Toliver v. Daytona Beach Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Korneal Toliver
Defendant: Erin Hyde, Daytona Beach Police Department, Volusia County Jail, Volusia County Sheriff Department, John E. Polk Correctional Facility and Seminole County Sheriff Department
Case Number: 6:2020cv00222
Filed: February 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/30/2020. (BIA)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall amend his complaint by filing it on the proper form. Within TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall complete and file a civil rights complaint form, marking it as the "Amended Complaint." Within TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS of the date of this Order, if Plaintiff wishes to proceed, Plaintiff shall either pay the $400.00 filing fee in full (If Plaintiff does not wish to proceed as a pauper) or file a fully completed Affidavit of Indigency and a fully completed Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate (if Plaintiff desires to proceed as a pauper and pay his filing fee as funds become available in his prisoner account). The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank civil rights complaint form, an Affidavit of Indigency, and a Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate along with this Order. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/14/2020. (BIA)
February 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1. (BIA)
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Korneal Toliver. (SPM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
February 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daytona Beach Police Department, Erin Hyde, John E. Polk Correctional Facility, Seminole County Sheriff Department, Volusia County Jail, Volusia County Sheriff Department filed by Korneal Toliver.(SPM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toliver v. Daytona Beach Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daytona Beach Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volusia County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volusia County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Polk Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seminole County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Korneal Toliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?