Davis v. Stadler et al
Plaintiff: Octavius Davis
Defendant: Jennifer Gest, Meridian Senior Living LLC, Kevin Carlin, Kacy Kang, Timothy O'Brien, Robert Sweet and Denise Stadler
Case Number: 6:2019cv02408
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER adopting #14 Report and Recommendations; granting #5 Motion to Remand to State Court. This case is REMANDED for further proceedings to the Circuit Court of the Eighteenth Judicial Circuit in and for Seminole County, Florida, No. 2019-CA-3318-16T-K. The Clerk is directed to terminate all pending motions and close the case. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/31/2020. (RMF)
January 15, 2020 Filing 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #5 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, recommending that the action be remanded to Circuit Court of the Eighteenth Judicial Circuit in and for Seminole County, Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 1/15/2020. (JLE)
January 15, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Octavius Davis. Related case(s): yes (BIA)
January 15, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Octavius Davis. (BIA)
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Octavius Davis. (BIA)
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to remand to State Court filed by Kevin Carlin, Jennifer Gest, Kacy Kang, Meridian Senior Living LLC, Timothy O'Brien, Denise Stadler, Robert Sweet. (Fudenberg, Amy)
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Octavius Davis. (BIA)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/10/2020. (RMF)(ctp).
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/24/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/10/2020. (RMF)(ctp).
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/24/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/10/2020. (RMF)(ctp).
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to remand to State Court by Octavius Davis. (LDJ)
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Kevin Carlin, Kacy Kang, Meridian Senior Living LLC, Timothy O'Brien, Robert Sweet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Denise Stadler, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Theresa Partlow)(Chiu, Alicia)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jennifer Gest, Denise Stadler. (Chiu, Alicia) Modified on 1/2/2020 (RDO).
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:19-cv-2408-Orl-78EJK. (SJB)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Seminole County Circuit Court, case number 2019-CA-3318-16T-K filed in State Court on 10/31/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16285996 filed by Timothy O'Brien, Jennifer Gest, Kevin Carlin, Denise Stadler, Meridian Senior Living LLC, Kacy Kang, Robert Sweet. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K)(Chiu, Alicia) Modified on 1/7/2020 (LDJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Stadler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Gest
Represented By: Alicia M. Chiu
Represented By: Amy Grace Fudenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridian Senior Living LLC
Represented By: Alicia M. Chiu
Represented By: Amy Grace Fudenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Carlin
Represented By: Alicia M. Chiu
Represented By: Amy Grace Fudenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kacy Kang
Represented By: Alicia M. Chiu
Represented By: Amy Grace Fudenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy O'Brien
Represented By: Alicia M. Chiu
Represented By: Amy Grace Fudenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Sweet
Represented By: Alicia M. Chiu
Represented By: Amy Grace Fudenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Stadler
Represented By: Alicia M. Chiu
Represented By: Amy Grace Fudenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octavius Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?