Ottesen v. Beale Street Blues Company Orlando, LLC
Plaintiff: Arthur Ottesen
Defendant: Beale Street Blues, Beale Street Blues Company Orlando, LLC, Axis Insurance, Inc. and Beale Street Blues Company Orlando, LLC doing business as BB Kings Blues Club
Case Number: 6:2019cv02410
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 14 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Julie Walrlbroel appointed as mediator. (RDO)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/27/2020, Discovery due by 12/1/2020, Dispositive motions due by 1/4/2021, Pretrial statement due by 4/16/2021, All other motions due by 4/30/2021, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 10/2/2020, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 11/2/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2021 at 01:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell, Jury Trial set for 6/1/2021 at 09:15 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell. Conduct mediation hearing by 3/1/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 2/7/2020. (LAM)
February 4, 2020 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Crowley, Melissa)
January 10, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Arthur Ottesen. (Manning, Michael)
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Beale Street Blues Company Orlando, LLC. (Crowley, Melissa)
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Beale Street Blues Company Orlando, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Crowley, Melissa)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 motion to dismiss Count Two of the Complaint. The Clerk is directed to terminate Defendant Axis Insurance, Inc. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 1/9/2020. (LAM)
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION to Dismiss Count Two by All Plaintiffs. (Manning, Michael)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Beale Street Blues Company Orlando, LLC.(Crowley, Melissa)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER to the parties. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/10/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/27/2019. (LAM)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/10/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/27/2019. (LAM)
December 24, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-2410-Orl-31LRH. (NAS)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Circuit Court, case number 2019-CA-12643 filed in State Court on 10/15/19. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16287279 filed by Beale Street Blues Company Orlando, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3 - State Court COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit 4 - State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9)(Crowley, Melissa) Modified on 12/27/2019 (BIA).
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Filing Civil Cover Sheet filed by Beale Street Blues Company Orlando, LLC.(Crowley, Melissa) Modified on 12/27/2019 (BIA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ottesen v. Beale Street Blues Company Orlando, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beale Street Blues
Represented By: Melissa Danielle Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beale Street Blues Company Orlando, LLC
Represented By: Melissa Danielle Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axis Insurance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beale Street Blues Company Orlando, LLC doing business as BB Kings Blues Club
Represented By: Melissa Danielle Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Ottesen
Represented By: Michael F. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?