MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC v. OneBeacon Insurance Group, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Defendant: Homeland Insurance Company of New York, OBI America Insurance Company, Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, OBI National Insurance Company, OneBeacon Insurance Group, Ltd. and Homeland Insurance Company of Delaware
Case Number: 6:2020cv00553
Filed: March 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Filing 13 REQUEST for oral argument re #12 MOTION for Taxation of Costs and for Stay pending Payment of Costs pursurant to Rule 41(d) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Homeland Insurance Company of Delaware, Homeland Insurance Company of New York, OBI America Insurance Company, OBI National Insurance Company, OneBeacon Insurance Group, Ltd.. (Reiter, Jack)
May 27, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Taxation of Costs and for Stay pending Payment of Costs pursurant to Rule 41(d) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Reiter, Jack) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 Remark: Doc. #8 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/24/20. (MT)
April 23, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER of service returned executed on April 23, 2020 by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC as to Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Homeland Insurance Company of Delaware, Homeland Insurance Company of New York, OBI America Insurance Company, OBI National Insurance Company, OneBeacon Insurance Group, Ltd.. (Zincone, Francesco)
April 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. Related case(s): yes (Zincone, Francesco)
April 23, 2020 Filing 8 Amended CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order, #7 Order to strike by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC identifying Other Affiliate VRM MSP Recovery Partners, LLC for MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC.. (Zincone, Francesco) Modified on 4/24/2020 (SPM).
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to strike re: #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. On or before Thursday, April 23, 2020, Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement that complies with the Court's IPO (Doc. 4). Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/16/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
April 15, 2020 Filing 6 (STRICKEN per Order #7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. (Zincone, Francesco) Modified text on 4/16/2020 (LDJ). Modified on 4/17/2020 (LDJ).
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 1/3/2020. (PML) ctp
April 1, 2020 Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/15/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/1/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/15/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/1/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
March 31, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:20-cv-553-Orl-37EJK. (SJB)
March 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing Fee $400 Receipt number 113A-16650943) filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reporting Hits, #2 Exhibit B - M.F. Claim Data, #3 Exhibit C - M.F. CMS Reporting, #4 Exhibit D - E.S. Claim Data, #5 Exhibit E - E.S. CMS Reporting, #6 Exhibit F - N.B. Claim Data, #7 Exhibit G - N.B. CMS Reporting, #8 Exhibit H - Connecticare Assignment, #9 Exhibit I - Connecticare Series Assignment, #10 Exhibit J - Connecticare Approval, #11 Exhibit K - HFHP Assignment, #12 Exhibit L - HFHP Series Assignment, #13 Exhibit M - EHTH Assignment, #14 Exhibit N - EHTH Series Assignment, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zincone, Francesco) Modified text on 3/31/2020 (LDJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC v. OneBeacon Insurance Group, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeland Insurance Company of New York
Represented By: Jack Roy Reiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OBI America Insurance Company
Represented By: Jack Roy Reiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jack Roy Reiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OBI National Insurance Company
Represented By: Jack Roy Reiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneBeacon Insurance Group, Ltd.
Represented By: Jack Roy Reiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeland Insurance Company of Delaware
Represented By: Jack Roy Reiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Represented By: Francesco Antonio Zincone, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?