Grimes v. Kirkman Chiropractic et al
Plaintiff: Jerome L. Grimes
Defendant: Y. Wilson Talos, Kirkman Chiropractic, Melanie LNU and Cherrie LNU
Case Number: 6:2019cv01831
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 11 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #10 Notice of appeal. (DMA)
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #9 Order on motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperisOrder on Report and Recommendations by Jerome L. Grimes. Filing fee not paid. (DMA)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Adopting Report and Recommendations - re #6 Report and Recommendations. This case is DISMISSED. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 11/4/2019. (DJD)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to September 27, 2019 Court order re: Report and Recommendation (Doc. No. #6) by Jerome L. Grimes. (AKC)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jerome L. Grimes. Related case(s): yes (DMA)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jerome L. Grimes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 9/27/2019. (MKH)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/25/2019. (DJD) ctp
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/9/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/25/2019. (DJD) ctp
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/9/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 9/25/2019. (DJD) ctp
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jerome L. Grimes. (MAA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kirkman Chiropractic, Cherrie LNU, Melanie LNU, Y. Wilson Talos filed by Jerome L. Grimes.(MAA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimes v. Kirkman Chiropractic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome L. Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Y. Wilson Talos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirkman Chiropractic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherrie LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?