International Play Company, Inc. v. Funlandia Play Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: International Play Company, Inc.
Defendant: Funlandia Play Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv02222
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anne C Conway
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 by International Play Company, Inc.. (Keller, Richard)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #6 Related Case Order by International Play Company, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Keller, Richard) Modified on 12/11/2019 (RDO).
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER, NOTICE OF DESIGNATION under Local Rule 3.05-Track 2, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/9/2019, Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/9/2019. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 11/25/2019. (RMF)(ctp).
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on 11/22/2019 by International Play Company, Inc. as to Funlandia Play Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Keller, Richard)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint with exhibits) (RDO)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Funlandia Play Systems, Inc. (ALL)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-2222-Orl-22LRH. (SJB)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Funlandia Play Systems, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16173260) filed by International Play Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Proposed Summons)(Keller, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Play Company, Inc. v. Funlandia Play Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Play Company, Inc.
Represented By: Ryon Thomas Yemm
Represented By: Richard A. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Funlandia Play Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?