Stellato v. Medtronic, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL STELLATO
Defendant: Minimed Distribution Corp., UNOMEDICAL A/S, Medtronic plc, UNOMEDICAL DEVICES SA de CV, UNOMEDICAL, INC., CONVATEC, INC., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic Minimed, Inc.,, Medtronic, Inc. and Medtronic, Plc
Case Number: 6:2019cv02180
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Joint Motion to Reinstate Medtronic Minimed, Inc. and Minimed Distribution Corp. as Defendants. The Clerk is DIRECTED to reinstate Defendants Medtronic Minimed, Inc. and Minimed Distribution Corp. as defendants in this case. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/11/2020. (BIA)
February 10, 2020 Filing 53 Joint MOTION to Reinstate Medtronic Minimed, Inc. and Minimed Distribution Corp. as Defendants re #52 Order by Medtronic Minimed, Inc.,, Minimed Distribution Corp. (Ceronsky, Joseph) Modified on 2/11/2020 (SPM).
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER dismissing parties. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/6/2020. (ctp)(JLC)
February 3, 2020 Filing 51 Remark: Doc. #47 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/3/20. (MT)
January 30, 2020 Filing 50 STIPULATION of Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendants, Medtronic, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., and Medtronic plc, only by Michael Stellato. (Paul, David)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Defendants Unomedical, Inc. and ConvaTec, Inc. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/28/2020. (ctp) (JLC)
January 21, 2020 Set/reset deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/13/2020. (BIA)
January 21, 2020 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Medtronic Minimed, Inc.,, Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc., Minimed Distribution Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Medtronic plc for Medtronic Minimed, Inc.,, Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc., Minimed Distribution Corp... (Ceronsky, Joseph)
January 21, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian David Murry on behalf of Michael Stellato (Murry, Brian)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #41 Emergency Motion to Clarify Case Management Conference Deadline and Participation Requirement. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/21/2020. (ctp) (JLC)
January 17, 2020 Filing 48 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/17/2020. Court Reporter: Amie First (ctp) (JLC)
January 17, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Scott Murphy on behalf of Michael Stellato (Murphy, J.)
January 16, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE RE: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE on 1/17/2020: Counsel for the parties shall call 1-888-684-8852, access code 5851307, security code 011720, for the hearing. Counsel for the parties are instructed to call in AT LEAST TEN minutes prior to the hearing start time. (CTP) (JLC)
January 16, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of hearing: Telephonic Status Conference re Emergency MOTION to Clarify Case Management Conference Deadline and Participation Requirement #41 set for 1/17/2020 at 10:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. (ctp)(JLC)
January 15, 2020 Filing 41 Emergency MOTION to Clarify Case Management Conference Deadline and Participation Requirement by Unomedical A/S, Unomedical Devices SA de CV. (DeCarlo, Lindsay) Modified on 1/16/2020 (BIA).
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ENDORSED ORDER granting #39 Unopposed Motion to Appear Telephonically at the Case Management Conference. Provided the parties agree to the essentials of the Case Management Report. Otherwise, the parties shall meet in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/14/2020. (Irick, Daniel)
January 14, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Zoe Ileana Martinez and Leslie J. Suson, appearing on behalf of Unomedical A/S, Unomedical Devices SA de CV (Filing fee $300.00 receipt number ORL088183.) Related document: #32 Unopposed MOTION for Leslie J. Suson to appear pro hac vice, #33 Unopposed MOTION for Z. Ilena Martinez to appear pro hac vice. (KNC)
January 13, 2020 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION to Conduct Rule 26 Conference by Telephone by Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. (Wiggins, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified on 1/14/2020 (BIA).
January 9, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorneys Joseph Ceronsky and Nicole Narotzky, appearing on behalf of Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Minimed Distribution Corp. (Filing fee $300.00 receipt number ORL088109.) Related document: #25 Unopposed MOTION for Joseph P. Ceronsky to appear pro hac vice, #26 Unopposed MOTION for Nicole E. Narotzky to appear pro hac vice. (KNC)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #36 motion to appear pro hac vice; denying as moot #37 motion to appear pro hac vice. The relief requested has already been granted. See Doc. 35. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/8/2020. (Irick, Daniel)
January 8, 2020 Filing 37 Amended MOTION for Leslie J. Suson to appear pro hac vice by Convatec, Inc., Unomedical A/S, Unomedical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(DeCarlo, Lindsay) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified on 1/8/2020 (BIA).
January 8, 2020 Filing 36 Amended MOTION for Z. Ileana Martinez to appear pro hac vice by Convatec, Inc., Unomedical A/S, Unomedical, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Main Document Special Admission Attorney Certification)(DeCarlo, Lindsay) Modified on 1/8/2020 (BIA).
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #32 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #33 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/7/2020. (RN)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ENDORSED ORDER denying #31 motion to appear pro hac vice. The attorney at issue in this motion is the same attorney as in a later-filed #33 motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/7/2020. (Irick, Daniel)
January 7, 2020 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for Z. Ilena Martinez to appear pro hac vice by Convatec, Inc., Unomedical A/S, Unomedical, Inc.. (DeCarlo, Lindsay) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
January 7, 2020 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION for Leslie J. Suson to appear pro hac vice by Convatec, Inc., Unomedical A/S, Unomedical, Inc.. (DeCarlo, Lindsay) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
January 7, 2020 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for to appear pro hac vice by Convatec, Inc., Unomedical A/S, Unomedical, Inc.. (DeCarlo, Lindsay) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
January 7, 2020 Filing 30 Written designation and consent to act by Lindsay Elizabeth DeCarlo on behalf of Convatec, Inc., Unomedical A/S, Unomedical, Inc.. Local Counsel: Lindsay E. DeCarlo. Non-Resident Counsel: Leslie J. Suson. (DeCarlo, Lindsay)
January 7, 2020 Filing 29 Written designation and consent to act by Lindsay Elizabeth DeCarlo on behalf of Convatec, Inc., Unomedical A/S, Unomedical, Inc.. Local Counsel: Lindsay E. DeCarlo. Non-Resident Counsel: Z. Ilena Martinez. (DeCarlo, Lindsay)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #25 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #26 motion to appear pro hac vice. See Order.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/7/2020. (RN)
January 6, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Medtronic Minimed, Inc.,, Minimed Distribution Corp.. Related case(s): no (King, Courtney)
January 6, 2020 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Nicole E. Narotzky to appear pro hac vice by Medtronic Minimed, Inc.,, Minimed Distribution Corp.. (King, Courtney) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
January 6, 2020 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Joseph P. Ceronsky to appear pro hac vice by Medtronic Minimed, Inc.,, Minimed Distribution Corp.. (King, Courtney) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
January 6, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #5 Amended Complaint by Medtronic Minimed, Inc.,, Minimed Distribution Corp..(King, Courtney)
January 3, 2020 Set/reset deadlines for Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. Answer due by 1/30/2020. (BIA)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting #22 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. On or before 1/30/2020, Defendants Medtronic, Inc. and Medtronic USA, Inc. shall respond to the Amended Complaint. No further extensions should be sought absent extraordinary good cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/3/2020. (Irick, Daniel)
January 3, 2020 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to Plead, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (King, Courtney) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
December 29, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION of Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendants, Unomedical, Inc. and ConvaTec, Inc. by Michael Stellato. (Paul, David)
December 18, 2019 Filing 20 RETURN of service executed on 11/15/2019 by Michael Stellato as to Medtronic Minimed, Inc. (Paul, David) Modified on 12/19/2019 (BIA).
December 18, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS reissued as to Unomedical A/S. (BIA)
December 18, 2019 Filing 18 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Michael Stellato. (Paul, David)
December 18, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS issued as to Unomedical Devices SA de CV. (BIA)
December 17, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Michael Stellato. (Paul, David)
December 12, 2019 Filing 15 Remark: Doc. #10 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/12/2019.(EJV)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Amended Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. On or before 12/30/2019, Defendants Convatec, Inc., Unomedical A/S, and Unomedical, Inc. shall respond to the Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 12/11/2019. (Irick, Daniel)
December 11, 2019 Filing 13 Amended Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Complaint by Convatec, Inc., Unomedical A/S, Unomedical, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DeCarlo, Lindsay) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified on 12/12/2019 (BIA).
December 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE to counsel Z. Ileana Martinez and Leslie J. Suson of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk)(copies mailed). (BIA)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #8 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Plead, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. The motion fails to state good cause for the requested relief. See Fed.R.Civ.P. 6(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 12/10/2019. (Irick, Daniel)
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Michael Stellato. (Paul, David)
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Michael Stellato. Related case(s): NO (Paul, David) Modified on 12/10/2019 (BIA).
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Complaint by Convatec, Inc., Unomedical A/S, Unomedical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rine, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/9/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/25/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/9/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/25/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Michael Stellato. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Letters of Administration)(Paul, David)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff Michael Stellato's Complaint (Doc. #1) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 11/18/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Convatec, Inc., Medtronic Minimed, Inc.,, Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc., Medtronic, Plc, Minimed Distribution Corp., Unomedical A/S, Unomedical, Inc.. (DMA)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-2180-Orl-37DCI. (SJB)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16147296) filed by MICHAEL STELLATO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Letters of Administration, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons to be Issued, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Paul, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stellato v. Medtronic, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minimed Distribution Corp.
Represented By: Joseph P. Ceronsky
Represented By: Nicole E. Narotzky
Represented By: Courtney Michelle King
Represented By: Michael J. Wiggins
Represented By: Nicole Elizabeth Narotzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNOMEDICAL A/S
Represented By: Leslie J. Suson
Represented By: Zoe Ileana Martinez
Represented By: John Austin Rine
Represented By: Lindsay Elizabeth DeCarlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNOMEDICAL DEVICES SA de CV
Represented By: Lindsay Elizabeth DeCarlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNOMEDICAL, INC.
Represented By: Leslie J. Suson
Represented By: Zoe Ileana Martinez
Represented By: John Austin Rine
Represented By: Lindsay Elizabeth DeCarlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONVATEC, INC.
Represented By: Leslie J. Suson
Represented By: Zoe Ileana Martinez
Represented By: John Austin Rine
Represented By: Lindsay Elizabeth DeCarlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic USA, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Wiggins
Represented By: Courtney Michelle King
Represented By: Joseph P. Ceronsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic Minimed, Inc.,
Represented By: Joseph P. Ceronsky
Represented By: Nicole E. Narotzky
Represented By: Courtney Michelle King
Represented By: Michael J. Wiggins
Represented By: Nicole Elizabeth Narotzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Wiggins
Represented By: Courtney Michelle King
Represented By: Joseph P. Ceronsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic, Plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL STELLATO
Represented By: David Aaron Paul
Represented By: Christopher James Bilecki
Represented By: Brent R. Bigger
Represented By: J. Scott Murphy
Represented By: Brian David Murry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?