Rambaransingh et al v. U.S. Bank N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Troy Rambaransingh and Danielle Hilaire
Defendant: Cynthia Stevens, Richmond Monroe Group, Inc., Key Bay Mortgage, Inc., Brandon Schafer, U.S. Bank N.A., Jaline Fenwick, Shirley Tuitupou, Accredited Mortgage Loan Reit Trust 2005-3, Bill Koch, Select Portfolio Systems, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., McGlinchey Stafford, Accredited Home Lenders, Inc., Jeff Prose, Bank of America, N.A., Accredited Mortgage Loan Trust 2005-3, Florida Default Group, P.L. and Merscorp Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00679
Filed: April 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED document by Bill Koch, Merscorp Holdings, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Select Portfolio Systems, Inc., Cynthia Stevens, Shirley Tuitupou, U.S. Bank N.A.. Amendment to #11 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement, #4 Interested persons order . (Gelormino, Nicola)
May 19, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Danielle Hilaire, Troy Rambaransingh. (LAK)
May 19, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Danielle Hilaire, Troy Rambaransingh. Related case(s): yes (LAK)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER directing compliance. It is ORDERED Plaintiff Danielle Hilaire shall respond to Orders #3 and #4 on or before May 19, 2020. Failure to comply may result in dismissal of the case or other sanctions without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 5/12/2020. (RMF)ctp
May 8, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Charles Foster on behalf of Bill Koch, Merscorp Holdings, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Select Portfolio Systems, Inc., Cynthia Stevens, Shirley Tuitupou, U.S. Bank N.A. (Foster, Michael)
May 8, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bill Koch, Merscorp Holdings, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Select Portfolio Systems, Inc., Cynthia Stevens, Shirley Tuitupou, U.S. Bank N.A.. Related case(s): yes (Gelormino, Nicola)
May 8, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Bill Koch, Merscorp Holdings, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Select Portfolio Systems, Inc., Cynthia Stevens, Shirley Tuitupou, U.S. Bank N.A. identifying Other Affiliate Intercontinental Exchange, Inc. for Merscorp Holdings, Inc.; Corporate Parent MERSCORP Holdings Inc for Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.; Corporate Parent SPS Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse (USA), Inc. for Select Portfolio Systems, Inc... (Gelormino, Nicola)
May 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Amended Appearance by Nicola Gelormino on behalf of Bill Koch, Merscorp Holdings, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Select Portfolio Systems, Inc., Cynthia Stevens, Shirley Tuitupou, U.S. Bank N.A. (Gelormino, Nicola)
May 8, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Troy Rambaransingh. (LAK)
May 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Troy Rambaransingh. Related case(s): yes (LAK) Modified text on 5/11/2020 (LDJ).
May 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicola Gelormino on behalf of Bill Koch, Merscorp Holdings, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Select Portfolio Systems, Inc., Cynthia Stevens, Shirley Tuitupou, U.S. Bank N.A. (Gelormino, Nicola)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER on Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/6/2020. (MKH)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/24/2020. (RMF)ctp
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/8/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/24/2020. (RMF)ctp
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/8/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/24/2020. (RMF)ctp
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Accredited Home Lenders, Inc., Accredited Mortgage Loan Reit Trust 2005-3, Bank of America, N.A., Jaline Fenwick, Florida Default Group, P.L., Key Bay Mortgage, Inc., Bill Koch, McGlinchey Stafford, Merscorp Holdings, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Jeff Prose, Richmond Monroe Group, Inc., Brandon Schafer, Select Portfolio Systems, Inc., Cynthia Stevens, Shirley Tuitupou, U.S. Bank N.A. (LDJ)(ctp)
April 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ORL090302) filed by Danielle Hilaire, Troy Rambaransingh. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(LDJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rambaransingh et al v. U.S. Bank N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Stevens
Represented By: Nicola Gelormino
Represented By: Michael Charles Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richmond Monroe Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Key Bay Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Schafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank N.A.
Represented By: Nicola Gelormino
Represented By: Michael Charles Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaline Fenwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Tuitupou
Represented By: Nicola Gelormino
Represented By: Michael Charles Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accredited Mortgage Loan Reit Trust 2005-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Koch
Represented By: Nicola Gelormino
Represented By: Michael Charles Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Nicola Gelormino
Represented By: Michael Charles Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Nicola Gelormino
Represented By: Michael Charles Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGlinchey Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accredited Home Lenders, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Prose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accredited Mortgage Loan Trust 2005-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Default Group, P.L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merscorp Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Nicola Gelormino
Represented By: Michael Charles Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Rambaransingh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Hilaire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?