Samih v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Sadiq Samih
Defendant: Director, Federal Bureau of Investigations, Field Office Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney General, Director, Citizenship & Immigration Services, District Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Orlando, Florida and Acting Secretary, Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 6:2019cv02046
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anne C Conway
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RELATED CASE ORDER,INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing.(DEFENDANTS). Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/2/2020, Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/2/2020. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 12/19/2019. (RMF)(ctp).
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. The Defendants may have until and through January 27, 2020, to respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 12/18/2019. (Kidd, Embry)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Park, Scott) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of service by Sadiq Samih re #5 Related case/interested persons/ECF-1 . (Ahmed, Shahzad)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF DESIGNATION under Local Rule 3.05-Track 1 and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 10/30/2019. (RMF)(Copies mailed).
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Sadiq Samih. (LDJ)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Sadiq Samih. Related case(s): No (LDJ)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Acting Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, Director, Citizenship & Immigration Services, Director, Federal Bureau of Investigations, District Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Orlando, Florida, Field Office Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney General, and U.S. Attorney. (LDJ)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Acting Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, Director, Citizenship & Immigration Services, Director, Federal Bureau of Investigations, District Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Orlando, Florida, Field Office Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attoreny General Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ORL086327 filed by Sadiq Samih. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(LDJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samih v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, Federal Bureau of Investigations
Represented By: Scott H. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Scott H. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney General
Represented By: Scott H. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, Citizenship & Immigration Services
Represented By: Scott H. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Orlando, Florida
Represented By: Scott H. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary, Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Scott H. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sadiq Samih
Represented By: Shahzad Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?