Kinney v. Orlando Leased Housing Associates VI, LLLP
Plaintiff: Nekeyla Kinney and Orlando Leased Housing Associates VI, LLLP
Case Number: 6:2019cv02070
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE to counsel James I. Barron III of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF)(ctp)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 11/4/2019. (RMF)(Copies mailed).
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/18/2019. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 11/4/2019. (RMF)(Copies mailed).
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/18/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/4/2019. (RMF)(Copies mailed).
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by Nekeyla Kinney. (ARJ) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Modified on 10/31/2019 (ARJ).
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Circuit Court, case number 2019-CC-015526-O filed in State Court on 10/17/2019 (Obtained date from Orange County Clerk of Courts website). filed by Nekeyla Kinney. (Attachments: #1 State Court Other Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ARJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinney v. Orlando Leased Housing Associates VI, LLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nekeyla Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Leased Housing Associates VI, LLLP
Represented By: James I Barron III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?