Georgetti v. Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Marcio Alexandre Georgetti and Marcio Alexandre Georgetti
Defendant: Attorney General William Barr, Division Chief Lori Mackenzie, Chief Sarah Kendall, Acting Secretary Kevin K. McAleenan, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Secretary U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Director U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Division Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and Attorney General of the United States
Case Number: 6:2019cv01924
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Marcio Alexandre Georgetti. U.S. Attorney served on 10/17/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Hurd, Rusten) Modified on 10/25/2019 (BIA).
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Marcio Alexandre Georgetti. Attorney General of the United States served on 10/22/2019. (Hurd, Rusten) Modified on 10/25/2019 (BIA).
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Marcio Alexandre Georgetti. Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 10/22/2019. (Hurd, Rusten) Modified on 10/25/2019 (BIA).
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Marcio Alexandre Georgetti. Division Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 10/22/2019. (Hurd, Rusten) Modified on 10/25/2019 (BIA).
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Marcio Alexandre Georgetti. Secretary U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 10/22/2019.(Hurd, Rusten) Modified on 10/25/2019 (BIA).
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed by Marcio Alexandre Georgetti. Director U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 10/22/2019. (Hurd, Rusten) Modified on 10/25/2019 (BIA).
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1 (ctp) (JLC)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Attorney General of the United States, Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Division Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary U.S. Department of Homeland Security, and U.S. Attorney. (BIA)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-1924-Orl-37DCI. (SJB)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16004534) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summon Barr, #3 Proposed Summons Summon Chapa, #4 Proposed Summons Cuccinelli, #5 Proposed Summons Kendall, #6 Proposed Summons Mackenzie, #7 Proposed Summons Macleenan)(Hurd, Rusten)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Georgetti v. Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division Chief Lori Mackenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Sarah Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Kevin K. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Marcio Alexandre Georgetti
Represented By: Rusten C. Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcio Alexandre Georgetti
Represented By: Rusten C. Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?