Williams v. Stitzel, et al.
Plaintiff: David Williams
Defendant: David R. Parker, Richard T. Riley, Antonio Monteiro De Castro, M. Anne Szostak, Joyce M. Roche, Kriss Cloninger, III, Patricia A. Stitzel, Michael Poteshman, Angel R. Martinez, Cassandra Harris, Susan M. Cameron, Catherine A. Bertini, Tupperware Brands Corporation, Meg Crofton, E. V. Goings and Christopher D. O'Leary
Case Number: 6:2020cv00627
Filed: April 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Filing 21 Agreed MOTION to Stay Proceedings by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gerber, Daniel) Modified on 6/3/2020 (MEJ).
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Judge Kelly's Standing Order on Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 5/13/2020. (HMK)
May 7, 2020 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Answer due by 7/6/2020. (MEJ)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A Baker on 5/6/2020. (Baker, David)
May 6, 2020 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Gerber, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 5/7/2020 (MEJ).
April 29, 2020 Filing 17 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:20-cv-627-Orl-31GJK. Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER transferring this case to the Honorable Gregory J. Kelly for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 4/28/2020. (RMN)
April 28, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Catherine A. Bertini, Susan M. Cameron, Kriss Cloninger, III, Meg Crofton, Antonio Monteiro De Castro, E. V. Goings, Cassandra Harris, Angel R. Martinez, Christopher D. O'Leary, David R. Parker, Michael Poteshman, Richard T. Riley, Joyce M. Roche, Patricia A. Stitzel, M. Anne Szostak, Tupperware Brands Corporation. (Gerber, Daniel)
April 28, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Catherine A. Bertini, Susan M. Cameron, Kriss Cloninger, III, Meg Crofton, Antonio Monteiro De Castro, E. V. Goings, Cassandra Harris, Angel R. Martinez, Christopher D. O'Leary, David R. Parker, Michael Poteshman, Richard T. Riley, Joyce M. Roche, Patricia A. Stitzel, M. Anne Szostak, Tupperware Brands Corporation. Related case(s): yes (Gerber, Daniel)
April 24, 2020 Filing 13 Case Reassigned to Judge Gregory A. Presnell. New case number: 6:20-cv-627-ORL-31EJK. Judge Paul G. Byron no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER transferring this case to the Honorable Judge Gregory A Presnell, with his consent, pursuant to Local Rule 1.04(a), Middle District of Florida. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/23/2020. (JRR)
April 17, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by David Williams. (Sosa, Jose)
April 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by David Williams. Related case(s): Yes (Sosa, Jose) Modified on 4/20/2020 (MEJ).
April 17, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on April 15, 2020 by David Williams as to Tupperware Brands Corporation. (Sosa, Jose)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 1/3/2020. (PML) ctp
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/14/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/14/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
April 13, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Tupperware Brands Corporation. (MAA)
April 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Timothy Brown of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MAA)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:20-cv-627-Orl-40EJK. (SJB)
April 10, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED summons to be issued by David Williams. (Sosa, Jose)
April 10, 2020 Filing 1 VerifiedCOMPLAINT against Patricia A. Stitzel,et al. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16692437) filed by David Williams.(Sosa, Jose) Modified on 4/13/2020 (MAA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Stitzel, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Williams
Represented By: Jose D. Sosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David R. Parker
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard T. Riley
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Monteiro De Castro
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Anne Szostak
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce M. Roche
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kriss Cloninger, III
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia A. Stitzel
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Poteshman
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel R. Martinez
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassandra Harris
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan M. Cameron
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine A. Bertini
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tupperware Brands Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meg Crofton
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. V. Goings
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher D. O'Leary
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?