Eisele v. Razor USA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Eisele
Defendant: Razor USA, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Walmart, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00554
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to close this case re #3 Notice of voluntary dismissal. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/2/2020. (MEH) ctp
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 1/3/2020. (PML) ctp
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE to counsel Steven E. Nauman of Local Rule 1.05(e), which states - The Clerk is authorized and directed to require a complete and executed AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet, which shall accompany each civil case as a condition to the filing thereof. State and federal prisoners, and other persons filing civil cases pro se are exempt from the requirements of this subsection. File a completed Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DMA)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/1/2020. (MEH) ctp
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/15/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/1/2020. (MEH) ctp
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/15/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/1/2020. (MEH) ctp
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Stephen Eisele (Nauman, Steven)
March 31, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:20-cv-554-Orl-41EJK. (SJB)
March 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16653649) filed by Stephen Eisele.(Nauman, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eisele v. Razor USA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Razor USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Eisele
Represented By: Steven E. Nauman
Represented By: Andrew Parker Felix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?