Zalloum v. The Bank of New York Mellon
Appellant: Julie Baker Zalloum and The Bank of New York Mellon
Interested Party: River Oaks III HOA, Deutsche Bank National Trust Co., Locke Lord LLP and River Oaks Community Services
Trustee: United States Trustee and Laurie K. Weatherford
Case Number: 6:2019cv01720
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing compliance. Appellee shall file a response to Orders #2 and #3 on or before 11/14/2019. Failure to comply may result in the dismissal of the case or the imposition of sanctions without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 10/31/2019. (RMF)(Copies mailed).
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 APPELLANT'S Initial BRIEF by Julie Baker Zalloum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BIA)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by Julie Baker Zalloum. (BIA)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Julie Baker Zalloum. Related case(s): yes (BIA)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of docketing bankruptcy record on appeal advising counsel to comply with Rule 8018. Notice of appeal filed in U.S. District Court on 9/25/19. (SPB)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal received consisting of items as designated on transmittal including: filed by Julie Baker Zalloum.(Attachments: #1 2 6-18-ap-39 Docket Sheet, #2 3 6-18-ap-38 Order Striking Amended Notice of Appeal, #3 4 6-18-ap-39 Order Denying Motion for Reconsideration, #4 5 6-18-ap-39 Designation of Record, #5 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000001_Complaint_by_Julie_Baker_Zalloum_against_The_Bank_of_New_York_Mellon_fka_the_Bank_of_New, #6 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000002_Summons_issued_along_with_Local_Rule_7001-1_-_Adversary_Proceedings_-_Procedures_Answer_D, #7 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000003_Notice_of_Appearance_and_Request_for_Notice_Filed_by_Fran_E_Zion_on_behalf_of_Defendant_Th, #8 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000004_Motion_to_Extend_Time_To_File_Answer_Brief_Filed_by_Fran_E_Zion_on_behalf_of_Defendant_The, #9 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000005_Notice_Rescheduling_Hearing, #10 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000006_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_of_Hearing, #11 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000007_Answer_to_Complaint_and_Affirmative_Defenses, #12 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000008_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Extend_Time_To_File_Answer_Defendant_Shall_file_Response_to_Comp, #13 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000009_Notice_Rescheduling_Hearing, #14 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000010_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_of_Hearing, #15 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000011_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Julie_Zalloum_Alexandra_Sanchez, #16 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000012_Notice_Rescheduling_Hearing, #17 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000013_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_of_Hearing, #18 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000014_Notice_Rescheduling_Hearing, #19 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000015_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_of_Hearing, #20 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000016_Order_to_Show_Cause_Why_Adversary_Proceeding_Should_not_be_Dismissed_With_Prejudice_Heari, #21 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000017_Certificate_of_Service_Re_Order_To_Show_Cause_Filed_by_Fran_E_Zion_on_behalf_of_Defendan, #22 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000018_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #23 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000019_Response_to_Order_To_Show_Cause_Why_Adversary_proceeding_Should_Not_Be_Dismissed_With_Prej, #24 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000020_Service_Executed_on_Deutche_Bank_National_Trust_Company_and_The_Bank_of_New_York_Mellon_N, #25 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000021_Response_to_Order_to_Show_Cause_Why_Adversary_Proceeding_Should_not_be_Dismissed_With_Prej, #26 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000022_Motion_for_Leave_to_File_Amendment_to_First_Verified_Complaint_with_First_Amendment_to_Fir, #27 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000023_Order_Abating_Motion_for_Leave_to_File_Amendment_to_First_Verified_Complaint_with_First_Am, #28 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000025_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Julie_Zalloum_DorPlaintiff_Len_Abr, #29 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000026_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Order, #30 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000027_Order_Dismissing_Adversary_Proceeding_With_Prejudice, #31 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000028_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #32 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000029_Part_1_Motion_for_Reconsideration_of_Order_Dismissing_Adversary_Proceeding_with_Prejudice_and_Deb, #33 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000029_Part_2_Large_Attachment, #34 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000029_Part_3_Large_Attachment, #35 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000030_Order_Denying_Motion_for_Reconsideration, #36 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000031_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #37 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000032_Amended_Notice_of_Appeal_Filing_Fee_Not_Paid_or_Not_Required_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Julie_Ba, #38 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000033_Statement_of_Issues_on_Appeal_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #39 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000034_Appellant_Designation_of_Contents_for_Inclusion_in_Record_on_Appeal_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Jul, #40 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000035_Request_for_the_Transcript, #41 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000036_Order_Striking_Amended_Notice_of_Appeal_Directing_Debtor_to_File_Corrected_Notices_of_App, #42 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000037_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #43 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000038_Motion_for_Reconsideration_of_Order_Striking_Amended_Notice_of_Appeal_Directing_Debtor_to, #44 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000039_Order_Denying_Motion_for_Reconsideration_of_Order_Striking_Amended_Notice_of_Appeal_Direc, #45 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000040_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #46 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000041_Notice_of_Appeal_Re_Order_Striking_Amended_Notice_of_Appeal_Directing_Debtor_to_File_Co, #47 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000042_Appellant_Designation_of_Contents_for_Inclusion_in_Record_on_Appeal_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Jul, #48 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000043_Statement_of_Issues_on_Appeal_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #49 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000044_Statement_of_Election_to_Appeal_to_District_Court_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #50 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000045_Written_Request_for_the_Transcript, #51 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000046_Certificate_of_Mailing_via_Bankruptcy_Noticing_Center_Re_Notice_of_Appea, #52 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000047_Notice_to_Appellant_of_Responsibilities, #53 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000048_Transmittal_of_Notice_of_Appeal_to_District_Court_Case_No_6-19-cv-1720-Orl-78, #54 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000049_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing, #55 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000050_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #56 6-18-ap-00039_Docket_000051_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document)(SL)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal received consisting of items as designated on transmittal including: led by Julie Baker Zalloum.Attachments: #1 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000001_Voluntary_Petition_under_Chapter_13_Filing_Fee_Paid_Schedules_and_Statements_Not_Filed, #2 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000002_Statement_of_Debtors_Social_Security_Numbers_Filed_by_Debtor_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #3 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000003_Notice_of_Commencement_of_Case_Section_341_Meeting_of_Creditors_and_Fixing_Deadlines_ser, #4 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000004_Notice_of_Deficient_Filing_chapter_13_plan_summary_of_assets_schedules_A-J_declaration, #5 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000005_Third_Amended_Administrative_Order_FLMB-2016-3_Prescribing_Procedures_for_Chapter_13_Cases, #6 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000006_Notice_of_Status_Conference__Hearing_scheduled_for_6202017_at_1100_AM_at_Orlando_FL_-, #7 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000007_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_of_Meeting_of_Creditors, #8 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000008_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_to_Creditors_and_Parties_in_Interest, #9 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000009_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_of_Hearing, #10 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000010_Summary_of_Assets__Schedules_A_-_J_and_Summary_of_Assets_Filing_Fee_Not_Paid_or_Not_Requ, #11 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000011_Chapter_13_Plan_with_Service_Upon_All_Creditors_via_BNC_Filed_by_Debtor_Julie_Baker_Zallou, #12 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000012_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #13 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000013_Request_for_Notice_Filed_by_Seth_J_Greenhill_on_behalf_of_Creditor_US_Bank_National_Asso, #14 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000014_Certificate_of_Mailing_of_Proof_of_Claim_Filed_by_Helena_Gutierrez_Malchow_on_behalf_of_Cr, #15 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000015_Certificate_of_Mailing_of_Proof_of_Claim_Filed_by_Helena_Gutierrez_Malchow_on_behalf_of_Cr, #16 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000016_Certificate_of_Credit_Counseling_Date_Course_was_Completed_5102017_Filed_by_Debtor_Ju, #17 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000017_Objection_to_Confirmation_of_Plan_Filed_by_Seth_J_Greenhill_on_behalf_of_Creditor_US_Ban, #18 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000018_Response_to_Objection_to_Confirmation_of_Debtors_Chapter_13_Plan_Filed_by_Debtor_Julie_Bak, #19 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000020_Motion_to_Dismiss_Case_Contains_negative_notice_for_debtors_failure_to_comply_with_11_U, #20 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000021_Notice_of_Requirement_to_File_a_Statement_of_Completion_of_Course_in_Personal_Financial_Ma, #21 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000022_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Julie_Zalloum_Dor_Laurie_Weatherfor, #22 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000023_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing, #23 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000024_Order_Granting_Ore_Tenus_Motion_to_Abate_Payments_Service_Instructions_Laurie_Weatherford, #24 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000025_Verified_Response_to_and_Objection_to_Trustees_Motion_to_Dismiss_Case_and_Request_for_Hea, #25 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000026_Withdrawal_of_of_Motion_to_Dismiss_Case_for_Failure_to_Comply_With_11_USC_ 1308_AND_52, #26 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000027_DOCUMENT_NOT_PROCESSED, #27 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000028_Motion_to_Extend_Time_of_Proof_of_Claim_Bar_Date_Filed_by_Douglas_Goldin_on_behalf_of_Cred, #28 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000029_Notice_of_Hearing_on_Notice_of_Preliminary_Hearing_on_US_Banks_Motion_to_Extend_Proof_o, #29 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000030_Part_1_Motion_for_Relief_from_Stay, #30 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000030_Part_2_Exhibit_1_-_Affidavit_in_Support_of_Motion, #31 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000031_Notice_Rescheduling_Status_Conference_and_Motion_by_US_Bank_to_Extend_Time_of_Proof_of_Cla, #32 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000032_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_of_Hearing, #33 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000033_Motion_to_Dismiss_Case_for_Failure_to_Maintain_Timely_Plan_Payments_Debtor_has_21_days_to, #34 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000034_Notice_of_Appearance_and_Request_for_Notice_as_Additional_Counsel_Filed_by_Christopher_R_E, #35 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000035_Withdrawal_of_Motion_to_Dismiss_for_Failure_to_Maintain_Timely_Plan_Payments_Filed_by_Tru, #36 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000036_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Ana_Devilliers_Trustee_Atty_Chris_Ev, #37 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000038_Order_Granting_Motion_For_Relief_From_Stay, #38 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000039_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_AMENDED_TO_CORRECT_RULING_APPEARANCES_Ana_Dev, #39 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000040_Letter_Re_Filed_by_James_E_Olsen_providing_information_on_assets_not_listed_in_the_debto, #40 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000041_Certificate_of_Mailing_Re_DE38_Order_Granting_US_Banks_Motion_for_Relief_From_Stay_post, #41 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000042_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Extend_Time, #42 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000043_Certificate_of_Mailing_Order_Granting_US_Bank_NAs_Motion_to_Extend_Time, #43 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000044_Motion_for_Reconsideration_of_Order_Granting_Motion_For_Relief_From_Stay_Filed_by_Debtor_J, #44 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000045_Objection_to_Claim, #45 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000046_Order_Directing_Response_Re_Objection_to_Claim, #46 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000047_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Order, #47 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000048_Part_1_Response_to_Debtors_Objection_to_Claim_No_2-1_Filed_by_Helena_Gutierrez_Malchow_on_behal, #48 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000048_Part_2_Exhibit, #49 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000048_Part_3_Exhibit, #50 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000048_Part_4_Exhibit, #51 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000049_Objection_to_Claim, #52 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000050_Order_Directing_Response_Re_Objection_to_Claim_no_4_of_Deutsche_Bank_National_Trust_Matte, #53 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000051_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Order, #54 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000052_Objection_to_Proof_of_Claim_6_Filed_by_US_Bank_Nationa_Association_Filed_by_Debtor_Julie, #55 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000053_Order_Directing_Response_Re_Objection_by_Debtor_to_Proof_of_Claim_No_6_Filed_by_US_Bank, #56 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000054_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Order, #57 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000055_DOCUMENT_NOT_PROCESSED, #58 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000056_Corrective_Response_to_Debtors_Objection_to_Proof_of_Claim_6_Filed_by_Douglas_Goldin_on, #59 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000057_Notice_of_Appearance_and_Request_for_Notice_Filed_by_Fran_E_Zion_on_behalf_of_Creditor_THE, #60 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000058_Objection_to_Confirmation_of_Plan_Filed_by_Fran_E_Zion_on_behalf_of_Creditor_THE_BANK_OF_N, #61 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000059_Response_to_Objection_to_Claim, #62 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000060_Part_1_Motion_to_Determine_Secured_StatusValue_of_Deutsche_Bank_National_Trust_Company__Total_S, #63 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000060_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #64 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000060_Part_3_Exhibit_B, #65 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000061_Objection_to_Claim, #66 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000062_Order_Directing_Response_Re_Objection_to_Claim, #67 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000063_Response_to_Motion_to_Determine_Secured_StatusValue_Claim_of_Deutsche_Bank_National_Trust, #68 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000064_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Order, #69 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000065_Joint_Motion_for_Substitution_of_Counsel_Filed_by_Austin_M_Noel_on_behalf_of_Creditor_Deut, #70 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000066_Order_Granting_Motion_for_Substitution_of_Counsel_adding_Gavin_Stewart_for_Deutsche_Bank_N, #71 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000067_Proof_of_Service_Order_Granting_Motion_for_Substitution_of_Counsel_Filed_by_Austin_M_Noel, #72 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000068_Part_1_Emergency_Motion_for_Comfort_Order_Regarding_Automatic_Stay__Request_to_Attend_Hearing_Te, #73 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000068_Part_2_Certificate_of_Necessity_-_Emergency_Motion, #74 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000069_Notice_of_Hearing_on_Emergency_Motion_for_Comfort_Order_Regarding_Automatic_Stay__Request, #75 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000070_Notice_Canceling_Hearing_Previously_Scheduled_for_December_13_2017_at_200pm_Date_in_Not, #76 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000071_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_of_Hearing, #77 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000072_Motion_to_Expedite_Hearing_Filed_by_Anthony_T_Litsch_III_on_behalf_of_Attorney_Anthony_T_L, #78 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000073_Response_to_Debtors_Objection_To_Claim_Filed_by_Fran_E_Zion_on_behalf_of_Creditor_THE_BAN, #79 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000074_Notice_of_Hearing_on_Emergency_Motion_for_Comfort_Order_Regarding_Automatic_Stay__Request, #80 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000075_Motion_to_Dismiss_Case_for_Failure_to_Maintain_Timely_Plan_Payments_Debtor_has_21_days_to, #81 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000076_Withdrawal_of_Motion_to_Dismiss_for_Failure_to_Maintain_Timely_Plan_Payments_Filed_by_Tru, #82 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000077_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Ana_DeVilliers_Trustee_Atty_Anthony, #83 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000078_Order_Granting_Emergency_Ex-Parte_Motion_for_Comfort_Order_Regarding_Automatic_Stay__Requ, #84 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000079_Notice_of_Hearing__Hearing_scheduled_for_2142018_at_0230_PM_at_Orlando_FL_-_Courtroom, #85 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000080_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #86 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000081_Certificate_of_Service_Re_Order_on_Emergency_Ex-Parte_Motion_for_Comfort_Order_Regarding, #87 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000082_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #88 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000084_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Doug_Goldin, #89 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000085_Part_1_Bench_Brief_Filed_by_Debtor_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #90 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000085_Part_2_Exhibit, #91 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000085_Part_3_Exhibit, #92 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000085_Part_4_Exhibit, #93 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000085_Part_5_Exhibit, #94 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000085_Part_6_Exhibit, #95 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000085_Part_7_Exhibit, #96 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000085_Part_8_Exhibit, #97 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000085_Part_9_Exhibit, #98 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000086_Order_Striking_Bench_Brief_Without_Prejudice, #99 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000087_Order_Granting_in_Part_and_Denying_in_Part_Motion_for_Reconsideration_of_Order_Granting_Mo, #100 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000088_Order_Scheduling_Pending_Matters_Status_Conference_Scheduled_for_7102018_at_245_pm_O, #101 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000089_Certificate_of_Service_Re_Order_on_Julie_Baker_Zalloums_Motion_for_Reconsideration_of_Or, #102 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000090_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #103 6-17-bk-02329_Docket_000091_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Doc
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER for Appellant and Appellee. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/27/2019. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 9/13/2019. (copy mailed to appellant/counsel emailed)(AKC)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/27/2019. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 9/13/2019. (copy mailed to appellant/counsel emailed)(AKC)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by Julie Baker Zalloum. Bankruptcy Court case number 6:17bk2329-KSJ & 6:18ap39-KSJ. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 8/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Transmittal)(MAA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zalloum v. The Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Julie Baker Zalloum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Fran Elise Zion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: River Oaks III HOA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Deutsche Bank National Trust Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Locke Lord LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: River Oaks Community Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: United States Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Laurie K. Weatherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?