United States of America v. Philippe et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Ben Philippe, Michelle Jenkins, Reliance 1 Tax Services LLC and Clebert Philippe
Case Number: 6:2020cv00084
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Michelle Jenkins.(Tyson, Michael)
February 20, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Peter Robins on behalf of United States of America (Robins, Samuel)
February 14, 2020 Filing 20 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Reliance 1 Tax Services LLC (BIA)
February 14, 2020 Filing 19 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Clebert Philippe (BIA)
February 14, 2020 Filing 18 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Ben Philippe (BIA)
February 14, 2020 Filing 17 Remark: Doc. #15 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/14/2020. (EJV)
February 13, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States of America. Related case(s): yes (Applegate, Daniel)
February 13, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by United States of America. (Applegate, Daniel)
February 13, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Reliance 1 Tax Services LLC by United States of America. (Applegate, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
February 13, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Clebert Philippe by United States of America. (Applegate, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
February 13, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Ben Philippe by United States of America. (Applegate, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
February 10, 2020 Set deadlines: for Michelle Jenkins. Answer due by 2/24/2020. (SPM)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond. Michelle Jenkins response to complaint due by February 24, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 2/10/2020. (Smith, Thomas)
February 5, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Michelle Jenkins. (Tyson, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
February 5, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P Tyson on behalf of Michelle Jenkins (Tyson, Michael)
January 30, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 1/20/2020 by United States of America as to Reliance 1 Tax Services LLC. (Applegate, Daniel)
January 30, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 1/17/2020 by United States of America as to Michelle Jenkins. (Applegate, Daniel)
January 30, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 1/20/2020 by United States of America as to Clebert Philippe. (Applegate, Daniel)
January 30, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on 1/20/2020 by United States of America as to Ben Philippe. (Applegate, Daniel)
January 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1 (ctp) (JLC)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (KNC)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:20-cv-84-Orl-37GJK. (SJB)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Applegate, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Philippe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Philippe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance 1 Tax Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clebert Philippe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Daniel A. Applegate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?