Cruz-Sanchez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Maria Elena Cruz-Sanchez o/b/o A.S.F.C. and Maria Elena Cruz-Sanchez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 6:2020cv00653
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (SPM)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 4/17/2020. (RMN)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/2010. (SPM)
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Maria Elena Cruz-Sanchez o/b/o A.S.F.C.. Related case(s): No (Culbertson, Richard)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/17/2020. (MEH) ctp
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/1/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/17/2020. (MEH) ctp
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:20-cv-653-Orl-41EJK. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. (SJB)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Patience Jacobs on behalf of Maria Elena Cruz-Sanchez o/b/o A.S.F.C. (Jacobs, Sarah)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Maria Elena Cruz-Sanchez o/b/o A.S.F.C.. (Culbertson, Richard)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Maria Elena Cruz-Sanchez o/b/o A.S.F.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Appendix Marshals Forms)(Culbertson, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz-Sanchez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Elena Cruz-Sanchez o/b/o A.S.F.C.
Represented By: Richard A. Culbertson
Represented By: Sarah Patience Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Elena Cruz-Sanchez
Represented By: Richard A. Culbertson
Represented By: Sarah Patience Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?