Scott v. Gilittle et al
Plaintiff: Ricky B. Scott
Defendant: Tiffany Williams, Goerge S. Gilittle, Amy Gilbert and M. Demorat
Case Number: 6:2019cv02295
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 8 JUDGMENT dismissing the case without prejudice (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (copies mailed) (LDJ)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment dismissing the case without prejudice and close this case. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/8/2020. (RMF)(ctp).
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 12/20/2019. (RMF)(ctp).
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/3/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 12/20/2019. (RMF)(ctp).
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency and directing Plaintiff to Amend the complaint. Plaintiff shall amend his complaint as described within TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS from the date of this Order. Failure to do so within this time will result in the dismissal of this action without further notice. Within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date on this Order, Plaintiff shall either file a fully completed Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate (if Plaintiff desires to proceed as a pauper) or pay the $400.00 filing fee. The Clerk of Court shall mail Plaintiff a Prisoner Consent Form and standard 42 U.S.C. 1983 civil rights complaint form with this Order. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 12/16/2019. (RN) Modified on 12/16/2019 (RN).
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of change of address by Ricky B. Scott (address updated on docket) (LDJ)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Ricky B. Scott. (LDJ) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M. Demorat, Amy Gilbert, Goerge S. Gilittle, Tiffany Williams filed by Ricky B. Scott. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(LDJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Gilittle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goerge S. Gilittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Demorat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky B. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?