Sardinas v. Infinity Auto Insurance Company
Petitioner: Jorge Sardinas
Respondent: Infinity Auto Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2020cv00113
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE to counsel Natalie M. DeJean, Kathleen V. Kinsella and Mark L. Hanover of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MAA)
January 22, 2020 Filing 32 TRANSFER IN from the Southern District of Florida. Case assigned to District Judge Byron and Magistrate Judge Kidd. New Case Number: 6:20-cv-113-ORL-40EJK. (MAA)
January 22, 2020 Filing 31 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 0:19-cv-61369. File received electronically
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER OF TRANSFER TO THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF FLORIDA. Closing Case. Denied as Moot : #8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), or MOTION to Stay or in the Alternative, to Dismiss and Compel Appraisal, and Incorporated Memorandum in Support filed by Infinity Auto Insurance Company, #20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), or MOTION to Stay or in the Alternative, to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 1/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), or MOTION to Stay or in the Alternative, to Dismiss filed by Infinity Auto Insurance Company. (Cole, Scott) [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to #20 Report and Recommendations by Jorge Sardinas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Jeeves, Scott) [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Other). Re: #20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), or MOTION to Stay or in the Alternative, to Dismiss. Responses due by 10/30/2019 Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), or MOTION to Stay or in the Alternative, to Dismiss by Jorge Sardinas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jeeves, Scott) [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Natalie M. Dean. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
October 16, 2019 Attorney Natalie M. DeJean representing Sardinas, Jorge (Plaintiff) Activated. (pt) [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Natalie DeJean. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Jorge Sardinas. Responses due by 10/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Jeeves, Scott) [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Attorney Natalie M. DeJean terminated. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Natalie DeJean. per DE #23 (mr1) [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Denying #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Natalie M. DeJean. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Natalie M. DeJean. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12052096 by Jorge Sardinas. Responses due by 10/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Jeeves, Scott) [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 21 OBJECTIONS to #20 Report and Recommendations on its Motion to Dismiss or Stay, or in the Alternative, to Dismiss and Compel Appraisal by Infinity Auto Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dominguez, Brian) [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
September 25, 2019 Filing 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Re: #8 Motion to Dismiss or Stay, or in the Alternative, to Dismiss and Compel Appraisal; recommending that the Motion to Dismiss or Stay, or in the Alternative, to Dismiss and Compel Appraisal (ECF No. 8) be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 10/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 9/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2) [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING #8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), or MOTION to Stay or in the Alternative, to Dismiss and Compel Appraisal, and Incorporated Memorandum in Support filed by Infinity Auto Insurance Company. Motions referred to Judge Lurana S. Snow. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Infinity Auto Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Scheduling Order)(Cole, Scott) [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), or MOTION to Stay or in the Alternative, to Dismiss and Compel Appraisal, and Incorporated Memorandum in Support Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Stay, or in the Alternative, to Dismiss and Compel Appraisal filed by Infinity Auto Insurance Company. (Dominguez, Brian) [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), or MOTION to Stay or in the Alternative, to Dismiss and Compel Appraisal, and Incorporated Memorandum in Support filed by Jorge Sardinas. Replies due by 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Jeeves, Scott) [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion. Re: #8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), or MOTION to Stay or in the Alternative, to Dismiss and Compel Appraisal, and Incorporated Memorandum in Support filed by Infinity Auto Insurance Company. Responses due by 8/5/2019 Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/16/2019. (vty) [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), or MOTION to Stay or in the Alternative, to Dismiss and Compel Appraisal, and Incorporated Memorandum in Support by Jorge Sardinas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Exention of Time to Reply to Motion to Dismiss)(Jeeves, Scott) [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Mark L. Hanover. The Court reserves the power to withdraw permission for special appearance prior to and during the time of trial. Failure to abide by any Court order or failure to appear at any scheduled matter may result in immediate revocation of counsels pro hac vice status. Local counsel must be ready to adequately represent the party at any time, including conducting the actual trial. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/12/2019. (vty) [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Kathleen V. Kinsella. The Court reserves the power to withdraw permission for special appearance prior to and during the time of trial. Failure to abide by any Court order or failure to appear at any scheduled matter may result in immediate revocation of counsels pro hac vice status. Local counsel must be ready to adequately represent the party at any time, including conducting the actual trial. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/12/2019. (vty) [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mark L. Hanover. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11806554 by Infinity Auto Insurance Company. Responses due by 7/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cole, Scott) [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kathleen V. Kinsella. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11806416 by Infinity Auto Insurance Company. Responses due by 7/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cole, Scott) [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Infinity Auto Insurance Company (Cole, Scott) [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), or, MOTION to Stay or in the Alternative, to Dismiss and Compel Appraisal, and Incorporated Memorandum in Support ( Responses due by 7/22/2019) by Infinity Auto Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Cole, Scott) [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Infinity Auto Insurance Company. Answer due 7/8/2019. Re: #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Infinity Auto Insurance Company. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/21/2019. (vty) [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re #5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls) [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) by Infinity Auto Insurance Company. Responses due by 7/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cole, Scott) Modified Relief on 6/20/2019 (ls). [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Class Action Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11691629, filed by Infinity Auto Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dominguez, Brian) Text Modified on 5/31/2019 (cds). No Answer/Motion To Dismiss Filed. [Transferred from flsd on 1/22/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sardinas v. Infinity Auto Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Infinity Auto Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott Allen Cole
Represented By: Kathleen V. Kinsella
Represented By: Brian Dominguez
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jorge Sardinas
Represented By: Mark S. Fistos
Represented By: Natalie M. DeJean
Represented By: Edward H. Zebersky
Represented By: Craig E. Rothburd
Represented By: Alec H. Schultz
Represented By: Scott R. Jeeves
Represented By: Casim Adam Neff
Represented By: Carly Abramson Kligler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?