Golf Club. (James, Jeffrey)
September 24, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Winter Park Golf Club. Related case(s): yes (James, Jeffrey)
September 24, 2019 Filing 26 RETURN of service executed on 09/14/2019 by Keith Fernandez as to Helene F. Rasmussen. (BIA)
September 24, 2019 Filing 25 RETURN of service executed on 09/14/2019 by Keith Fernandez as to David R. Rasmussen. (BIA)
September 24, 2019 Filing 24 RETURN of service executed on 09/13/2019 by Keith Fernandez as to Tyler C. Snure. (BIA)
September 24, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 Related case order and track 2 notice, #1 Complaint by Kathryn D. Weston. (Rives, Marie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
September 24, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Julia Woersching on behalf of Halifx Hospital Medical Center, Eric Santos, Fernando Silvestre (Woersching, Holly)
September 24, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. James on behalf of Winter Park Golf Club (James, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick C. Morello on behalf of Chad M. Parsons (Morello, Frederick)
September 20, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Marie T. Rives on behalf of Kathryn D. Weston (Rives, Marie)
September 17, 2019 Filing 18 RETURN of service executed on 09/06/19 by Keith Fernandez as to Craig Capri. (JP)
September 17, 2019 Filing 17 RETURN of service executed on 09/06/19 by Keith Fernandez as to Kathryn D. Weston. (JP)
September 17, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN of service executed on 09/06/19 by Keith Fernandez as to Halifx Hospital Medical Center. (JP)
September 17, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN of service executed on 09/06/19 by Keith Fernandez as to Fernando Silvestre. (JP)
September 17, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 09/06/19 by Keith Fernandez as to Eric Santos. (JP)
September 17, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 09/07/19 by Keith Fernandez as to Chad M. Parsons. (JP)
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 09/06/19 by Keith Fernandez as to Michael J. Chitwood. (JP)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 09/06/19 by Keith Fernandez as to Michael J. Snure, PA(a Florida professional association ). (JP)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 09/6/19 by Keith Fernandez as to Michael J. Snure. (JP)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 09/06/19 by Keith Fernandez as to Christine A. Funk. (JP)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 09/06/19 by Keith Fernandez as to Jack A. Funk. (JP)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 09/06/19 by Keith Fernandez as to Winter Park YMCA Family Center. (JP)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 09/06/19 by Keith Fernandez as to Winter Park Golf Club. (JP)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on 09/11/19 by Keith Fernandez as to Tom Verzi. (JP)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/26/2019. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 9/12/2019. (copy mailed)(AKC)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/26/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/12/2019. (copy mailed)(AKC)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Michael J. Chitwood, Daytona Beach Police Department, Christian J. Funk, Jack A. Funk, Jennifer C. Funk, Halifx Hospital Medical Center, Chad M. Parsons, Chandler E. Parsons, Chase C. Parsons, Chris L. Parsons, Gary C. Parsons, David R. Rasmussen, Aaron D. Rasmussen, Jason Rasmussen, Eric Santos, Fernando Silvestre, Michael J. Snure, PA(a Florida professional association ), Michael J. Snure, Tyler C. Snure, Tom Verzi, Kathryn D. Weston, Winter Park Golf Club. (Originals were mailed back to plaintiff.) (JP)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number ORL085029 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-29)(JP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernandez et al v. Halifx Hospital Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Eric Santos
Represented By: Holly Julia Woersching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri F. Parsons
Represented By: Krystina Trogolo Endara
Represented By: Lyle E. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase C. Parsons
Represented By: Krystina Trogolo Endara
Represented By: Lyle E. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Fernando Silvestre
Represented By: Holly Julia Woersching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volusia County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: William K. Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian J. Funk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Verzi
Represented By: Joseph R. Flood, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica Christy Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack A. Funk
Represented By: Victor L. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Chitwood
Represented By: William K. Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris L. Parsons
Represented By: Krystina Trogolo Endara
Represented By: Lyle E. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad M. Parsons
Represented By: Frederick C. Morello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron D. Rasmussen
Represented By: Scott A. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Rasmussen
Represented By: Scott A. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winter Park YMCA Family Center
Represented By: Joseph R. Flood, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica Christy Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chandler E. Parsons
Represented By: Krystina Trogolo Endara
Represented By: Lyle E. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn D. Weston
Represented By: Marie T. Rives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Snure, P.A.
Represented By: Robert J. Stovash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler C. Snure
Represented By: Robert J. Stovash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David R. Rasmussen
Represented By: Scott A. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halifx Hospital Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daytona Beach Police Department
Represented By: Gary M. Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winter Park Golf Club
Represented By: Jeffrey M. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary C. Parsons
Represented By: Krystina Trogolo Endara
Represented By: Lyle E. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Capri
Represented By: Gary M. Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine A. Funk
Represented By: Victor L. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Snure
Represented By: Robert J. Stovash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helene F. Rasmussen
Represented By: Scott A. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer C. Funk
Represented By: Victor L. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halifax Hospital Medical Center
Represented By: Holly Julia Woersching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Diagnostic Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?