Rizor v. Private Health, M.D., P.A. et al
Plaintiff: Abigail Rizor
Defendant: M.D. Ahmed Masood, Ruel B Garcia, Central Florida Pulmonary Group, P.A., Ameripath/Dermpath Diagnostics, Inc., MD Ivan J Castro, D.O. Brian E Reeves, United Healthcare Insurance Company, Private Health, M.D., P.A., Advent Health Systems/Sunbelt, Inc. d/b/a Florida Hospital Winter Park, M.D. Yi Liu, Adventist Health System/Sunbelt, Inc. and Adventist Health System/Sunbelt, Inc. doing business as Florida Hospital Winter Park
Case Number: 6:2019cv02077
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/13/2019. (JLC)
December 3, 2019 Filing 36 Remark: Doc. #33 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/3/19. (EJV)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER dismissing party. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/2/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
December 2, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #10 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Adventist Health System/Sunbelt, Inc., Brian E Reeves. Related case(s): yes (Foels, Craig) Modified on 12/3/2019 (LDJ).
December 2, 2019 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #11 Interested persons order by Adventist Health System/Sunbelt, Inc., Brian E Reeves. (Foels, Craig)
November 27, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to remand to State Court and Memorandum of Law by Abigail Rizor. (Diez-Arguelles, Carlos)
November 27, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Abigail Rizor (Diez-Arguelles, Carlos)
November 25, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Bassel Frick, Irene)
November 15, 2019 Filing 29 Remark: Docs. #20, #21, #24, #26, and #28 have been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 11/15/19. (MT)
November 14, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #11 Interested persons order by Central Florida Pulmonary Group, P.A., Ruel B Garcia, Ahmed Masood (Dukes, Thomas) Modified on 11/15/2019 (DMA).
November 14, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #10 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Central Florida Pulmonary Group, P.A., Ruel B Garcia, Ahmed Masood. Related case(s): no (Dukes, Thomas) Modified on 11/15/2019 (DMA).
November 14, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #11 Interested persons order by Ameripath/Dermpath Diagnostics, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AmeriPath, Inc. for Ameripath/Dermpath Diagnostics, Inc... (Samuel, Sherilee)
November 14, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #10 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ameripath/Dermpath Diagnostics, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Samuel, Sherilee)
November 14, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #11 Interested persons order by Yi Liu. (Young, Art)
November 14, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #10 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Yi Liu (Young, Art) Related case(s): yes Modified on 11/15/2019 (DMA).
November 14, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #10 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United Healthcare Insurance Company. Related case(s): no (Bassel Frick, Irene)
November 14, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #11 Interested persons order by United Healthcare Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Unitedhealth Group, Inc. for United Healthcare Insurance Company.. (Bassel Frick, Irene)
November 14, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #11 Interested persons order by Ivan J Castro, Private Health, M.D., P.A.. (Spengler, Kurt)
November 14, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #10 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ivan J Castro, Private Health, M.D., P.A.. Related case(s): Yes (Spengler, Kurt) Modified on 11/14/2019 (DMA).
November 12, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Ameripath/Dermpath Diagnostics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Samuel, Sherilee) Modified on 11/12/2019 (DMA).
November 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Art C. Young on behalf of Yi Liu (Young, Art)
November 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig S. Foels on behalf of Adventist Health System/Sunbelt, Inc., Brian E Reeves (Foels, Craig)
November 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Frank Moring on behalf of Central Florida Pulmonary Group, P.A., Ruel B Garcia, Ahmed Masood (Moring, Philip)
November 4, 2019 Set deadlines: for United Healthcare Insurance Company. Answer due by 11/25/2019. (SPM)
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Sherilee J. Samuel on behalf of Ameripath/Dermpath Diagnostics, Inc. (Samuel, Sherilee)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Defendant UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. United shall answer or respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before November 25, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 11/4/2019. (RMN)
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to extend time to File a Response to Complaint by United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Bassel Frick, Irene) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
October 31, 2019 Filing 11 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/14/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/31/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
October 31, 2019 Filing 10 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/14/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/31/2019. (Ctp)(JLC)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Ethen R. Shapiro and David W. Hughes of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MAA)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie Schultz-Kin on behalf of United Healthcare Insurance Company (Schultz-Kin, Leslie)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:19-cv-2077-0rl-37EJK. (SJB)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 (ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES,) and MOTION to Dismiss and/or MOTION to Strike and/or MOTION for More Definite Statement from Plaintiff's Complaint (filed in Orange County Court on 10/16/19) by Central Florida Pulmonary Group, P.A., Ahmed Masood. (MAA)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Complaint (filed in Orange County Court on 10/16/19) by Ivan J Castro, Private Health, M.D., P.A. (MAA)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (filed in Orange County Court on 10/15/19) by Ameripath/Dermpath Diagnostics, Inc. (MAA)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV, VI, and XIV of Plaintiff's Complaint (filed in Orange County Court on 10/15/19) by Adventist Health System/Sunbelt, Inc. (MAA)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to set mediation within 120 days (filed in Orange County Court on 9/23/19) by Abigail Rizor. (MAA)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Ninth Judicial Circuit in and for Orange County, FL, case number 2019-CA-011283-O filed in State Court on 09-16-2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16085404 filed by United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 3 to Notice of Removal, #4 State Court COMPLAINT, #5 State Court ANSWERS, #6 State Court Pending Motions, #7 State Court Docket Sheet, #8 State Court Other Documents, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bassel Frick, Irene) Modified on 10/30/2019 (MAA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rizor v. Private Health, M.D., P.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Ahmed Masood
Represented By: Philip Frank Moring
Represented By: Thomas Earle Dukes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruel B Garcia
Represented By: Philip Frank Moring
Represented By: Thomas Earle Dukes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Florida Pulmonary Group, P.A.
Represented By: Philip Frank Moring
Represented By: Thomas Earle Dukes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameripath/Dermpath Diagnostics, Inc.
Represented By: David William Hughes
Represented By: Sherilee J. Samuel
Represented By: Ethen Rubin Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Ivan J Castro
Represented By: Novera Zafar Hamid
Represented By: Kurt Matthew Spengler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.O. Brian E Reeves
Represented By: Craig S. Foels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Irene Bassel Frick
Represented By: Leslie Schultz-Kin
Represented By: Gera R. Peoples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Private Health, M.D., P.A.
Represented By: Novera Zafar Hamid
Represented By: Kurt Matthew Spengler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advent Health Systems/Sunbelt, Inc. d/b/a Florida Hospital Winter Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Yi Liu
Represented By: Art C. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adventist Health System/Sunbelt, Inc.
Represented By: Craig S. Foels
Represented By: Dinelia Ailnenix Concepcion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adventist Health System/Sunbelt, Inc. doing business as Florida Hospital Winter Park
Represented By: Craig S. Foels
Represented By: Dinelia Ailnenix Concepcion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abigail Rizor
Represented By: Maria D. Tejedor
Represented By: Carlos Raul Diez-Arguelles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?