Alanazi v. Avco Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Shaherh Fayez Alanazi
Defendant: Avco Corporation, Forward Technologies Industries, INC, Synergy Systems, INC, Volare Carburetors, LLC, Tempest Plus Marketing Group, LLC, Aero Accessories, INC, Precision Airmotive, LLC, Cashmere Molding, INC, Marvel Schebler Aircraft Carburetors, LLC, Cashmere Molding, Inc., Forward Technologies Industries, Inc., Aero Accessories, Inc. and Synergy Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv02230
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John Antoon
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: the parties shall file the Case Management Report within seven days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 1/15/2020. (BRS)
January 14, 2020 Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss complaint (refiled to link to ECF No. 13 in light of Court's 1/14/2020 Order dismissing ECF No. 28 as duplicative) filed by Shaherh Fayez Alanazi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKay, John)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying #28 Motion to Dismiss as duplicative. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 1/14/2020. (EK)
January 13, 2020 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Shaherh Fayez Alanazi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKay, John)
January 13, 2020 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Shaherh Fayez Alanazi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKay, John)
January 13, 2020 Filing 45 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Shaherh Fayez Alanazi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order of Appointment of PR, #2 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Complaint, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(McKay, John) Modified on 1/14/2020 (SPM).
January 10, 2020 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #41 Order, #14 Interested persons order by Synergy Systems, Inc.. (Castro, Jennifer)
January 10, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III and IV (Breach of Warranty and Punitive Damages) of Plaintiff's Complaint by Avco Corporation. (Justice, Petra) Modified on 1/10/2020 (SPM).
January 10, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorneys Francis S. Floyd, John A. Safarli, and William J. Dow, appearing on behalf of Forward Technologies Industries, Inc. (Filing fee $450.00 receipt number ORL088110.) Related document: #40 MOTION for Francis S. Floyd, John A. Safarli, and William J. Dow to appear pro hac vice. (KNC)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/6/2020. (MDH)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: Defendant Synergy Systems, Inc. shall file its Certificate of Interested Persons within seven days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 1/3/2020. (BRS)
January 2, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Francis S. Floyd, John A. Safarli, and William J. Dow to appear pro hac vice by Forward Technologies Industries, Inc.. (Moberg, Patrick) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Modified on 1/3/2020 (SPM).
January 2, 2020 Filing 39 Written designation and consent to act by Patrick Ross Moberg on behalf of Forward Technologies Industries, Inc.. Local Counsel: PATRICK ROSS MOBERG. Non-Resident Counsel: FRANCIS S. FLOYD, JOHN A. SAFARLI and WILLIAM J. DOW. (Moberg, Patrick)
December 30, 2019 Reset deadlines: for Avco Corporation. Answer due by 1/10/2020. (SPM)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying as moot #37 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to respond re #25 Motion to Dismiss filed by Shaherh Fayez Alanazi; denying without prejudice Avco Corporation's motion to dismiss [25 at 14-18]; and striking #25 Answer to Complaint filed by Avco Corporation. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/30/2019.(JAA)
December 26, 2019 Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to respond re #25 Motion to dismiss by Shaherh Fayez Alanazi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKay, John) Modified on 12/26/2019 (DMA).
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 12/23/2019. (MDH)
December 20, 2019 Filing 35 Written designation and consent to act by J. Lester Kaney on behalf of Precision Airmotive, LLC. Local Counsel: J. Lester Kaney. Non-Resident Counsel: W. Benjamin Pace and Justin Feinman. (Kaney, J.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 34 Corrected and Unopposed MOTION for W. Benjamin Pace and Justin Feinman to appear pro hac vice by Precision Airmotive, LLC. (Kaney, J.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Modified on 12/23/2019 (BIA).
December 19, 2019 Set deadlines as to #12 MOTION to dismiss , #13 MOTION to dismiss . Responses due by 1/13/2020 (SPM)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time. Responses to #12 motion to dismiss and #13 motion to dismiss are due January 13, 2020. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/19/2019. (EK)
December 19, 2019 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to 01/13/2020 for response to motions to dismiss by Shaherh Fayez Alanazi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKay, John)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion does not comply with all the requirements of Local Rule 2.02(a) and does not comply with Local Rule 3.01(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 12/18/2019. (MDH)
December 18, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Ben Pace and Justin Feinman to appear pro hac vice by Precision Airmotive, LLC. (Kaney, J.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
December 17, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by J. Lester Kaney on behalf of Precision Airmotive, LLC, Volare Carburetors, LLC, Marvel-Schebler Aircraft Carburetors, LLC, Tempest Plus Marketing Group, LLC, and Aero Accessories, LLC (Kaney, J.) Modified on 12/17/2019 (SPM).
December 17, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support by Precision Airmotive, LLC, Aero Accessories, LLC, Volare Carburetors, LLC, Marvel-Schebler Aircraft Carburetors, LLC, Tempest Plus Marketing Group, LLC (Kaney, J.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Modified on 12/17/2019 (SPM).
December 16, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Avco Corporation. (Justice, Petra)
December 16, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #3 Related case order by Avco Corporation. Related case(s): No (Justice, Petra) Modified on 12/17/2019 (SPM).
December 16, 2019 Filing 25 **STRICKEN per #38 Order** AVCO Corporation's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Counts I and II of Complaint with Jury Demand and Motion to Dismiss Counts III and IV of Plaintiff's Complaint by Avco Corporation.(Justice, Petra) Modified on 12/17/2019 (SPM). Modified on 1/2/2020 (SPM).
December 13, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED document by Forward Technologies Industries, Inc.. Amendment to #22 Declaration of John Herman. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Amended Declaration of John Herman)(Moberg, Patrick)
December 13, 2019 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Michael R. Allen re #21 Amended document by Forward Technologies Industries, Inc.. (Moberg, Patrick)
December 13, 2019 Filing 22 (Re-filed at #24 with corrected attachment) DECLARATION of John Herman re #21 Amended document by Forward Technologies Industries, Inc.. (Moberg, Patrick) Modified on 12/16/2019 (SPM).
December 13, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Forward Technologies Industries, Inc.. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal . (Moberg, Patrick) Modified on 12/16/2019 (SPM).
December 9, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Forward Technologies Industries, Inc.. Related case(s): N (Moberg, Patrick)
December 9, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Forward Technologies Industries, Inc.. (Moberg, Patrick)
December 9, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Shaherh Fayez Alanazi. (McKay, John)
December 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #3 Related case order by Shaherh Fayez Alanazi. Related case(s): no (McKay, John) Modified on 12/9/2019 (SPM).
December 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by John Douglas McKay on behalf of Shaherh Fayez Alanazi (McKay, John)
December 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE to counsel W. Benjamin Pace and Justin Feinman of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (copy mailed to counsel)(SPM)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER for DEFENDANTS PRECISION AIRMOTIVE, LLC, VOLARE CARBURETORS, LLC, TEMPEST PLUS MARKETING GROUP, LLC, SYNERGY SYSTEMS, INC., and MARVEL SCHEBLER AIRCRAFT CARBURETORS, LLC. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/9/2019. (counsel mailed/emailed)(AKC)
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss complaint by Marvel Schebler Aircraft Carburetors, LLC, Precision Airmotive, LLC, Tempest Plus Marketing Group, LLC, Volare Carburetors, LLC. (Kaney, J.) Modified on 12/9/2019 (SPM).
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Synergy Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Bob Wysocki)(Garcia, Carlos)
December 6, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Forward Technologies Industries, Inc..(Moberg, Patrick)
December 2, 2019 Set deadlines: for Avco Corporation. Answer due by 12/16/2019. (SPM)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER for Defendant Avco Corporation. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/2/2019. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time. Defendant Avco Corporation shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before December 16, 2019. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/2/2019. (EK)
November 29, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Avco Corporation. (Bourgeois, L.)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal, directing Defendant Forward Technologies Industries, Inc. to file an amended notice of removal no later than December 13, 2019. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 11/26/2019. (EK)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE to counsel John D. McKay of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk).(copy mailed) (SPM)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for John D. McKay to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 11/25/2019. (copy mailed)(AKC)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER for Plaintiff and Defendant Forward Technologies Industries, Inc. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 11/25/2019. (counsel emailed/mailed)(AKC)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 11/25/2019. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John Antoon II and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-2230-Orl-28LRH. (NAS)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Volusia County Circuit Court, case number 2019 31320 CICI filed in State Court on 07/15/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16178671 filed by Forward Technologies Industries, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moberg, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alanazi v. Avco Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avco Corporation
Represented By: Petra L. Justice
Represented By: L. Robert Bourgeois
Represented By: John Patrick O'Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forward Technologies Industries, INC
Represented By: Patrick Ross Moberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synergy Systems, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volare Carburetors, LLC
Represented By: J. Lester Kaney
Represented By: W. Benjamin Pace
Represented By: Justin S. Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tempest Plus Marketing Group, LLC
Represented By: J. Lester Kaney
Represented By: W. Benjamin Pace
Represented By: Justin S. Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aero Accessories, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Airmotive, LLC
Represented By: J. Lester Kaney
Represented By: W. Benjamin Pace
Represented By: Justin S. Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cashmere Molding, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvel Schebler Aircraft Carburetors, LLC
Represented By: J. Lester Kaney
Represented By: W. Benjamin Pace
Represented By: Justin S. Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cashmere Molding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forward Technologies Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Francis S. Floyd
Represented By: William J. Dow
Represented By: John A. Safarli
Represented By: Patrick Ross Moberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aero Accessories, Inc.
Represented By: W. Benjamin Pace
Represented By: Justin S. Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synergy Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher John Jahr
Represented By: Dennis M. O'Hara
Represented By: Jennifer Castro
Represented By: Carlos Antonio Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaherh Fayez Alanazi
Represented By: John D. McKay
Represented By: John Douglas McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?