Yellow Funding Corp. et al v. Melbourne Beach, LLC
Appellee: Melbourne Beach, LLC and Brian West
Appellant: Pirogee Investments, LLC and Yellow Funding Corp.
Trustee: Chapter 11 Trustee Jules S. Cohen
Case Number: 6:2020cv00576
Filed: April 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Agreed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Appellants' Initial Brief. On or before June 8, 2020, Appellants may file their Initial Brief. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 6/1/2020. (VLC)
May 28, 2020 Filing 16 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellants' Initial Brief By One Week by Pirogee Investments, LLC, Yellow Funding Corp.. (Underwood, Scott) Modified on 5/28/2020 (SPM).
April 30, 2020 Filing 15 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal filed by Pirogee Investments, LLC, Yellow Funding Corp.. Related document: #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal filed by Yellow Funding Corp., Pirogee Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Response Limited Motion to Amend the Courts Order DenyingMotion, #2 Response to Limited Motion to Amend the Court's Order Denying Motion, #3 Transcript November, #4 Order Denying Limited Motion To Amend Court's Order Denying Motion, #5 Notice of Filing Order of Fourth District Court of Appeal of Florida, #6 Notice of Filing Proof of Interest, #7 Notice of Filing Proof of Interest, #8 Notice of Filing Proof of Interest, #9 Notice of Filing Proof of Interest, #10 Notice of Filing Proof of Interest, #11 Notice of Filing Proof of Interest, #12 Motion for Relief from Stay, #13 Joint Motion to Approve Compromise of Controversy, #14 Order Granting Joint Motion to Approve Compromise(RMH)
April 30, 2020 Filing 14 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal filed by Pirogee Investments, LLC, Yellow Funding Corp.. Related document: #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal filed by Yellow Funding Corp., Pirogee Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Petition, #3 Amended Petition, #4 Motion, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Transcript July, #11 Order Denying, #12 Objection, #13 Objection, #14 Order Denying, #15 Transcript September)(RMH)
April 23, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by Brian West. (Weinman, Richard)
April 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Brian West. Related case(s): yes (Weinman, Richard)
April 20, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Intervene in Appeal filed by Yellow Funding Corp.. (Underwood, Scott)
April 17, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Intervene in Appeal by Chapter 11 Trustee Jules S. Cohen. (Miller, Samual)
April 14, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by Pirogee Investments, LLC, Yellow Funding Corp.. (Underwood, Scott)
April 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Pirogee Investments, LLC, Yellow Funding Corp.. Related case(s): yes (Underwood, Scott)
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. New case number: 6:20-cv-576-ORL-41. Judge Wendy W. Berger no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Transfer Case. It is ORDERED that this case is transferred to Judge Mendoza, under Local Rule 1.04(b), with his consent, to be considered with related cases. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/13/2020. (RMF)
April 9, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case by Pirogee Investments, LLC, Yellow Funding Corp.. (Underwood, Scott)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/9/2020. (RMF) Modified on 4/10/2020 (RMF). Copies mailed.
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/23/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/9/2020. (RMF) Modified on 4/10/2020 (RMF). Copies mailed.
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/23/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/9/2020. (RMF) Modified on 4/10/2020 (RMF). Copies mailed.
April 3, 2020 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of interlocutory appeal by Pirogee Investments, LLC, Yellow Funding Corp. Bankruptcy Court case number 6:17-bk-07975-KSJ. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 3/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal)(KNC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yellow Funding Corp. et al v. Melbourne Beach, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Melbourne Beach, LLC
Represented By: Justin Luna
Represented By: Daniel A. Velasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Brian West
Represented By: Richard Brian Weinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Pirogee Investments, LLC
Represented By: Scott Underwood
Represented By: Adam M. Gilbert
Represented By: Megan Wilson Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Yellow Funding Corp.
Represented By: Scott Underwood
Represented By: Adam M. Gilbert
Represented By: Megan Wilson Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Chapter 11 Trustee Jules S. Cohen
Represented By: Samual A Miller
Represented By: Esther Anna McKean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?