Disney Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Mouseprint Media, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Disney Enterprises, Inc., Lucasfilm Ltd. LLC and Lucasfilm Entertainment Company Ltd. LLC
Defendant: Eric A. Wichhart, Mouseprint Media, LLC, www.myfavoritedisgear.com, www.disgeardesigns.com and Mouseprint Media, LLC doing business as Disgear also known as www.myfavoritedisgear.com also known as www.disgeardesigns.com
Case Number: 6:2019cv02318
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Acceptance of Service of Amended Complaint by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Lucasfilm Entertainment Company Ltd. LLC, Lucasfilm Ltd. LLC (Attachments: #1 Acceptance of Service)(Holihan, Michael) Modified on 1/7/2020 (BIA).
December 20, 2019 Filing 15 Remark: Doc. #11 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/19/2019. (EJV)
December 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Lucasfilm Entertainment Company Ltd. LLC, Lucasfilm Ltd. LLC. Related case(s): No (Holihan, Michael) Modified on 12/18/2019 (BIA).
December 18, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 12/13/2019 by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Lucasfilm Entertainment Company Ltd. LLC, Lucasfilm Ltd. LLC as to Eric A. Wichhart. (Holihan, Michael)
December 18, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 12/13/2019 by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Lucasfilm Entertainment Company Ltd. LLC, Lucasfilm Ltd. LLC as to Mouseprint Media, LLC. (Holihan, Michael)
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Lucasfilm Entertainment Company Ltd. LLC, Lucasfilm Ltd. LLC identifying Corporate Parent The Walt Disney Company for Disney Enterprises, Inc., Lucasfilm Entertainment Company Ltd. LLC, Lucasfilm Ltd. LLC.. (Holihan, Michael)
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Lucasfilm Ltd. LLC, Lucasfilm Entertainment Company Ltd. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Holihan, Michael)
December 16, 2019 Set/reset deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 12/27/2019 (BIA)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Complaint (Doc. #1) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/13/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/26/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/11/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/26/2019. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/11/2019. (ctp) (JLC)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Part 1, #2 Complaint Part 2, #3 Complaint Part 3) (BIA)
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Mouseprint Media, LLC, Eric A. Wichhart. (BIA)
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Lucasfilm Entertainment Company Ltd. LLC, Lucasfilm Ltd. LLC. (Holihan, Michael)
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Lucasfilm Entertainment Company Ltd. LLC, Lucasfilm Ltd. LLC. (Holihan, Michael)
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-2318-Orl-37GJK. (SJB)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mouseprint Media, LLC, Eric A. Wichhart (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16231812) filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Lucasfilm Entertainment Company Ltd. LLC, Lucasfilm Ltd. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Proposed Summons Mouseprint Media, LLC, #16 Proposed Summons Eric A. Weichhart)(Holihan, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Disney Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Mouseprint Media, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Disney Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Walls Holihan
Represented By: Kimberly Harchuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucasfilm Ltd. LLC
Represented By: Michael Walls Holihan
Represented By: Kimberly Harchuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucasfilm Entertainment Company Ltd. LLC
Represented By: Michael Walls Holihan
Represented By: Kimberly Harchuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric A. Wichhart
Represented By: Ronald Wilbur Sikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mouseprint Media, LLC
Represented By: Ronald Wilbur Sikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: www.myfavoritedisgear.com
Represented By: Ronald Wilbur Sikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: www.disgeardesigns.com
Represented By: Ronald Wilbur Sikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mouseprint Media, LLC doing business as Disgear also known as www.myfavoritedisgear.com also known as www.disgeardesigns.com
Represented By: Ronald Wilbur Sikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?