Melnicki v. Dolly Scully et al
Plaintiff: richard melnicki
Defendant: Property Marketers LLC, Donna Sprague and Dolly Scully
Case Number: 6:2019cv01715
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Reset deadline: for Property Marketers LLC, Dolly Scully(Individually), Dolly Scully(as Trustee of the Anderson Scully Trust), Donna Sprague. Answer due by 11/18/2019. (EJS)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Defendants' Amended Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants shall answer or respond to #4 Plaintiff's Complaint on or before November 18, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 10/28/2019. (RMN)
October 25, 2019 Filing 14 Amended Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to November 18, 2019, to File Answer re #4 Complaint by All Defendants. (Hyde, Brett) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. Modified on 10/28/2019 (SPM).
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #12 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. The motion fails to include a memorandum of law. See Local Rule 3.01(a). Thus, it is unclear from the motion when Defendants were served and which standard, whether good cause or excusable neglect, must be satisfied. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 10/24/2019. (RMN)
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Hyde, Brett) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. Modified on 10/23/2019 (DMA).
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 Remark: Doc. #9 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/8/19. (EBU)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Order directing compliance, #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Richard Melnicki. Related case(s): no (Saracco, Michael)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Order directing compliance, #6 Related case order and track 2 notice by Richard Melnicki. (Saracco, Michael)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing compliance to Related Case Order #6 and Interested Persons Order #7. Responses due by 10/4/2019. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/27/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/25/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/11/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/25/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/11/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Property Marketers LLC, Dolly Scully(Individually), Dolly Scully(as Trustee of the Anderson Scully Trust), Donna Sprague. (DMA)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Richard Melnicki. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lease and Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons)(Saracco, Michael)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Michael A. Saracco of Local Rule 1.05(e), which states - The Clerk is authorized and directed to require a complete and executed AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet, which shall accompany each civil case as a condition to the filing thereof. State and federal prisoners, and other persons filing civil cases pro se are exempt from the requirements of this subsection. File a completed Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPM)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:19-cv-1715-Orl-37EJK. (SJB)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15875193) filed by Richard Melnicki.(Saracco, Michael) Modified on 9/4/2019 (SPM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melnicki v. Dolly Scully et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: richard melnicki
Represented By: Michael Anthony Saracco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Property Marketers LLC
Represented By: Eric Louis Hostetler
Represented By: Brett A. Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Sprague
Represented By: Eric Louis Hostetler
Represented By: Brett A. Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolly Scully
Represented By: Eric Louis Hostetler
Represented By: Brett A. Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?