Samara v. The Juice Plus+ Company, LLC
Plaintiff: BOB SAMARA and Bob Samara doing business as Image Unlimited, LLC
Defendant: THE JUICE PLUS+ COMPANY, LLC and Jill Herman
Case Number: 6:2020cv00520
Filed: March 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #53 Motion to Dismiss. Samara's Fourth Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/1/2021. (MJB)
December 31, 2020 Filing 57 REVISED RESPONSE in Opposition re #53 MOTION to Dismiss #52 FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Bob Samara. (Pino, Laurence) Modified on 1/4/2021 (RDO).
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ENDORSED ORDER denying #54 Motion for Leave to File a Response in Excess of the Page Limits. The Motion neither provides good cause nor complies with Local Rule 3.01(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 12/31/2020. (Kidd, Embry)
December 30, 2020 Filing 55 RESPONSE in Opposition re #53 MOTION to Dismiss #52 FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Bob Samara. (Pino, Laurence)
December 30, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :document in excess of page limit by Bob Samara. (Pino, Laurence) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
December 16, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION to Dismiss #52 FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT by The Juice Plus Company, LLC. (Eden, Jennifer) Modified on 12/17/2020 (RDO).
December 2, 2020 Filing 52 FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Juice Plus Company, LLC with Jury Demand filed by Bob Samara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Pino, Laurence) Modified on 12/3/2020 (RDO).
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying as moot #47 Motion to Dismiss; granting #48 Motion for Leave to Amend. Plaintiff may file another amended complaint within ten days. Absent extraordinary and compelling circumstances, additional requests for leave to amend will not be granted. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 11/23/2020. (LAM)
October 30, 2020 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re #48 MOTION and MEMORANDUM in support re 46 Order on Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement filed by The Juice Plus Company, LLC. (Eden, Jennifer)
October 23, 2020 Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition re #47 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #41 Third Amended Complaint filed by Bob Samara. (Pino, Laurence)
October 16, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION and MEMORANDUM in support re 46 Order on Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement filed by Bob Samara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Pino, Laurence) Modified on 10/19/2020 (RDO).
October 9, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #41 Third Amended Complaint by The Juice Plus Company, LLC. (Eden, Jennifer) Modified on 10/13/2020 (RDO).
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #44 Motion to Correct. If Plaintiff wants to amend his complaint, he may file a motion within 10 days, attaching the proposed amended pleading and a redlined copy so the Court can review the proposed changes. Signed by Senior Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/9/2020. (LAM)
October 8, 2020 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 MOTION to Correct Scrivener's Error re #41 Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by The Juice Plus Company, LLC. (Eden, Jennifer)
October 7, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION to Correct Scrivener's Error re #41 Amended Complaint by Bob Samara. (Pino, Laurence) Modified on 10/8/2020 (RDO).
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #40 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. The Court's #39 Order allowed Plaintiff until September 25, 2020, to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff timely filed the #41 Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 9/28/2020. (Kidd, Embry)
September 27, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Memorandum of Clarification by Bob Samara. (Pino, Laurence) Modified on 9/28/2020 (RDO).
September 25, 2020 Filing 41 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Juice Plus Company, LLC with Jury Demand. filed by Bob Samara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Pino, Laurence) Modified on 10/13/2020 (RDO).
September 25, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by Bob Samara. (Pino, Laurence) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. Text modified on 9/28/2020 (RDO).
September 10, 2020 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Amended Complaint due by 9/25/2020 (RDO)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Second Amended Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint by 9/25/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/9/2020. (LAM)
August 27, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on July 26, 2021 at 9:30 A.M. before Richard F. Joyce. (Pino, Laurence)
August 14, 2020 Filing 37 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. No mediator appointed at this time. (RDO)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2020, Discovery due by 5/3/2021, Dispositive motions due by 6/1/2021, Pretrial statement due by 9/16/2021, All other motions due by 9/30/2021, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 3/1/2021, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 4/1/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2021 at 01:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell, Jury Trial set for 11/1/2021 at 09:15 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell. Conduct mediation hearing by 8/2/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/13/2020. (LAM)
August 12, 2020 Filing 35 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Pino, Laurence)
August 10, 2020 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #32 Verified Second Amended Complaint filed by Bob Samara. (Pino, Laurence)
July 27, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #32 Verified Second Amended Complaint by The Juice Plus Company, LLC. (Eden, Jennifer) Modified on 7/28/2020 (RDO).
July 13, 2020 Filing 32 VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Juice Plus Company, LLC with Jury Demand filed by Bob Samara. (Attachments: #1 Composite Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Composite Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Composite Exhibit E)(Pino, Laurence) Modified on 7/14/2020 (RDO).
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER dismissing claims against Defendant Jill Herman with prejudice re #30 Notice of voluntary dismissal. The Clerk is directed to terminate this defendant. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 7/6/2020. (LAM)
July 2, 2020 Filing 30 JOINT NOTICE of voluntary dismissal as to Defendant Jill Herman by Bob Samara (Pino, Laurence) Modified on 7/6/2020 (RDO).
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Dismiss; granting #20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Responses (Docs. 27, 28) are hereby STRICKEN as untimely. Because the Plaintiff has failed to timely respond to the Motions to Dismiss, and the Motions to Dismiss have colorable merit, the Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 19, 20) are GRANTED. If the Plaintiff wishes to file an amended complaint, he may do so within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 6/22/2020. (MAF)
June 19, 2020 Filing 28 (STRICKEN per Order #29) RESPONSE and Memorandum of Law in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim / Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Bob Samara. (Pino, Laurence) Modified on 6/22/2020 (ALL). Modified text on 6/23/2020 (LDJ).
June 19, 2020 Filing 27 (STRICKEN per Order #29) RESPONSE and Memorandum of Law in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Bob Samara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pino, Laurence) Modified on 6/22/2020 (ALL). Modified text on 6/23/2020 (LDJ).
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENDORSED ORDER denying #22 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff has failed to show good cause for his untimely request for an extension of time. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 6/8/2020. (LAM)
June 5, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 Verified MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Jill Herman. (Bergin, Russell)
June 5, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #21 Interested persons order by The Juice Plus Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent The Juice Plus+ Company, LLC for.. (Eden, Jennifer)
June 5, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #21 Interested persons order by Jill Herman. (Bergin, Russell)
June 4, 2020 Filing 22 Verified MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Bob Samara. (Pino, Laurence) Modified on 6/5/2020 (RDO).
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER to DEFENDANTS. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/5/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/22/2020. (LAM)
May 21, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim / Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by The Juice Plus Company, LLC. (Eden, Jennifer)
May 6, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Based on Lack of Personal Jurisdiction over a Non-resident, Plaintiff's Failure to Adequately Plead Counts I, II, IV, V, VI, VII and VIII, Plaintiff's Failure to Establish the $75,000 Amount in Controversy Required for this Court's Jurisdiction in a Diversity Matter and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Jill Herman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bergin, Russell)
May 6, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Designated E-mail Address and Notice of Appearance by Russell F. Bergin, Jr on behalf of Jill Herman (Bergin, Russell)
May 4, 2020 Filing 17 RETURN of service executed on April 30, 2020 by Bob Samara as to The Juice Plus Company, LLC. (Pino, Laurence)
May 1, 2020 Filing 16 RETURN of service executed on April 16, 2020 by Bob Samara as to Jill Herman. (Pino, Laurence)
April 30, 2020 Filing 15 (WRONG EVENT CODE. ATTORNEY CALLED AND WILL REFILE) AFFIDAVIT re: #14 Summons issued, #12 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint by Bob Samara. (Pino, Laurence) Modified on 5/1/2020 (RDO).
April 10, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS issued as to Jill Herman. (RDO)
April 9, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Bob Samara. (Pino, Laurence)
April 9, 2020 Filing 12 VERIFIED AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Bob Samara. (Attachments: #1 Composite Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Composite Exhibit D, #5 Composite Exhibit E)(Pino, Laurence) Modified on 4/10/2020 (RDO).
March 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bob Samara. Related case(s): no (Pino, Laurence)
March 27, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Bob Samara. (Pino, Laurence)
March 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of filing Civil Cover Sheet by Bob Samara (Pino, Laurence) Modified on 3/30/2020 (RDO).
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER on Discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 1/3/2020. ctp (PML)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/8/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/25/2020. (LAM)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/8/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/25/2020. (LAM)
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel Laurence J. Pino of Local Rule 1.05(e), which states - The Clerk is authorized and directed to require a complete and executed AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet, which shall accompany each civil case as a condition to the filing thereof. State and federal prisoners, and other persons filing civil cases pro se are exempt from the requirements of this subsection. File a completed Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RDO)
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to The Juice Plus Company, LLC. (RDO)
March 24, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:20-cv-520-Orl-31EJK. (SJB)
March 23, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Bob Samara. (Pino, Laurence) Modified on 3/25/2020 (RDO).
March 23, 2020 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT against The Juice Plus+ Company, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 - receipt number 113A-16625876) Filed by Bob Samara. (Attachments: #1 Composite Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Composite Exhibit D, #5 Composite Exhibit E)(Pino, Laurence) Modified on 3/25/2020 (RDO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samara v. The Juice Plus+ Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOB SAMARA
Represented By: Laurence James Pino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bob Samara doing business as Image Unlimited, LLC
Represented By: Sean Michael Southard
Represented By: Laurence James Pino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE JUICE PLUS+ COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer S. Eden
Represented By: Christina Y. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Herman
Represented By: Russell F. Bergin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?