Zenwise Health, LLC v. Zupa, LLC
Plaintiff: Zenwise Health, LLC
Defendant: Zupa, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv01923
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 18 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Amended Complaint by Zupa, LLC. (Espinosa, Jorge) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint. The Defendant may have until and through December 10, 2019, to respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 11/20/2019. (Kidd, Embry)
November 19, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Amended Complaint by Zupa, LLC. (Espinosa, Jorge) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
October 31, 2019 Filing 15 Remark: Doc. #14 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 11/1/19. (EBU)
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #11 Interested persons order by Zenwise Health, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Maxim Zenwise Holdco, LLC, Other Affiliate Maxim Zenwise Opco, LLC for Zenwise Health, LLC.. (Nieds, Mark)
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #10 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Zenwise Health, LLC. Related case(s): no (Nieds, Mark)
October 23, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by Attorney Daniel S. Tyler, appearing on behalf of Zenwise Health, LLC (Filing Fee $150 Receipt Number ORL086315.) Related document: #7 Unopposed MOTION for Daniel S. Tyler to appear Pro Hac Vice. (MEJ) Modified on 11/6/2019 (DMA).
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS issued as to Zupa, LLC. (SPM)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/29/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/15/2019. (Ctp)(JLC)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/29/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/15/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Zupa, LLC with Jury Demand. filed by Zenwise Health, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Summons)(Nieds, Mark) Modified on 10/16/2019 (SPM).
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Plaintiff's Motion for Daniel S. Tyler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 10/15/2019. (RMN)
October 14, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Daniel S. Tyler to appear pro hac vice by Zenwise Health, LLC. (Nieds, Mark) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
October 14, 2019 Filing 6 **RE-FILED SEE #9** AMENDED COMPLAINT against Zenwise Health, LLC with Jury Demand. filed by Zenwise Health, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Summons)(Nieds, Mark) Modified on 10/16/2019 (SPM).
October 9, 2019 Set/reset deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 10/16/2019 (DMA)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff Zenwise Health, LLC's Complaint (Doc. #1) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/9/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (DMA)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Daniel S. Tyler of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DMA)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:19-cv-1923-Orl-37EJK. (SJB)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zupa, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16004492) filed by Zenwise Health, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nieds, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zenwise Health, LLC v. Zupa, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zupa, LLC
Represented By: Jorge Espinosa
Represented By: Francesca Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zenwise Health, LLC
Represented By: Mark A. Nieds
Represented By: Daniel S. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?