People's Trust Insurance Company a/a/o Susan Jones v. Cyberpower Systems (USA), Inc.
Plaintiff: People's Trust Insurance Company a/a/o Susan Jones and People's Trust Insurance Company
Defendant: Cyberpower Systems (USA), Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01901
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anne C Conway
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by People's Trust Insurance Company. (Stevens, Theodore)
November 19, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by People's Trust Insurance Company of Filing Affidavit of Mark Babock (Stevens, Theodore)
November 14, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #13 Order pdf by Cyberpower Systems (USA), Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cyberpower Systems (USA), Inc. for Cyberpower Systems (USA), Inc... (Carey, Douglas) Modified on 11/15/2019 (RDO).
November 12, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #13 Order pdf by Cyberpower Systems (USA), Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cyberpower Systems (USA), Inc. for Cyberpower Systems (USA), Inc... (Carey, Douglas)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #9 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement: No later than 11/14/19, Defendant shall advise the Court if the results of this litigation have the potential to substantially harm The Travelers Companies, Inc.'s balance sheets. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 11/5/2019. (RMF)(Copies mailed).
October 31, 2019 Set deadline: Plaintiff's Show Cause Response due by 11/21/2019 (EJS)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to Show Cause: Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause in writing, on or before November 21, 2019, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 10/30/2019. (RN) (RN). Modified on 10/30/2019 (RN).
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Cyberpower Systems (USA), Inc..(Carey, Douglas)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Cyberpower Systems (USA), Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Carey, Douglas)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 by Cyberpower Systems (USA), Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cyberpower Systems (USA), Inc. for Cyberpower Systems (USA), Inc... (Carey, Douglas)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER to strike re: #7 Unliteral Consent to Magistrate Judge filed by People's Trust Insurance Company. Any consent filed must be executed by all parties to be effective. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 10/28/2019. (Irick, Daniel)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 (STRICKEN BY #8 ENDORSED ORDER) Unilateral Consent to Trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge by People's Trust Insurance Company (Stevens, Theodore) Modified on 10/25/2019 (BIA). Modified on 10/29/2019 (RDO).
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement re #3 Related case order, track 2 notice, and Interested persons order by Theodore A. Stevens on behalf of People's Trust Insurance Company (Stevens, Theodore) Modified on 10/25/2019 (BIA).
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order, track 2 notice, and Interested persons order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by People's Trust Insurance Company. Related case(s): yes (Stevens, Theodore) Modified on 10/25/2019 (BIA).
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Cyberpower Systems (USA), Inc. (BIA)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER, NOTICE OF DESIGNATION under Local Rule 3.05-Track 2, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/21/2019. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/21/2019. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 10/7/2019. (RMF)(Copies mailed).
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-1901-Orl-22DCI. (SJB)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cyberpower Systems (USA), Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15992382) filed by People's Trust Insurance Company a/a/o Susan Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Stevens, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: People's Trust Insurance Company a/a/o Susan Jones v. Cyberpower Systems (USA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyberpower Systems (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Douglas G. Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People's Trust Insurance Company a/a/o Susan Jones
Represented By: Theodore A. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People's Trust Insurance Company
Represented By: Theodore A. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?