Rockhill Insurance Company et al v. Walden Palms Condominium Association, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rockhill Insurance Company and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Walden Palms Condominium Association, Inc.
Trustee: Charles R. Sterbach
Case Number: 6:2019cv02054
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to #6 RENEWED MOTION to Withdraw the Reference of Contested Matter filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Rockhill Insurance Company. (Laudy, Luna) Modified on 12/10/2019 (RDO).
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File. Rockhill Insurance Company may file a reply not to exceed ten pages on or by December 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/26/2019. (SCM)
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to file reply by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Rockhill Insurance Company. (Laudy, Luna)
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 1 notice by Rockhill Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Rockhill Insurance Company for Rockhill Insurance Company.. (Levy, Lauren)
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 1 notice by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.. (Levy, Lauren)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #4 Related Case Order by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Rockhill Insurance Company. Related case(s): no (Levy, Lauren) Modified on 11/13/2019 (RDO).
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Walden Palms Condominium Association, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Kish, Matthew)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Walden Palms Condominium Association, Inc.. (Kish, Matthew)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 RENEWED MOTION to Withdraw Reference of Contested Matters and Memorandum of Law In Support filed by Walden Palms Condominium Association, Inc.. (Kish, Matthew)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 RENEWED MOTION to Withdraw Reference of Contested Matters by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Rockhill Insurance Company. (Laudy, Luna) Modified on 11/1/2019 (RDO).
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/29/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed/mailed
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/29/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed/mailed
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #1 Motion to Withdraw Reference. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/29/2019. (SCM)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to counsel Laudy Luna of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (copy mailed to counsel) (MAA)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to withdraw the reference of contested matter on Debtor's Amended Motion to Compel Turnover of Insurance Proceeds by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Rockhill Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal)(MAA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rockhill Insurance Company et al v. Walden Palms Condominium Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walden Palms Condominium Association, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew S. Kish
Represented By: Carlos R. Arias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rockhill Insurance Company
Represented By: Lauren D. Levy
Represented By: Luna Laudy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Lauren D. Levy
Represented By: Luna Laudy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Charles R. Sterbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?