Ortiz v. Brightview Landscape Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carmen M Ortiz and Carmen M. Ortiz
Defendant: Brightview Landscape Services, Inc. and Manuel Zepeda
Case Number: 6:2019cv02184
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 05:0704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/13/2020. (Ctp) (JLC)
January 13, 2020 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to compel arbitration and to Stay by Brightview Landscape Services, Inc., Manuel Zepeda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Peppard, Lara)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. On or before 1/13/2020, Defendants shall respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 12/26/2019. (Irick, Daniel)
December 23, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint until January 13, 2020 by Brightview Landscape Services, Inc., Manuel Zepeda. (Peppard, Lara) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
December 4, 2019 Filing 17 RETURN of service executed on 12/4/2019 by Carmen M. Ortiz as to Brightview Landscape Services, Inc.. (BIA)
December 4, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN of service executed on 12/3/2019 by Carmen M. Ortiz as to Manuel Zepeda. (BIA)
November 26, 2019 Filing 15 Remark: Doc. #14 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 11/26/19. (MT)
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #12 Interested persons order by Carmen M. Ortiz. (Irizarry, Jesus)
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #11 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Carmen M. Ortiz. Related case(s): No (Irizarry, Jesus)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/9/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/25/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/9/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/25/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to Brightview Landscape Services, Inc., Manuel Zepeda. (BIA)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Carmen M. Ortiz. (Irizarry, Jesus)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Carmen M. Ortiz. (Irizarry, Jesus)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Carmen M. Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USM-285)(Irizarry, Jesus)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Carmen M. Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USM-285)(Irizarry, Jesus)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel Jesus Irizarry of Local Rule 1.05(e), which states - The Clerk is authorized and directed to require a complete and executed AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet, which shall accompany each civil case as a condition to the filing thereof. State and federal prisoners, and other persons filing civil cases pro se are exempt from the requirements of this subsection. File a completed Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BIA)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency. Plaintiff's counsel shall obtain the required forms on the Court's website, and return the completed summons(es) and Marshal 285 form(s) to the Clerk on or before December 3, 2019. The Clerk is directed to provide the completed summons(es) and Marshal 285 form(s) to the United States Marshal. Upon receipt of the completed summons(es) and Marshal 285 form(s), the United States Marshal is directed to serve the summonses without cost to Plaintiff.See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 11/18/2019. (RN)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-2184-Orl-37DCI. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (SJB)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Carmen M Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Irizarry, Jesus)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Irizarry, Jesus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Brightview Landscape Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen M Ortiz
Represented By: Jesus Irizarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen M. Ortiz
Represented By: Jesus Irizarry
Represented By: Frank T. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brightview Landscape Services, Inc.
Represented By: Lara J. Peppard
Represented By: Stephanie Generotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Zepeda
Represented By: Lara J. Peppard
Represented By: Stephanie Generotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?