Doe, M.D. v. Azar
Plaintiff: M.D. John Doe and John Doe, M.D.
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Case Number: 6:2019cv02074
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of service by John Doe, M.D. re #6 Summons issued, #4 Related case order and track 1 notice, #2 MOTION for leave to file under seal Exhibits 1, 2, and 3, and to keep Plaintiff's identity confidential, #1 Complaint and envelope containing confidential exhibits. (Indest, George)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #4 Related Case Order by John Doe, M.D.. Related case(s): No (Indest, George) Modified on 11/12/2019 (RDO).
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Alex M. Azar, II. (BD)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by John Doe, M.D.. (Indest, George)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/1/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-2074-Orl-40LRH. (SJB)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to file under seal Exhibits 1, 2, and 3, and to keep Plaintiff's identity confidential by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index to Motion Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Publication from National Practitioner Data Bank, #3 Exhibit Consent Motion to File Under Seal dated Jan. 28, 2013)(Indest, George)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16084531) filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Index to Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Indest, George) Modified on 10/30/2019 (RDO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe, M.D. v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.D. John Doe
Represented By: George F. Indest, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe, M.D.
Represented By: George F. Indest, III
Represented By: Carole Carter Schriefer
Represented By: Lance O'Neal Leider
Represented By: Achal Anand Aggarwal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?