Bluhm v. Wyndham Destinations Inc et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Bluhm
Defendant: Wyndham, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Destinations Inc., Wyndham Does 1-50 and Club Wyndham Access Points
Case Number: 6:2019cv02300
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE to counsel Anthony S. Wisen, Sara M. Turner, and Joanne Thomas Blackburn of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee;Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MAA)
December 6, 2019 Filing 48 TRANSFER IN from the Western District of Washington. Case assigned to District Judge Berger and Magistrate Judge Hoffman. New Case Number: 6:19-cv-2300-ORL-78LRH. (MAA)
December 6, 2019 Filing 47 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 3:18-cv-05813. File received electronically
November 21, 2019 Case will be sent to the Middle District of Florida by electronic case transfer 15 days following the date of this filing. If case is stipulated, the 15 day waiting period does not apply. (GMR) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #37 Defendants' motion to transfer venue, denying Defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, and denying as moot Defendants' motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Extending Deadline for JSR re #44 Stipulation filed by Wyndham Vacation Resorts Inc, Wyndham Destinations Inc, Wyndham Does 1-50, Wyndham, Wyndham Vacation Ownership Inc: Joint Status Report due by 12/23/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
November 5, 2019 Filing 44 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Deadline to File JSR by parties (Blackburn, Joanne) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 43 REPLY, filed by Defendants Wyndham, Wyndham Destinations Inc, Wyndham Does 1-50, Wyndham Vacation Ownership Inc, Wyndham Vacation Resorts Inc, TO RESPONSE to #37 MOTION to Dismiss , #41 Stipulated MOTION for Order EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE REPLY BRIEF (Blackburn, Joanne) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re #41 Stipulated Motion, Extending Deadline for Defendants to File Reply Brief to #37 MOTION to Dismiss. (GMR) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 41 Stipulated MOTION for Order EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE REPLY BRIEF, filed by Defendants Wyndham, Wyndham Destinations Inc, Wyndham Does 1-50, Wyndham Vacation Ownership Inc, Wyndham Vacation Resorts Inc. Noting Date 9/6/2019, (Blackburn, Joanne) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Brandon Bluhm, to #37 MOTION to Dismiss . (Wisen, Anthony) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re #36 Stipulation Extending Deadline filed by Wyndham Vacation Resorts Inc, Wyndham Destinations Inc, Wyndham Does 1-50, Wyndham, Wyndham Vacation Ownership Inc. Joint Status Report due by 11/7/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Joanne T. Blackburn in Support filed by Defendants Wyndham, Wyndham Destinations Inc, Wyndham Does 1-50, Wyndham Vacation Ownership Inc, Wyndham Vacation Resorts Inc re #37 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Blackburn, Joanne) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss; and/or MOTION for Summary Judgment; and/or MOTION to Transfer Venue, filed by Defendants Wyndham, Wyndham Destinations Inc, Wyndham Does 1-50, Wyndham Vacation Ownership Inc, Wyndham Vacation Resorts Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/6/2019, (Blackburn, Joanne) Modified on 10/17/2019 to better reflect document (GMR). [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 36 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT by parties (Blackburn, Joanne) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 35 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Wyndham Destinations Inc, Wyndham Vacation Ownership Inc, Wyndham Vacation Resorts Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(GMR) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 34 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Wyndham Destinations, Inc. by Plaintiff Brandon Bluhm (Wisen, Anthony) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 33 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. by Plaintiff Brandon Bluhm (Wisen, Anthony) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 32 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. by Plaintiff Brandon Bluhm (Wisen, Anthony) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 31 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Brandon Bluhm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(Wisen, Anthony) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #20 Defendants' motion to dismiss, denying Defendants' motions in the alternative and granting Plaintiff leave to amend complaint by 7/26/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time: Joint Status Report due by 8/9/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY, filed by Defendants Wyndham, Wyndham World Wide Corporation, TO RESPONSE to #20 MOTION to Dismiss; or MOTION for Summary Judgment; or MOTION to Transfer Venue (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blackburn, Joanne) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline to File Joint Status Report by parties re #5 Discovery, Depositions, and Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges, (Blackburn, Joanne) Modified on 6/7/2019 to create motion. (MGC). [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE DEFENDANTS' REPLY re #20 MOTION to Dismiss, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. The time for filing the Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss is hereby extended until June 7, 2019. (ERA) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 25 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to File Reply by parties re #20 MOTION to Dismiss; or MOTION for Summary Judgment; or MOTION to Transfer Venue (Blackburn, Joanne) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Brandon Bluhm filed by Plaintiff Brandon Bluhm re #20 MOTION to Dismiss; or MOTION for Summary Judgment; or MOTION to Transfer Venue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(Wisen, Anthony) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Brandon Bluhm, to #20 MOTION to Dismiss; or MOTION for Summary Judgment; or MOTION to Transfer Venue. (Wisen, Anthony) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #21 Stipulation filed by Brandon Bluhm. Attorney Anthony S. Wisen added for Brandon Bluhm; Attorney Kevin Lavern Johnson terminated. Joint Status Report due by 6/10/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RE SUBSTITUTION AND WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL; AND EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE JSR by parties (Wisen, Anthony) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss; or MOTION for Summary Judgment; or MOTION to Transfer Venue, filed by Defendants Wyndham, Wyndham World Wide Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/31/2019, (Blackburn, Joanne) Modified docket text on 5/8/2019 to more accurately describe document (GMR). [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Deadline Set: Joint Status Report due by 5/10/2019. (MGC) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 19 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Parties with JURY DEMAND, filed by Brandon Bluhm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Johnson, Kevin) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DISMISSING Plaintiffs claims without prejudice and with leave to amend, DENYING as moot and without prejudice #11 Defendants' motions in the alternative for transfer or summary judgment and DENYING as moot and without prejudice #15 Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint no later than 4/19/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE, by Defendants Wyndham, Wyndham World Wide Corporation, to #11 MOTION to Transfer Case or in the alternative to Dimiss and/or Summary Judgement. (Blackburn, Joanne) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY, filed by Defendants Wyndham, Wyndham World Wide Corporation, TO RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Transfer Case or in the alternative to Dimiss and/or Summary Judgement (Blackburn, Joanne) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
February 18, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Brandon Bluhm, to #11 MOTION to Transfer Case or in the alternative to Dimiss and/or Summary Judgement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Johnson, Kevin) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sara M Turner for Wyndham and Wyndham World Wide Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sara M. Turner FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Wyndham, Wyndham World Wide Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5628494 (Blackburn, Joanne) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Joanne Thomas Blackburn filed by Defendants Wyndham, Wyndham World Wide Corporation re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case or in the alternative to Dimiss and/or Summary Judgement (Blackburn, Joanne) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer Case or in the alternative to Dimiss and/or Summary Judgement, filed by Defendants Wyndham, Wyndham World Wide Corporation. Noting Date 2/22/2019, (Blackburn, Joanne) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joanne Thomas Blackburn on behalf of Defendants Wyndham, Wyndham World Wide Corporation. (Blackburn, Joanne) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Wyndham World Wide Corporation. (GMR) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Brandon Bluhm (Johnson, Kevin) Modified on 12/21/2018 (GMR). [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Brandon Bluhm (Johnson, Kevin) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS Summons by Plaintiff Brandon Bluhm (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Johnson, Kevin) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 1/30/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/16/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/23/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 EXHIBIT 5,6,12, redacted but in your letter the court indicated #8,#9. &15 by Plaintiff Brandon Bluhm (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Johnson, Kevin) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Brandon Bluhm (Johnson, Kevin) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER RE: Case Opening Deficiencies** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GMR) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (GMR) [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]
October 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5499739), filed by Brandon CS Bluhm. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 SEALED Exhibit 5, #9 SEALED Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 9 & 10, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit, #15 SEALED Exhibit 12, #16 Summons)(Johnson, Kevin) Modified on 10/12/2018 (GMR). [Transferred from wawd on 12/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bluhm v. Wyndham Destinations Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham
Represented By: Sara M Turner
Represented By: Joanne Thomas Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Sara M Turner
Represented By: Joanne Thomas Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.
Represented By: Sara M Turner
Represented By: Joanne Thomas Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Destinations Inc.
Represented By: Sara M Turner
Represented By: Joanne Thomas Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Club Wyndham Access Points
Represented By: Sara M Turner
Represented By: Joanne Thomas Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Bluhm
Represented By: Anthony S Wisen
Represented By: Kevin Lavern Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?