Tower Hill Select Insurance Company v. General Electric Company
Plaintiff: Tower Hill Select Insurance Company and Otilia Vallejos-Byno
Defendant: General Electric Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv01904
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anne C Conway
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested Persons Order by General Electric Company. (Smith, Jennifer) Modified on 10/24/2019 (RDO).
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bernard Stevens on behalf of Tower Hill Select Insurance Company (Stevens, Michael)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER, NOTICE OF DESIGNATION under Local Rule 3.05-Track 2, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/25/2019, Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/25/2019. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 10/11/2019. (RMF)(Copies mailed).
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by General Electric Company. Related cases: yes. (Smith, Jennifer) Modified on 10/10/2019 (RDO).
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by General Electric Company.(Smith, Larry)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Osceola County Circuit Court, case number 2019-CA-005329-O, filed in State Court on 5/1/19. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ORL085914 filed by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Other Documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(RDO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tower Hill Select Insurance Company v. General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tower Hill Select Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Bernard Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otilia Vallejos-Byno
Represented By: Michael Bernard Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Jennifer Ashley Smith
Represented By: Larry D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?