Doe v. Rickey Patel, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: CPLG Hol, LLC, MW Plantation, LP, Surendra Madhav Patel, Sky Motel, Inc., Rosen International, Inc., CTN Maingate Inc., LQ Management LLC, La Quinta Worldwide, Sweet Rose Corporation, Huucu Nguyen, Rickey Patel, LLC, LQ FL Properties, LLC, CPLG Properties L.L.C., G6 Hospitality LLC, Choice Hotels International, Inc., La Quinta Worldwide LLC, LQ FL Properties LLC, Surendra Patel, CPLG Properties LLC, 8444 Investments, LLC, Surendra Patel doing business as Budget Inn of Orlando, G6 Hospitality LLC doing business as Studio 6, Rosen International, Inc. doing business as Rodeway Inn International, CTN Maingate Inc. doing business as Roomba Inn & Suites, 8444 Investments, LLC doing business as Rodeway Inn International, Sweet Rose Corporation doing business as Magic Castle Inn & Suites, LQ FL Properties LLC doing business as La Quinta Inn & Suites Ft. Lauderdale Plantation #982, MW Plantation, LP doing business as Sawgrass Inn & Conference Center, LQ FL Properties, LLC doing business as La Quinta Inn & Suites Sunrise Sawgrass Mills #1048, Rickey Patel, LLC doing business as Vacation Inn and LQ FL Properties LLC doing business as La Quinta, Inn Fort Lauderdale Tamarac East #4006
Case Number: 6:2019cv02414
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Acknowledgment - Transferred case has been opened in the Southern District of Florida as case 0:20-cv-60683, filed on 4/1/2020. (MAA)
March 30, 2020 Filing 121 TRANSFER to the District of Southern District of Florida (RDO)
March 30, 2020 Filing 120 MOTION to Dismiss #103 Second Amended Complaint by Surendra Patel. (Llopiz, Onier) Modified on 3/31/2020 (RDO).
March 30, 2020 Filing 119 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by CPLG Hol, LLC, CPLG Properties LLC, LQ FL Properties LLC, LQ FL Properties, LLC, LQ Management LLC, La Quinta Worldwide LLC. (Phillips, J.) Modified on 3/31/2020 (RDO).
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER transferring case. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this matter to the Southern District of Florida, Fort Lauderdale Division, where venue properly lies. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/30/2020. (SCM)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ENDORSED ORDER granting #116 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/30/2020. (SCM)
March 30, 2020 Filing 116 MOTION for Extension of Time to File answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Sweet Rose Corporation. (Hoepker, Todd)
March 30, 2020 Filing 115 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #103 Amended Complaint by G6 Hospitality LLC.(Gershoni, Elan)
March 27, 2020 Filing 114 JOINT RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #105 Order filed by Jane Doe. (Newsome, C.) Modified on 3/30/2020 (RDO).
March 27, 2020 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: for Rickey Patel, LLC, Sky Motel, Inc.. Answer due by 4/6/2020. (RDO)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ENDORSED ORDER granting #112 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/27/2020. (SCM)
March 26, 2020 Filing 112 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #103 Amended Complaint by Rickey Patel, LLC, Sky Motel, Inc.. (Harrigan, David)
March 25, 2020 Filing 111 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Strike #103 Amended Complaint by MW Plantation, LP.(Trybus, Bruce) Modified on 3/26/2020 (RDO).
March 24, 2020 Filing 110 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #97 Interested persons order by Surendra Patel. (Llopiz, Onier)
March 23, 2020 Filing 109 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Jay Fraxedas appointed as mediator. (RDO)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 2/1/2021, Dispositive motions due by 3/1/2021, Pretrial statement due by 6/18/2021, All other motions due by 6/25/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2021 at 03:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron, Jury Trial set for 8/2/2021 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron., Conduct mediation hearing by 2/15/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/20/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
March 17, 2020 Filing 107 SUMMONS issued as to 8444 Investments, LLC. (RDO)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #102 Unopposed Motion to Re-Designate Action as a Track Three Case. The parties may refile this motion at a later date after discovery begins and there becomes a demonstrable need to re-designate the case. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/16/2020. (SCM)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The parties are ordered to SHOW CAUSE why this matter should not be transferred to the Southern District of Florida. The parties may file a joint response, if they agree, or separate responses, if they disagree about venue. Plaintiff (or parties if filing jointly) will respond to this Order to Show Cause on or before March 27, 2020. If Defendants, or any one of them, wish to respond in opposition, it will be filed within seven days of the initial briefing. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/16/2020. (SCM)
March 16, 2020 Filing 104 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jane Doe. (Newsome, C.)
March 16, 2020 Filing 103 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Jane Doe. Related document: #7 Amended Complaint filed by Jane Doe, #1 Complaint.(Newsome, C.) Modified on 3/17/2020 (RDO).
March 13, 2020 Filing 102 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically re-designate case as Track III by Jane Doe. (Newsome, C.) Modified on 3/16/2020 (RDO).
March 13, 2020 Filing 101 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Newsome, C.)
March 13, 2020 Filing 100 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #97 Interested persons order by G6 Hospitality LLC identifying Corporate Parent IBL Limited LLC for G6 Hospitality LLC.. (Gershoni, Elan)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting in part and denying part #98 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. On or before March 16, 2020, the Plaintiff shall separately file the proposed second amended complaint (Doc. 98-1) attached to the Motion. After the second amended complaint is filed, the Clerk is DIRECTED to conform the case style to reflect the parties named in the second amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 3/12/2020. (MDH)
March 11, 2020 Filing 98 MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint by Jane Doe. (Newsome, C.) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Modified on 3/12/2020 (RDO).
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Defendants G6 Hospitality LLC and Surendra Patel shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/10/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
March 9, 2020 Filing 96 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to CTN Maingate Inc. (RDO)
March 9, 2020 Filing 95 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Huucu Nguyen (RDO)
March 6, 2020 Filing 94 Amended MOTION for Clerk's Default against CTN Maingate Inc., Huucu Nguyen by Jane Doe. (Newsome, C.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
March 6, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Shannon Dudic, appearing on behalf of G6 Hospitality LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL089501.) Related document: #86 Unopposed MOTION for Shannon E. Dudic to appear pro hac vice . (KNC)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER re #92 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Choice Hotels International, Inc., are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate Defendant Choice Hotels International, Inc., from the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/6/2020. (SCM)
March 5, 2020 Filing 92 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Jane Doe (Newsome, C.)
March 5, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Angela C. Agrusa, appearing on behalf of G6 Hospitality LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL089436.) Related document: #82 Unopposed MOTION for Angela C. Agrusa to appear pro hac vice . (ARJ)
March 4, 2020 Filing 91 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by MW Plantation, LP. (Trybus, Bruce) Modified on 3/5/2020 (RDO).
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #86 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 3/4/2020. (MDH)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ENDORSED ORDER striking #88 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement filed by MW Plantation, LP. Defendant is directed to re-file this document and include the required certification, "I hereby certify that, except as disclosed above, I am unaware of any actual or potential conflict of interest involving the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to this case, and will immediately notify the Court in writing on learning of any such conflict." Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/4/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
March 4, 2020 Filing 88 (STRICKEN BY #89 ENDORSED ORDER) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by MW Plantation, LP. (Trybus, Bruce) Modified on 3/5/2020 (RDO).
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Plaintiff to Proceed Anonymously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 3/4/2020. (MDH)
March 3, 2020 Filing 86 Unopposed MOTION for Shannon E. Dudic to appear pro hac vice by G6 Hospitality LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Gershoni, Elan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #82 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 3/3/2020. (MDH)
March 2, 2020 Filing 84 RETURN of service executed on 2/7/20 by Jane Doe as to LQ FL Properties LLC. (Newsome, C.)
March 2, 2020 Filing 83 (WRONG PDF ATTACHED. REFILED AT #84) RETURN of service executed on 2/7/20 by Jane Doe as to LQ FL Properties, LLC. (Newsome, C.) Modified on 3/3/2020 (RDO).
March 2, 2020 Filing 82 Unopposed MOTION for Angela C. Agrusa to appear pro hac vice by G6 Hospitality LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Gershoni, Elan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER denying without prejudice #80 Motion for Clerk's Default. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 3/2/2020. (MDH) (RDO).
February 28, 2020 Filing 80 MOTION for Clerk's Default against CTN Maingate Inc., Huucu Nguyen by Jane Doe. (Newsome, C.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
February 27, 2020 Filing 79 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (Diamantas, Kyle)
February 26, 2020 Filing 78 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Rickey Patel, LLC. (Harrigan, David)
February 26, 2020 Filing 77 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Sky Motel, Inc.. (Harrigan, David)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER re #74 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Rosen International, Inc. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Rosen International, Inc., are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate Defendant Rosen International, Inc., from the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/26/2020. (SCM)
February 25, 2020 Filing 75 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #42 Interested persons order by CPLG Hol, LLC, CPLG Properties LLC, LQ FL Properties LLC, LQ FL Properties, LLC, LQ Management LLC, La Quinta Worldwide LLC identifying Corporate Parent Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. for LQ Management LLC, La Quinta Worldwide LLC; Corporate Parent CorePoint Lodging Inc. for CPLG Hol, LLC, LQ FL Properties LLC, LQ FL Properties LLC, LQ FL Properties, LLC.. (Phillips, J.)
February 25, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Jane Doe (Newsome, C.)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ENDORSED ORDER granting #72 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant La Quinta Worldwide, LLC shall respond to the amended complaint (Doc. 7) on or before March 16, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 2/19/2020. (MDH)
February 19, 2020 Filing 72 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 Amended Complaint by La Quinta Worldwide LLC. (Phillips, J.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
February 19, 2020 Filing 71 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Sweet Rose Corporation. (Hoepker, Todd)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ENDORSED ORDER granting #69 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Sweet Rose Corporation shall respond to the amended complaint (Doc. 7) on or before March 17, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 2/18/2020. (MDH)
February 18, 2020 Filing 69 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Amended Complaint , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Sweet Rose Corporation. (Hoepker, Todd) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
February 18, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd M. Hoepker on behalf of Sweet Rose Corporation (Hoepker, Todd)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #64 Motion for Extension of Time, and granting #66 Amended Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant MW Planation, LP shall respond to the amended complaint (Doc. 7) on or before March 16, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 2/14/2020. (MDH)
February 14, 2020 Filing 66 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Amended Complaint by MW Plantation, LP. (Trybus, Bruce) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
February 14, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE to counsel Kelly Lenahan of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RDO)
February 14, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond #7 Amended Complaint by MW Plantation, LP. (Trybus, Bruce) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Modified on 2/14/2020 (RDO).
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ENDORSED ORDER granting #55 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant G6 Hospitality LLC shall respond to the amended complaint (Doc. 7) on or before March 16, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 2/14/2020. (MDH)
February 13, 2020 Filing 62 RETURN of service executed on 2/3/20 by Jane Doe as to La Quinta Worldwide LLC. (Newsome, C.)
February 13, 2020 Filing 61 RETURN of service executed on 1/30/20 by Jane Doe as to Rosen International, Inc.. (Newsome, C.)
February 13, 2020 Filing 60 RETURN of service executed on 1/28/20 by Jane Doe as to MW Plantation, LP. (Newsome, C.)
February 13, 2020 Filing 59 RETURN of service executed on 1/24/20 by Jane Doe as to LQ FL Properties LLC. (Newsome, C.)
February 13, 2020 Filing 58 RETURN of service executed on 1/23/20 by Jane Doe as to Huucu Nguyen. (Newsome, C.)
February 13, 2020 Filing 57 RETURN of service executed on 1/23/20 by Jane Doe as to CTN Maingate Inc.. (Newsome, C.)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ENDORSED ORDER granting #52 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Choice Hotels International, Inc. shall respond to the amended complaint (Doc. 7) on or before March 16, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 2/13/2020. (MDH)
February 13, 2020 Filing 55 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint by G6 Hospitality LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gershoni, Elan)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ENDORSED ORDER granting #51 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Rickey Patel, LLC and Sky Motel, Inc. shall respond to the amended complaint (Doc. 7) on or before March 16, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 2/13/2020. (MDH)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ENDORSED ORDER granting #50 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Surendra Patel shall respond to the amended complaint (Doc. 7) on or before March 16, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 2/13/2020. (MDH)
February 13, 2020 Filing 52 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 Amended Complaint by Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (Diamantas, Kyle) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
February 12, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #7 Amended Complaint by Rickey Patel, LLC, Sky Motel, Inc.. (Harrigan, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Modified on 2/13/2020 (RDO).
February 12, 2020 Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to #7 Amended Complaint by Surendra Patel. (Llopiz, Onier) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Modified on 2/13/2020 (RDO).
February 12, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Onier Llopiz on behalf of Surendra Patel (Llopiz, Onier)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ENDORSED ORDER granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants LQ Management L.L.C., CPLG HOL L.L.C., CPLG Properties L.L.C., and LQ FL Properties L.L.C. shall respond to the amended complaint (Doc. 7) on or before March 16, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 2/12/2020. (MDH)
February 12, 2020 Filing 47 RETURN of service executed on 1/23/20 by Jane Doe as to LQ Management LLC. (Newsome, C.)
February 12, 2020 Filing 46 RETURN of service executed on 1/24/20 by Jane Doe as to G6 Hospitality LLC. (Newsome, C.)
February 12, 2020 Filing 45 RETURN of service executed on 1/23/20 by Jane Doe as to Sky Motel, Inc.. (Newsome, C.)
February 12, 2020 Filing 44 RETURN of service executed on 1/24/20 by Jane Doe as to CPLG Hol, LLC. (Newsome, C.)
February 12, 2020 Filing 43 RETURN of service executed on 1/23/20 by Jane Doe as to Rickey Patel, LLC. (Newsome, C.) Modified on 2/13/2020 (RDO).
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Defendants CPLG Hol, LLC, CPLG Properties LLC, LQ Management LLC, and LQ FL Properties, LLC d/b/a La Quintas #1048, #982 and #4006 shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/12/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
February 11, 2020 Filing 41 AGREED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 Amended Complaint by CPLG Hol, LLC, CPLG Properties LLC, LQ FL Properties LLC, LQ FL Properties, LLC, LQ Management LLC. (Phillips, J.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Modified on 2/12/2020 (RDO).
February 4, 2020 Filing 40 RETURN of service executed on 1/24/20 by Jane Doe as to Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (Newsome, C.)
February 4, 2020 Filing 39 RETURN of service executed on 1/23/20 by Jane Doe as to Surendra Patel. (Newsome, C.)
February 4, 2020 Filing 38 RETURN of service executed on 1/24/20 by Jane Doe as to Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (Newsome, C.) Modified on 2/4/2020 (RDO).
February 4, 2020 Filing 37 RETURN of service executed on 1/23/20 by Jane Doe as to Surendra Patel. (Newsome, C.) Modified on 2/4/2020 (RDO).
February 3, 2020 Filing 36 (WRONG CODE. REFILED AT #39) PROOF of service by Jane Doe (Newsome, C.) Modified on 2/4/2020 (RDO).
February 3, 2020 Filing 35 (WRONG CODE. REFILED AT #38) PROOF of service by Jane Doe (Newsome, C.) Modified on 2/4/2020 (RDO).
January 16, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically leave to proceed anonymously by Jane Doe. (Newsome, C.)
January 16, 2020 Filing 33 SUMMONS issued as to CPLG Properties LLC. (RDO)
January 15, 2020 Filing 32 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jane Doe. (Newsome, C.)
January 15, 2020 Filing 31 SUMMONS issued as to Surendra Patel. (KNC)
January 14, 2020 Filing 30 SUMMONS issued as to Rickey Patel, LLC. (LDJ)
January 14, 2020 Filing 29 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jane Doe. (Newsome, C.)
January 8, 2020 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Jane Doe. (Newsome, C.)
January 8, 2020 Filing 27 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (RDO)
January 8, 2020 Filing 26 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jane Doe. (Newsome, C.)
January 8, 2020 Filing 25 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jane Doe. (Newsome, C.)
January 8, 2020 Filing 24 POSSIBLE MDL Tag Along case for MDL Case Number 2928, In re: Hotel Industry Sex Trafficking. Information emailed to MDL Panel on 1/8/20, including cover letter, copy of complaint, and docket sheet. (RDO) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2020: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet) (RDO).
January 8, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jane Doe. Related case(s): yes (Newsome, C.)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #7 Amended Complaint. On or before January 29, 2020, the Plaintiff shall file a motion seeking leave to proceed anonymously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/8/2020. (MDH)
January 7, 2020 Filing 21 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jane Doe. (Newsome, C.)
January 7, 2020 Filing 20 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jane Doe. (Newsome, C.)
January 7, 2020 Filing 19 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jane Doe. (Newsome, C.)
January 7, 2020 Filing 18 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jane Doe. (Newsome, C.)
January 7, 2020 Filing 17 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jane Doe. (Newsome, C.)
January 7, 2020 Filing 16 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jane Doe. (Newsome, C.)
January 7, 2020 Filing 15 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jane Doe. (Newsome, C.)
January 7, 2020 Filing 14 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jane Doe. (Newsome, C.)
January 7, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jane Doe. (Newsome, C.)
January 7, 2020 Filing 12 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jane Doe. (Newsome, C.)
January 7, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jane Doe. (Newsome, C.)
January 7, 2020 Filing 10 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jane Doe. (Newsome, C.)
January 7, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jane Doe. (Newsome, C.)
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jane Doe. (Newsome, C.)
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Jane Doe. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Newsome, C.)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 (WRONG EVENT CODE USED. ATTORNEY TO REFILE) AMENDED document by Jane Doe. Amendment to #1 Complaint And Demand for Jury Trial. (Newsome, C.) Modified on 1/7/2020 (RDO).
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel Michele L. Reed of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk)(copies mailed). (BIA)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/26/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/26/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-2414-Orl-40LRH. (SJB)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Filing fee $400, receipt number 113A-16287878, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ourand, William) Modified on 12/27/2019 (BIA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Rickey Patel, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPLG Hol, LLC
Represented By: J. Trumon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MW Plantation, LP
Represented By: Bruce Michael Trybus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surendra Madhav Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky Motel, Inc.
Represented By: Therese Ann Savona
Represented By: Christopher J Wyszynski
Represented By: David S. Harrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosen International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTN Maingate Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LQ Management LLC
Represented By: J. Trumon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Quinta Worldwide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweet Rose Corporation
Represented By: Todd M. Hoepker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huucu Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rickey Patel, LLC
Represented By: Therese Ann Savona
Represented By: Christopher J Wyszynski
Represented By: David S. Harrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LQ FL Properties, LLC
Represented By: J. Trumon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPLG Properties L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G6 Hospitality LLC
Represented By: Elan Abraham Gershoni
Represented By: Shannon E. Dudic
Represented By: Angela C. Agrusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choice Hotels International, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Diamantas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Quinta Worldwide LLC
Represented By: J. Trumon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LQ FL Properties LLC
Represented By: J. Trumon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surendra Patel
Represented By: Onier Llopiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPLG Properties LLC
Represented By: J. Trumon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8444 Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surendra Patel doing business as Budget Inn of Orlando
Represented By: Onier Llopiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G6 Hospitality LLC doing business as Studio 6
Represented By: Elan Abraham Gershoni
Represented By: Shannon E. Dudic
Represented By: Angela C. Agrusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosen International, Inc. doing business as Rodeway Inn International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTN Maingate Inc. doing business as Roomba Inn & Suites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8444 Investments, LLC doing business as Rodeway Inn International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweet Rose Corporation doing business as Magic Castle Inn & Suites
Represented By: Todd M. Hoepker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LQ FL Properties LLC doing business as La Quinta Inn & Suites Ft. Lauderdale Plantation #982
Represented By: J. Trumon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MW Plantation, LP doing business as Sawgrass Inn & Conference Center
Represented By: Bruce Michael Trybus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LQ FL Properties, LLC doing business as La Quinta Inn & Suites Sunrise Sawgrass Mills #1048
Represented By: J. Trumon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rickey Patel, LLC doing business as Vacation Inn
Represented By: Therese Ann Savona
Represented By: Christopher J Wyszynski
Represented By: David S. Harrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LQ FL Properties LLC doing business as La Quinta, Inn Fort Lauderdale Tamarac East #4006
Represented By: J. Trumon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: William Carl Ourand
Represented By: C. Richard Newsome
Represented By: Milette Elise Webber
Represented By: Robert Frank Melton, II
Represented By: Maegen Peek Luka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?