The NOCO Company, Inc. v. Deltona Transformer Corporation
Plaintiff: THE NOCO COMPANY, INC.
Defendant: Deltona Transformer Corporation and Deltran USA, LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv00050
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Filing 25 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #23 Amended Complaint by Deltona Transformer Corporation.(Kinkade, Christopher)
February 20, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS issued as to Deltran USA, LLC. (RDO)
February 19, 2020 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Deltona Transformer Corporation, Deltran USA, LLC with Jury Demand. filed by The NOCO Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Rodriguez-Taseff, Lida)
February 14, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Deltona Transformer Corporation. Related case(s): Yes (Kinkade, Christopher)
February 14, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #12 Interested persons order by Deltona Transformer Corporation. (Kinkade, Christopher)
February 14, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Jonathan Lagarenne, appearing on behalf of Deltona Transformer Corporation (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL089009.) Related document: #19 Unopposed MOTION for Jonathan R. Lagarenne to appear pro hac vice. (KNC)
February 14, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorneys Christopher R. Kinkade and Ryan N. Miller, appearing on behalf of Deltona Transformer Corporation (Filing fee $300.00 receipt number ORL088986.) Related document: #13 Unopposed MOTION for Christopher R. Kinkade, Jonathan R. Lagarenne, and Ryan N. Miller to appear pro hac vice. (KNC)
February 14, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorneys Patrick R. Akers, Aaron M. Williams, Rex W. Miller II and Michael J. Garvin, appearing on behalf of The NOCO Company, Inc. (Filing fee $600.00 receipt number ORL088983.) Related document: #14 Unopposed MOTION for Aaron M. Williams to appear pro hac vice, #15 Unopposed MOTION for Michael J. Garvin to appear pro hac vice, #17 Unopposed MOTION for Rex W. Miller II to appear pro hac vice, #16 Unopposed MOTION for Patrick R. Akers to appear pro hac vice. (KNC)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 2/11/2020. (Smith, Thomas)
February 10, 2020 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Jonathan R. Lagarenne to appear pro hac vice by Deltona Transformer Corporation. (McNamara, Megan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #13 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #14 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #15 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #16 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #17 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 2/10/2020. (Smith, Thomas)
February 6, 2020 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Rex W. Miller II to appear pro hac vice by The NOCO Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Rodriguez-Taseff, Lida) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
February 6, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Patrick R. Akers to appear pro hac vice by The NOCO Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Rodriguez-Taseff, Lida) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
February 6, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Michael J. Garvin to appear pro hac vice by The NOCO Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Rodriguez-Taseff, Lida) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
February 6, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Aaron M. Williams to appear pro hac vice by The NOCO Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Rodriguez-Taseff, Lida) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
February 5, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Christopher R. Kinkade, Jonathan R. Lagarenne, and Ryan N. Miller to appear pro hac vice by Deltona Transformer Corporation. (McNamara, Megan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Defendant Deltona Transformer Corporation shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/4/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint. Response due by 2/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 2/4/2020. (Smith, Thomas)
January 31, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Deltona Transformer Corporation. (McNamara, Megan)
January 28, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by The NOCO Company, Inc.. (Rodriguez-Taseff, Lida)
January 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by The NOCO Company, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Rodriguez-Taseff, Lida)
January 15, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 01/13/2020 by The NOCO Company, Inc. as to Deltona Transformer Corporation. (Rodriguez-Taseff, Lida)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/14/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/14/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
January 14, 2020 Filing 4 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and exhibits) (RDO)
January 13, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Deltona Transformer Corporation. (KNC)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:20-cv-50-Orl-40GJK. (SJB)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Deltona Transformer Corporation with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16337291) filed by The NOCO Company, Inc.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons)(Rodriguez-Taseff, Lida)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The NOCO Company, Inc. v. Deltona Transformer Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE NOCO COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Lida Rodriguez-Taseff
Represented By: Rex W. Miller
Represented By: Patrick R. Akers
Represented By: Michael J. Garvin
Represented By: Aaron M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deltona Transformer Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan R. Lagarenne
Represented By: Ryan N. Miller
Represented By: Megan Anne McNamara
Represented By: Christopher R. Kinkade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deltran USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?