Shephard v. Chrysler Financial et al
Plaintiff: Charles O. Shephard
Defendant: Chrysler Financial and Patricia Ann Parker
Case Number: 6:2019cv02324
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Set/reset deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 2/27/2020 (BIA)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER taking under advisement #11 Plaintiff's Second Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 2/6/2020. (JLE)
February 5, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles O. Shephard. (BIA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is directed to file an amended motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 1/28/2020. (JLE)
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Charles O. Shephard. Related case(s): yes (LDJ)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 Remark: Doc. #7 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/19/2019. (EJV)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Charles O. Shephard. (BIA)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Chrysler Financial, Patricia Ann Parker with Jury Demand. filed by Charles O. Shephard. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Charles O. Shephard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BIA)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/26/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/11/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/26/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/11/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 Case Reassigned to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. New case number: 6:19-cv-02324-Orl-37EJK. Judge Anne C. Conway no longer assigned to the case. (ALL)
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles O. Shephard. (RDO) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Charles O. Shephard. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons - Chrysler Financial, #2 Proposed Summons- Patricia Ann Parker)(RDO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shephard v. Chrysler Financial et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles O. Shephard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrysler Financial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Ann Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?