Spivak v. Cenlar FSB et al
Plaintiff: Wayne B. Spivak
Defendant: Cenlar FSB and James E. Albertelli, P.A., d/b/a Albertelli Law
Case Number: 6:2020cv00167
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Filing 24 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (Mediator TBD) (MEJ)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by James E. Albertelli, P.A., d/b/a Albertelli Law. The deadline to file an answer or response to the Complaint is extended to 5/1/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/26/2020. (LAM)
March 25, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint [Joint and Unopposed] by James E. Albertelli, P.A., d/b/a Albertelli Law. (Troutman, Shannon)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/25/2020, Discovery due by 2/1/2021, Dispositive motions due by 3/1/2021, Pretrial statement due by 6/11/2021, All other motions due by 6/25/2021, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 12/4/2020, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 1/4/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/8/2021 at 01:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell, Jury Trial set for 8/2/2021 at 09:15 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell. Conduct mediation hearing by 5/3/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/25/2020. (LAM)
March 24, 2020 Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Shrader, Brian)
March 12, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #16 Interested persons order by James E. Albertelli, P.A., d/b/a Albertelli Law. (Troutman, Shannon)
March 10, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #14 Interested persons order by Cenlar FSB identifying Corporate Parent Cenlar Capital Corporation for Cenlar FSB.. (Wilson, Curtis)
February 28, 2020 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Answer due by 3/25/2020. (MEJ)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 2/27/2020. (LAM)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER to DEFENDANT JAMES E. ALBERTELLI, P.A., D/B/A ALBERTELLI LAW. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 3/12/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 2/27/2020. (LAM)
February 26, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by James E. Albertelli, P.A., d/b/a Albertelli Law. (Troutman, Shannon)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER to DEFENDANT CENLAR FSB. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 3/10/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 2/25/2020. (LAM)
February 24, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Cenlar FSB. (Wilson, Curtis)
February 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis Alan Wilson on behalf of Cenlar FSB (Wilson, Curtis)
February 18, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF of Service (Cenlar, FSB) by Wayne B. Spivak. (Shrader, Brian) Modified on 2/19/2020 (MEJ).
February 11, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF of Service (James E. Albertelli, P.A., d/b/a Albertelli Law) by Wayne B. Spivak. (Shrader, Brian) Modified on 2/12/2020 (MEJ).
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER on Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 1/3/2020. ctp (PML)
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Wayne B. Spivak. (Shrader, Brian)
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Wayne B. Spivak. Related case(s): No (Shrader, Brian)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 2/18/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 2/3/2020. (LAM)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 2/18/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 2/3/2020. (LAM)
February 3, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to James E. Albertelli, P.A., d/b/a Albertelli Law. (MEJ)
February 3, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Cenlar FSB. (MEJ)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:20-cv-167-Orl-31EJK. (SJB)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cenlar FSB, James E. Albertelli, P.A., d/b/a Albertelli Law with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16424961) filed by Wayne B. Spivak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons)(Shrader, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spivak v. Cenlar FSB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cenlar FSB
Represented By: Curtis Alan Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Albertelli, P.A., d/b/a Albertelli Law
Represented By: Shannon Leigh Troutman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne B. Spivak
Represented By: Brian Lucas Shrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?